Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:22-bk-50556

Nevada Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Natalie M Cox
Case #: 3:23-ap-05001
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Jan 28, 2023
Terminated:Mar 13, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
DEBRA YOUREN
15000 PLEASANT VALLEY RD HC 61 BOX 615
WENDOVER, NV 84083
Represented By
DEBRA YOUREN
contact info
Plaintiff
Clarence Lavere Henriod
100 W. Liberty St. 10th Floor
Reno, NV 89501
Represented By
SALLIE B ARMSTRONG
contact info
Plaintiff
Wayne Lee Henriod
100 W. Liberty St. 10th Floor
Reno, NV 89501
Represented By
SALLIE B ARMSTRONG
contact info
Plaintiff
Douglas Joel Henriod, individually and as Trustee
100 W. Liberty St. 10th Floor
Reno, NV 89501
Represented By
SALLIE B ARMSTRONG
contact info
Plaintiff
William Joel Henriod and Merle Maxine Henriod Family Living Trust dated March 31, 2010
100 W. Liberty St. 10th Floor
Reno, NV 89501
Represented By
SALLIE B ARMSTRONG
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
32 32 court Close Adversary Case Wed 03/13 7:00 AM
Disposition and Closing of Adversary Case (mmm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
31 31 notice Entry of Order (Adv) Tue 02/27 2:12 PM
Notice of Entry of Order/Judgment with Certificate of Service Filed by SALLIE B ARMSTRONG on behalf of CLARENCE LAVERE HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010, DOUGLAS JOEL HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010, WAYNE LEE HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010 Related [+](ARMSTRONG, SALLIE)
Related: [-] 29 Stipulated/Agreed Order.
Monday, February 26, 2024
29 29 orderad Stipulated/Agreed Order (Adv) Mon 02/26 11:12 AM
Stipulated/Agreed Order By and Between PLAINTIFFS & DEFENDANT Related [+] (mmm)
Related: [-] 28 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff CLARENCE LAVERE HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010, Plaintiff WAYNE LEE HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010, Plaintiff DOUGLAS JOEL HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010.
Friday, February 23, 2024
28 28 adv_misc Stipulation (Adv) Fri 02/23 1:37 PM
Stipulation By CLARENCE LAVERE HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010, DOUGLAS JOEL HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010, WAYNE LEE HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010 and Between Debra Youren to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Without Prejudice with Certificate of Service Filed by SALLIE B ARMSTRONG on behalf of CLARENCE LAVERE HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010, DOUGLAS JOEL HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010, WAYNE LEE HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010 (ARMSTRONG, SALLIE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
27 27 adv_misc Declaration (ADV) Wed 01/10 5:47 PM
Declaration Of: Sallie B. Armstrong in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Set Aside Default with Certificate of Service Filed by SALLIE B ARMSTRONG on behalf of CLARENCE LAVERE HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010, DOUGLAS JOEL HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010, WAYNE LEE HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010 Related [+] (ARMSTRONG, SALLIE)
Related: [-] 26 Opposition filed by Plaintiff CLARENCE LAVERE HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010, Plaintiff WAYNE LEE HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010, Plaintiff DOUGLAS JOEL HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010.
26 26 answer Opposition Wed 01/10 5:45 PM
Opposition to Motion to Set Aside Default with Certificate of Service Filed by SALLIE B ARMSTRONG on behalf of CLARENCE LAVERE HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010, DOUGLAS JOEL HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010, WAYNE LEE HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010 Related [+] (ARMSTRONG, SALLIE)
Related: [-] 23 Motion to Set Aside filed by Defendant DEBRA YOUREN.
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
25 25 court Minute Entry Continued (ADV) Wed 12/13 10:30 AM
Minute Entry Re: hearing on 12/13/23. Continued. Related [+] Appearances: DEBRA M. AMENS, SALLIE B ARMSTRONG Status Hearing to be held on 03/06/2024 at 10:30 AM at HLB Zoom Teleconference Line. (dcl)
Related: [-] 3 Amended Complaint filed by CLARENCE LAVERE HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010, DOUGLAS JOEL HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010, WAYNE LEE HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
24 24 adv_misc Document (Adv) Tue 12/12 2:50 PM
Document Status Report with Certificate of Service Filed by SALLIE B ARMSTRONG on behalf of CLARENCE LAVERE HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010, DOUGLAS JOEL HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010, WAYNE LEE HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010 (ARMSTRONG, SALLIE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 07, 2023
23 23 motion Set Aside Thu 12/07 8:46 AM
Motion to Set Aside with Certificate of Service Filed by DEBRA M. AMENS on behalf of DEBRA YOUREN (AMENS, DEBRA)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 04, 2023
22 22 court Notice of Docketing Error (Adv) (BNC) Mon 12/04 3:37 PM
Notice of Docketing Error Related [+] (mmm)
Related: [-] 21 Motion to Set Aside filed by Defendant DEBRA YOUREN.
Sunday, December 03, 2023
21 21 motion Set Aside Sun 12/03 3:29 PM
Motion to Set Aside with Certificate of Service Filed by DEBRA M. AMENS on behalf of DEBRA YOUREN (AMENS, DEBRA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
20 20 court Minute Entry Continued (ADV) Thu 09/14 10:39 AM
Minute Entry Re: hearing on 9/13/23. Continued. Related [+] Appearances: DEBRA M. AMENS, SALLIE B ARMSTRONG (Hearing scheduled 12/13/2023 at 10:00 AM at HLB Zoom Teleconference Line. (dcl)
Related: [-] 3 Amended Complaint filed by CLARENCE LAVERE HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010, DOUGLAS JOEL HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010, WAYNE LEE HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010
Wednesday, July 19, 2023
19 19 court Minute Entry Continued (BK) Tue 08/01 10:21 AM
Minute Entry Re: hearing on . Continued. Related [+] Appearances: DEBRA M. AMENS, SALLIE B ARMSTRONG, DEBRA YOUREN Status Hearing to be held on 09/13/2023 at 10:00 AM at HLB Zoom Teleconference Line. (dcl)
Related: [-] 3 Amended Complaint filed by CLARENCE LAVERE HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010, DOUGLAS JOEL HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010, WAYNE LEE HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 07/05 9:26 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] No. of Notices: 5. Notice Date 07/05/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 Notice of Hearing (BNC-BK and/or ADV only)
Monday, July 03, 2023
17 17 court Notice of Hearing (BNC-BK and/or ADV only) Mon 07/03 12:08 PM
Notice of Rescheduled Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference rescheduled for 7/19/2023 at 09:30 AM at HLB Zoom Teleconference Line. Related [+] (dcl)
Related: [-] 3 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff CLARENCE LAVERE HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010, Plaintiff WAYNE LEE HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010, Plaintiff DOUGLAS JOEL HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010.
Monday, June 05, 2023
court Order Reassigning Case Mon 06/05 8:37 AM
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 18, 2023
16 16 court Minute Entry Continued (ADV) Thu 05/18 4:06 PM
Minute Entry Re: hearing on 05/18/2023 09:30 am. Continued. Related [+] Appearance: SALLIE B ARMSTRONG Scheduling Conference scheduled for 07/13/2023 at 09:30 AM at NMC Teleconference Line. (mag)
Related: [-] 3 Amended Complaint filed by CLARENCE LAVERE HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010, DOUGLAS JOEL HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010, WAYNE LEE HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010
15 15 court Minute Entry Continued (ADV) Thu 05/18 1:11 PM
Minute Entry Re: hearing on 05/18/2023 09:30 am. Continued. Related [+] Appearance: SALLIE B ARMSTRONG Scheduling Conference scheduled for 07/13/2023 at 09:30 AM at NMC Teleconference Line. (mag)
Related: [-] 3 Amended Complaint filed by CLARENCE LAVERE HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010, DOUGLAS JOEL HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010, WAYNE LEE HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010
Monday, April 24, 2023
14 14 adv_misc Notice of Appearance (Adv) Mon 04/24 2:18 PM
Notice of Appearance with Certificate of Service Filed by DEBRA M. AMENS on behalf of DEBRA YOUREN (AMENS, DEBRA)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 17, 2023
13 13 court Notice of Docketing Error (Adv) (BNC) Mon 04/17 8:11 AM
Notice of Docketing Error Related [+] (mmm)
Related: [-] 12 Notice of Appearance filed by Defendant DEBRA YOUREN.
Sunday, April 16, 2023
12 12 adv_misc Notice of Appearance (Adv) Sun 04/16 9:46 AM
Notice of Appearance with Certificate of Service Filed by DEBRA M. AMENS on behalf of DEBRA YOUREN (AMENS, DEBRA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 13, 2023
11 11 adv_misc Notice of Entry of Default Thu 04/13 4:46 PM
Notice of Entry of Default with Certificate of Service Filed by SALLIE B ARMSTRONG on behalf of CLARENCE LAVERE HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010, DOUGLAS JOEL HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010, WAYNE LEE HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010 (ARMSTRONG, SALLIE)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 10, 2023
10 10 orderad Clerk's Entry of Default Mon 04/10 2:32 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default Against DEBRA YOUREN Related [+] (mmm)
Related: [-] 8 Request/Praecipe for Default filed by Plaintiff CLARENCE LAVERE HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010, Plaintiff WAYNE LEE HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010, Plaintiff DOUGLAS JOEL HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010.
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
9 9 adv_misc Declaration (ADV) Wed 04/05 6:17 PM
Declaration Of: Sallie B. Armstrong in Support of Request for Entry of Default Against Debra Youren with Certificate of Service Filed by SALLIE B ARMSTRONG on behalf of CLARENCE LAVERE HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010, DOUGLAS JOEL HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010, WAYNE LEE HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010 Related [+] (ARMSTRONG, SALLIE)
Related: [-] 8 Request/Praecipe for Default filed by Plaintiff CLARENCE LAVERE HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010, Plaintiff WAYNE LEE HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010, Plaintiff DOUGLAS JOEL HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010.
8 8 adv_misc Request/Praecipe for Default Wed 04/05 6:15 PM
Request/Praecipe for Default against Debra Youren with Certificate of Service Filed by SALLIE B ARMSTRONG on behalf of CLARENCE LAVERE HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010, DOUGLAS JOEL HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010, WAYNE LEE HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010 (ARMSTRONG, SALLIE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 28, 2023
7 7 notice Notice (Adv) Tue 03/28 2:50 PM
Notice of Intent to Take Default with Certificate of Service Filed by SALLIE B ARMSTRONG on behalf of CLARENCE LEVERE HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010, DOUGLAS JOEL HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010, WAYNE LEE HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010 (ARMSTRONG, SALLIE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 01, 2023
6 6 adv_misc Certificate of Service (ADV) Wed 02/01 3:07 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by SALLIE B ARMSTRONG on behalf of CLARENCE LEVERE HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010, DOUGLAS JOEL HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010, WAYNE LEE HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010 Related [+] (ARMSTRONG, SALLIE)
Related: [-] 3 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff CLARENCE LEVERE HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010, Plaintiff WAYNE LEE HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010, Plaintiff DOUGLAS JOEL HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010.
5 5 court Summons Issued Wed 02/01 9:23 AM
Summons Issued on DEBRA YOUREN (mmm)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Hearing Sched/Resched (Scheduling Conference) Wed 02/01 9:22 AM
Scheduling Conference scheduled for 5/18/2023 at 09:30 AM at Remote. Related [+] (mmm)
Related: [-] 3 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff CLARENCE LEVERE HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010, Plaintiff WAYNE LEE HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010, Plaintiff DOUGLAS JOEL HENRIOD, AS AN INDIVIDUAL AND AS TRUSTEE OF THE WILLIAM JOEL HENRIOD AND MERLE MAXINE HENRIOD FAMILY LIVING TRUST DATED MARCH 31, 2010.
Tuesday, January 31, 2023
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 01/31 3:21 PM
First Amended Complaint Related [+] Filed by SALLIE B ARMSTRONG on behalf of Clarence Lavere Henriod, Douglas Joel Henriod, Wayne Lee Henriod against DEBRA YOUREN (ARMSTRONG, SALLIE)
Related: [-] filed to correct the caption
Monday, January 30, 2023
2 2 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 01/30 3:33 PM
First Amended Complaint Filed by SALLIE B ARMSTRONG on behalf of Clarence Lavere Henriod, Douglas Joel Henriod, Wayne Lee Henriod against DEBRA YOUREN (ARMSTRONG, SALLIE)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 28, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Sat 01/28 10:44 AM
Adversary case 23-05001 Complaint Filed by Clarence Lavere Henriod, Wayne Lee Henriod, Douglas Joel Henriod, William Joel Henriod and Merle Maxine Henriod Family Living Trust dated March 31, 2010 vs. DEBRA YOUREN Fee Amount $350. (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)(ARMSTRONG, SALLIE)
Related: [-]