California Southern District Court
Judge:Andrew G Schopler
Referred: David D Leshner
Case #: 3:23-cv-00164
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1964 Civil Remedies: Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Jan 30, 2023
Re-opened:Sep 21, 2023
Terminated:Feb 26, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jul 29, 2023 2:27 AM PDT
Defendant
Kenneth Catanzarite
Represented By
Kenneth Catanzarite
Catanzarite Law Corporation
contact info
Defendant
Ruben Duran
Represented By
JiEun Choi
Orbach Huff & Henderson LLP
contact info
Ellin Davtyan
The State Bar Of California
contact info
Charles Tsai
California Department Of Justice
contact info
Kevin E Gilbert
Orbach, Huff, Suarez & Henderson
contact info
Robert George Retana
The State Bar Of California
contact info
Defendant
Suzanne Grandt
Represented By
JiEun Choi
Orbach Huff & Henderson LLP
contact info
Ellin Davtyan
The State Bar Of California
contact info
Kevin E Gilbert
Orbach, Huff, Suarez & Henderson
contact info
Robert George Retana
The State Bar Of California
contact info
Defendant
Eli David Morgenstern
Represented By
JiEun Choi
Orbach Huff & Henderson LLP
contact info
Ellin Davtyan
The State Bar Of California
contact info
Kevin E Gilbert
Orbach, Huff, Suarez & Henderson
contact info
Robert George Retana
The State Bar Of California
contact info
Defendant
State of California
Represented By
Tim Jude Vanden Heuvel
California Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
The State Bar of California
Represented By
JiEun Choi
Orbach Huff & Henderson LLP
contact info
Ellin Davtyan
The State Bar Of California
contact info
Kevin E Gilbert
Orbach, Huff, Suarez & Henderson
contact info
Robert George Retana
The State Bar Of California
contact info
Defendant
United States Attorney General, -
Represented By
Stephanie Amanda Sotomayor
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
Stephanie Amanda Sotomayor
Doj-Usao
contact info
U S Attorney CV
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
Plaintiff
Justin S. Beck
3501 Roselle St.
Oceanside, CA 92056

GPO Sep 14 2023
ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT (ECF 2) and Denying Remaining Motions as Moot (ECF 12, 18, 20, 26). Signed by District Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 9/14/2023.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jms)
GPO Feb 26 2024
ORDER (1) Dismissing Second Amended Complaint (ECF 38) With Prejudice; (2) Denying as Moot All Pending Motions (ECF 39, 40, 41, 42); and (3) Closing Case. Signed by District Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 2/26/2024.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jms)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, March 14, 2024
67 67 appeal USCA Time Schedule Order Thu 03/14 2:22 PM
USCA Time Schedule Order as to65 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, filed by Justin S. Beck. (NOTICE TO PARTIES of deadlines regarding appellate transcripts: Appellant shall file transcript designation and ordering form with the US District Court, provide a copy of the form to the court reporter, and make payment arrangements with the court reporter on or by 4/10/2024 (see Ninth Circuit Rule 10-3.1); Due date for filing of transcripts in US District Court is 5/10/2024.) (cc: Court Reporter). (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mjw)
Related: [-]
66 66 appeal USCA Case Number Thu 03/14 2:21 PM
USCA Case Number 24-1520 for65 Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit, filed by Justin S. Beck.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mjw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attorney Appeal Case Opening,
Att: 2 Ninth Circuit Mentoring Program,
Att: 3 Pro Se Appeals Case Opening
Tuesday, March 12, 2024
64 64 order Judgment - Clerk Tue 03/12 12:37 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that: Plaintiffs generally have no right to maintain two separate actions involving the same subject matter at the same time in the same court and against the same defendant. Mendoza v. Amalgamated Transit Union Intl, 30 F.4th 879, 886 (9th Cir. 2022) (quotation marks omitted). Accordingly, plaintiff Justin Becks complaint must be dismissed. Consequently, Becks second amended complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as duplicative. And all pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jms)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
65 65 appeal Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Tue 03/12 12:37 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit as to61 Order Dismissing Case, by Justin S. Beck. (Filing fee $ 605. Receipt No 152002) (Notice of Appeal electronically transmitted to US Court of Appeals.)(dim)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Receipt
Thursday, March 07, 2024
63 63 order Order on Motion for Judgment Thu 03/07 8:12 AM
MINUTE ORDER (AGS): In light of this Court's order dismissing the case (ECF61 ), defendants' motion for entry of judgment (ECF62 ) is granted. The clerk is directed to issue a judgment in favor of defendants. Signed by District Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 3/7/2024. (no document attached) (smf)
Related: [-]