Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:22-bk-81099

Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Thomas M Lynch
Case #: 3:23-ap-96003
Nature of Suit65 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - other
67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Jan 30, 2023
Terminated:Jan 18, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Shanin J. Solt
504 Breezeway Drive
Pearl City, IL 61062
Represented By
Shanin J. Solt
contact info
Plaintiff
Rabo Agrifinance LLC
14767 N Outer 40 Rd #400
Chesterfield, MO 63017
Represented By
Erin Edelman
Armstrong Teasdale LLP
contact info

GPO Dec 20 2023
Memorandum Opinion (RE: 22 Motion for Summary Judgment). (Harris, Stephanie)

Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:06 PM CDT
Thursday, January 18, 2024
46 46 court Close Adversary Case Thu 01/18 1:39 PM
Adversary Case 3:23-ap-96003 Closed . (Harris, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
45 45 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Thu 01/18 8:05 AM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding and Counts I, IV, V and VI of the Adversary Complaint are hereby dismissed without prejudice Related [+]. Signed on 1/17/2024. (Harris, Stephanie)
Related: [-] 44
Friday, January 12, 2024
44 44 motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Fri 01/12 1:10 PM
Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Erin Edelman on behalf of Rabo Agrifinance LLC. Hearing scheduled for 1/17/2024 at 11:00 AM at Appear In Courtroom 3100, 327 S. Church St, Rockford, IL 61101 or Using Zoom- Judge Lynch. (Edelman, Erin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
43 43 order Judgment Order Denying Discharge Wed 12/20 3:32 PM
Judgment Order Denying Discharge of Debtor(s) Related [+]. Signed on 12/20/2023 (Harris, Stephanie)
Related: [-] 22 Motion for Summary Judgment
42 42 order Summary Judgment Wed 12/20 3:27 PM
Order Granting Motion For Summary Judgment Related [+]. Signed on 12/20/2023. (Harris, Stephanie)
Related: [-] 22
41 41 17 pgs court Memorandum Opinion/Decision Wed 12/20 3:22 PM
Memorandum Opinion Related [+]. (Harris, Stephanie)
Related: [-] 22 Motion for Summary Judgment
40 40 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 12/20 3:17 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 01/17/2024 at 11:00 AM at Appear in Courtroom 3100, 327 S. Church St., Rockford, IL 61101, or Using Zoom - Judge Lynch.. Signed on 12/20/2023. (Kuczynski, Mimi)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
39 39 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 12/13 3:45 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. hearing scheduled for 12/20/2023 at 11:00 AM at Appear in Courtroom 3100, 327 S. Church St., Rockford, IL 61101, or Using Zoom - Judge Lynch.. Signed on 12/13/2023. (Clarke, Jody)
Related: [-] 22 Summary Judgment
38 38 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 12/13 3:45 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 12/20/2023 at 11:00 AM at Appear in Courtroom 3100, 327 S. Church St., Rockford, IL 61101, or Using Zoom - Judge Lynch, , , .. Signed on 12/13/2023. (Clarke, Jody)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
37 37 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 11/29 4:27 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. hearing scheduled for 12/13/2023 at 11:00 AM at Appear in Courtroom 3100, 327 S. Church St., Rockford, IL 61101, or Using Zoom - Judge Lynch.. Signed on 11/29/2023. (Kuczynski, Mimi)
Related: [-] 22 Summary Judgment
36 36 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 11/29 4:27 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 12/13/2023 at 11:00 AM at Appear in Courtroom 3100, 327 S. Church St., Rockford, IL 61101, or Using Zoom - Judge Lynch.. Signed on 11/29/2023. (Kuczynski, Mimi)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
35 35 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 11/08 3:37 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. hearing scheduled for 11/29/2023 at 11:00 AM at Appear in Courtroom 3100, 327 S. Church St., Rockford, IL 61101, or Using Zoom - Judge Lynch.. Signed on 11/08/2023. (Kuczynski, Mimi)
Related: [-] 22 Summary Judgment
34 34 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 11/08 3:37 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 11/29/2023 at 11:00 AM at Appear in Courtroom 3100, 327 S. Church St., Rockford, IL 61101, or Using Zoom - Judge Lynch.. Signed on 11/08/2023. (Kuczynski, Mimi)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, October 25, 2023
33 33 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 10/25 3:26 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. hearing scheduled for 11/08/2023 at 11:00 AM at Appear in Courtroom 3100, 327 S. Church St., Rockford, IL 61101, or Using Zoom - Judge Lynch.. Signed on 10/25/2023. (Kuczynski, Mimi)
Related: [-] 22 Summary Judgment
32 32 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 10/25 3:26 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 11/08/2023 at 11:00 AM at Appear in Courtroom 3100, 327 S. Church St., Rockford, IL 61101, or Using Zoom - Judge Lynch.. Signed on 10/25/2023. (Kuczynski, Mimi)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
31 31 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 10/04 4:25 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. hearing scheduled for 10/25/2023 at 11:00 AM at Appear in Courtroom 3100, 327 S. Church St., Rockford, IL 61101, or Using Zoom - Judge Lynch.. Signed on 10/04/2023. (Clarke, Jody)
Related: [-] 22 Summary Judgment
30 30 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 10/04 4:25 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 10/25/2023 at 11:00 AM at Appear in Courtroom 3100, 327 S. Church St., Rockford, IL 61101, or Using Zoom - Judge Lynch, , , .. Signed on 10/04/2023. (Clarke, Jody)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, August 16, 2023
29 29 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 08/16 4:46 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. hearing scheduled for 10/04/2023 at 11:00 AM at Appear in Courtroom 3100, 327 S. Church St., Rockford, IL 61101, or Using Zoom - Judge Lynch.. Signed on 08/16/2023. (Kuczynski, Mimi)
Related: [-] 22 Summary Judgment
28 28 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 08/16 4:46 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 10/04/2023 at 11:00 AM at Appear in Courtroom 3100, 327 S. Church St., Rockford, IL 61101, or Using Zoom - Judge Lynch.. Signed on 08/16/2023. (Kuczynski, Mimi)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Thursday, August 10, 2023
27 27 answer Response Thu 08/10 11:57 AM
Response to Related [+] Filed by David H Carter on behalf of Shanin J. Solt (Carter, David)
Related: [-] 24 Statement
26 26 answer Response Thu 08/10 11:55 AM
Response to Related [+] Filed by David H Carter on behalf of Shanin J. Solt (Carter, David)
Related: [-] 23 Memorandum
Thursday, July 20, 2023
25 25 notice 2-Notice of Motion Thu 07/20 5:09 PM
Notice of Motion Filed by Erin Edelman on behalf of Rabo Agrifinance LLC Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 8/16/2023 at 11:00 AM at Appear In Courtroom 3100, 327 S. Church St, Rockford, IL 61101 or Using Zoom- Judge Lynch. (Edelman, Erin)
Related: [-] 22 Motion for Summary Judgment
24 24 misc Statement Thu 07/20 4:16 PM
Statement Filed by Erin Edelman on behalf of Rabo Agrifinance LLC Related [+]. (Edelman, Erin)
Related: [-] 22 Motion for Summary Judgment
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-1.6
Att: 2 Exhibit 1.7-2
23 23 11 pgs misc Memorandum Thu 07/20 3:55 PM
Memorandum in Support Filed by Erin Edelman on behalf of Rabo Agrifinance LLC Related [+]. (Edelman, Erin)
Related: [-] 22 Motion for Summary Judgment
22 22 motion Summary Judgment Thu 07/20 3:38 PM
Notice of Motion and Partial Motion For Summary Judgment Filed by Erin Edelman on behalf of Rabo Agrifinance LLC. Hearing scheduled for 8/16/2023 at 11:00 AM at Appear In Courtroom 3100, 327 S. Church St, Rockford, IL 61101 or Using Zoom- Judge Lynch. (Edelman, Erin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
21 21 order Scheduling Wed 06/28 9:03 AM
Order Scheduling Related [+]. Discovery Cutoff 7/7/2023. Motion for summary judgment must be filed no later than July 20, 2023. Response to motion for summary judgment must be filed no later than August 10, 2023. Adversary case is continued to August 16, 2023 at 11:00 a.m. Signed on 6/28/2023 (Harris, Stephanie)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, June 21, 2023
20 20 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 06/21 3:19 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 08/16/2023 at 11:00 AM at Appear in Courtroom 3100, 327 S. Church St., Rockford, IL 61101, or Using Zoom - Judge Lynch.. Signed on 06/21/2023. (Kuczynski, Mimi)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
19 19 order Scheduling Wed 05/31 3:42 PM
Order Scheduling Related [+]. Discovery Cutoff 6/21/2023. Status hearing to be held on 6/21/2023 at 11:00 AM at Appear In Courtroom 3100, 327 S. Church St, Rockford, IL 61101 or Using Zoom- Judge Lynch. Signed on 5/31/2023 (Harris, Stephanie)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
18 18 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 05/31 3:38 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 06/21/2023 at 11:00 AM at Appear in Courtroom 3100, 327 S. Church St., Rockford, IL 61101, or Using Zoom - Judge Lynch.. Signed on 05/31/2023. (Kuczynski, Mimi)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, April 12, 2023
17 17 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 04/12 4:00 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 05/31/2023 at 11:00 AM at Appear in Courtroom 3100, 327 S. Church St., Rockford, IL 61101, or Using Zoom - Judge Lynch.. Signed on 04/12/2023. (Kuczynski, Mimi)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Tuesday, April 11, 2023
15 15 misc Appearance Tue 04/11 9:56 AM
Appearance Filed by Julie A. Johnston-Ahlen on behalf of Rabo Agrifinance LLC. (Johnston-Ahlen, Julie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 23, 2023
14 14 misc Discovery Thu 03/23 12:59 PM
Discovery Disclosures Filed by David H Carter on behalf of Shanin J. Solt. (Carter, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
13 13 misc Discovery Wed 03/22 2:05 PM
Discovery / INITIAL DISCLOSURES OF PLAINTIFF PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 26(A)(1), AS MADE APPLICABLE BY BANKRUPTCY RULE 7026 Filed by Erin Edelman on behalf of Rabo Agrifinance LLC. (Edelman, Erin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2023
16 16 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/12 10:06 AM
(E) Order Granting Motion for Leave To Appear Pro Hac Vice Related [+]. Signed on 3/16/2023. (Gossett, Valerie)
Related: [-] 12
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
12 12 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/15 2:39 PM
Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed by Erin Edelman on behalf of Rabo Agrifinance LLC. (Edelman, Erin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
11 11 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 03/08 3:02 PM
(E)Hearing Continued Related [+]. Status hearing scheduled for 04/12/2023 at 11:00 AM at Appear in Courtroom 3100, 327 S. Church St., Rockford, IL 61101, or Using Zoom - Judge Lynch.. Signed on 03/08/2023. (Kuczynski, Mimi)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
10 10 answer Answer Wed 03/01 11:24 AM
Answer Related [+] Filed by David H Carter on behalf of Shanin J. Solt (Carter, David)
Related: [-] 9 Appearance
9 9 misc Appearance Wed 03/01 11:22 AM
Appearance Filed by David H Carter on behalf of Shanin J. Solt. (Carter, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 01, 2023
8 8 utility U - Corrective Entry Wed 02/01 12:04 PM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY to correct docket text Related [+]. (Gossett, Valerie)
Related: [-] 6 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet
Tuesday, January 31, 2023
7 7 utility U - Corrective Entry Tue 01/31 2:30 PM
CORRECTIVE ENTRY: Incorrect nature of suit, filer notified to file an Amended Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet Related [+]. (Sullivan, Elizabeth)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
6 6 misc Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (Form 1040) Tue 01/31 2:10 PM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet Filed by Erin Edelman on behalf of Rabo Agrifinance LLC Related [+]. (Edelman, Erin) Modified on 2/1/2023 to correct docket text (Gossett, Valerie)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 01/31 1:40 PM
Summons Service Executed on Shanin J. Solt Related [+]. (Edelman, Erin)
Related: [-] 2 Summons Issued
4 4 crditcrd none Tue 01/31 12:01 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 23-96003 ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A45689733. Fee Amount $ 350.00 (Edelman, Erin) Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
3 3 misc Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (Form 1040) Tue 01/31 11:59 AM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet Filed by Erin Edelman on behalf of Rabo Agrifinance LLC Related [+]. (Edelman, Erin)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, January 30, 2023
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Mon 01/30 4:42 PM
Summons Issued on Shanin J. Solt Answer Due 03/1/2023 (Admin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 01/30 4:42 PM
Adversary case 23-96003 (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)), (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)), (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)), (65 (Dischargeability - other)): Complaint by Rabo Agrifinance LLC against Shanin J. Solt. Fee Amount $350. Status hearing to be held on 3/8/2023 at 11:00 AM at Appear In Courtroom 3100, 327 S. Church St, Rockford, IL 61101 or Using Zoom- Judge Lynch. (Edelman, Erin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
Att: 5 Exhibit 5
Att: 6 Exhibit 6
Att: 7 Exhibit 7
Att: 8 Exhibit 8
Att: 9 Exhibit 9