State National Insurance Company, Inc. v. The Badelle Group, Inc. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Maxine M Chesney |
Case #: | 3:23-cv-00387 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Jan 26, 2023 |
Last checked: Friday Jul 28, 2023 1:50 AM PDT |
Defendant
Brett Badelle
|
|
Defendant
Mahmoud Berte
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Badelle Group, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
State National Insurance Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Thursday, April 04, 2024 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings No NEF
Thu 04/04 8:53 AM
Set/Reset Hearing re57 Terminate Motions, Order, Set/Reset Deadlines as to57 Terminate Motions, Order,37 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Bench Trial set for 7/15/2024 09:00 AM before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/1/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor. Motion Hearing set for 5/3/2024 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 07, 19th Floor before Judge Maxine M. Chesney. (tl, COURT STAFF) |
||
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
57 | 57
order
~Util - Terminate Motions Order
Wed 04/03 4:20 PM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE MOTION AND TRIAL DATES. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 3, 2024. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, April 02, 2024 | ||
56 | 56
motion
Stipulation and Proposed Order
Tue 04/02 1:05 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Motion And Trial Dates filed by State National Insurance Company, Inc.. (Raphael, Roger) |