Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10358

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David S Jones
Case #: 1:23-ap-01006
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2023
Terminated:Nov 01, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Eliyahu Idi
Represented By
Eliyahu Idi
contact info
Defendant
Blue Moon Hotel NYC Inc.
Represented By
Blue Moon Hotel NYC Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
100 Orchard St. LLC d/b/a Blue Moon Hotel
Represented By
David H. Wander
Tarter Krinsky & Drogin LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
misc Close Adversary Proceeding Wed 11/01 3:37 PM
Adversary Case 1:23-ap-1006 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
12 12 order Motion, Approve Compromise Thu 10/26 2:15 PM
Order Signed on 10/26/2023 Approving Settlement with Defendants. Related [+] (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-] 8 ,9
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
11 11 misc Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 Tue 10/24 9:38 AM
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 - Certificate Of No Objection Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. § 1746 Regarding Amended Motion By Debtor For Order Approving Settlement With Defendants, Pursuant To Bankruptcy Rule 9019(a) Related [+] Filed by David H. Wander on behalf of 100 Orchard St. LLC d/b/a Blue Moon Hotel. (Wander, David)
Related: [-] 8 ,9
Monday, October 09, 2023
10 10 misc Affidavit of Service Mon 10/09 12:26 PM
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Amended Motion and Amended Motion By Debtor For Order Approving Settlement With Defendants, Pursuant To Bankruptcy Rule 9019(a) Related [+] Filed by Alexander Tiktin on behalf of 100 Orchard St. LLC d/b/a Blue Moon Hotel. (Tiktin, Alexander)
Related: [-] 9
Thursday, October 05, 2023
9 9 motion Motion, Approve Compromise Thu 10/05 4:18 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise -Amended Motion By Debtor For Order Approving Settlement With Defendants, Pursuant To Bankruptcy Rule 9019(A) filed by David H. Wander on behalf of 100 Orchard St. LLC d/b/a Blue Moon Hotel with hearing to be held on 10/26/2023 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (DSJ) Responses due by 10/19/2023,. (Wander, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2023
8 8 motion Motion, Approve Compromise Tue 09/26 4:56 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise - Motion By Debtor For Order Approving Settlement With Defendants, Pursuant To Bankruptcy Rule 9019(a) filed by David H. Wander on behalf of 100 Orchard St. LLC d/b/a Blue Moon Hotel. (Wander, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Stipulation of Settlement
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Idi Settlement-Proposed Order
Att: 3 Affirmation in Support of O.S.C
Att: 4 Proposed Order To Show Cause
Monday, July 31, 2023
7 7 order So Ordered Stipulation Mon 07/31 11:28 AM
So Ordered Stipulation and Order Signed on 7/31/2023 Extending Discovery Cut-Off Date. Related [+] (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-] 6
6 6 notice Notice, Proposed Order/Presentment Mon 07/31 9:57 AM
Notice of Proposed Order - Proposed Stipulation and Order Extending Discovery Cut-Off Date filed by David H. Wander on behalf of 100 Orchard St. LLC d/b/a Blue Moon Hotel. (Wander, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 29, 2023
5 5 order Scheduling Order Wed 03/29 11:38 AM
Scheduling Order Signed on 3/29/2023. A Final Pre-Trial Conference Will be Held on 8/29/2023 at 10:00 a.m. via Videoconference (ZoomGov). (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
4 4 order Scheduling Order Tue 03/21 5:34 PM
Order Signed on 3/21/2023 Regarding (I) Meet and Confer and (II) Case Management/Schedling Order. (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 19, 2023
3 3 answer None Sun 03/19 12:33 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] filed by Joel Shafferman on behalf of Blue Moon Hotel NYC Inc., Eliyahu Idi. (Shafferman, Joel)
Related: [-] 1 1 ,2
Tuesday, January 31, 2023
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference Tue 01/31 3:25 PM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/21/2023 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (DSJ), Answer due by 3/2/2023, (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Tue 01/31 11:00 AM
Adversary case 23-01006 Complaint against Eliyahu Idi, Blue Moon Hotel NYC Inc. (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) Filed by David H. Wander on behalf of 100 Orchard St. LLC d/b/a Blue Moon Hotel. (Wander, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit C