Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Hope T Cannon
Case #: 3:23-cv-02256
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Jan 30, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Jul 29, 2023 6:38 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Plaintiff
JAMES DAVID KALBER
Represented By
JON COLLINS CONLIN
Cory Watson Pc - Birmingham Al
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 04, 2023
2 2 30+ pgs order Order Fri 05/05 11:13 AM
ORDER. For any plaintiff failing to submit a census form by May 18, 2023, his/her case will be dismissed with prejudice, in light of repeated failures to comply. (Pretrial Order No. 18 / Pretrial Order No. 81 and this Order). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/4/2023. (erl)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 30, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 01/30 10:31 AM
COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7663662.), filed by JAMES DAVID KALBER. (CONLIN, JON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet