Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 7:22-bk-80598

Oklahoma Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Paul R Thomas
Case #: 7:23-ap-08002
Nature of Suit62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Jan 30, 2023
Terminated:Nov 29, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Dennis Earl Bettis
9421 Highway 70A
Kingston, OK 73439
Represented By
Dennis Earl Bettis
contact info
Plaintiff
Arvest Bank, Arvest Bank
POB 399
Lowell, AR 72745
Represented By
Jay Barton Williams
Williams Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 1:09 PM CDT
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
court Close Adversary Case Wed 11/29 10:09 AM
Adversary Case 7:23-ap-8002 Closed. (Foshee, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 11/16 11:17 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 11/16/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Dismissing Adversary
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
16 16 order Dismissing Adversary Tue 11/14 3:31 PM
Order Dismissing Adversary. Upon review of the case file, this Court finds that the main case was dismissed on September 7, 2023. Further, the Court finds that the deadline to submit a pretrial order has passed and no pretrial order was submitted as required by the Scheduling Order (Docket Entry 12). Therefore, in accordance with the Scheduling Order and Local Rules 7016-1 and 7041-1, this Court finds that this adversary proceeding should be dismissed. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the above-referenced adversary proceeding is hereby dismissed. (Prentice, Margaret)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Tue 11/14 3:32 PM
Disposition of Adversary 7:23-ap-8002; ADVERSARY DISMISSED Related [+]. (Prentice, Margaret)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 23-08002 Complaint by Arvest Bank against Dennis Earl Bettis. Fee Amount $350 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint) (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) filed by Plaintiff Arvest Bank
Wednesday, May 10, 2023
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 05/10 11:15 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 05/10/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Returned Mail (Adversary)
Monday, May 08, 2023
14 14 court Returned Mail (Adversary) Mon 05/08 8:17 AM
Please be advised that the clerk's office could not notice and/or serve Dennis Earl Bettis regarding Scheduling Order. (Prentice, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 15, 2023
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 04/15 11:11 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 04/15/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Scheduling Order
Thursday, April 13, 2023
12 12 order Scheduling Order Thu 04/13 3:47 PM
Scheduling Order. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Discovery shall be completed by September 30, 2023. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline for submission of dispositive motions is October 31, 2023. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a Pre-Trial Order, initiated by the Plaintiff and in accordance with the standard form, must be submitted to the Court on or before November 10, 2023. If a Pre-Trial Order or a motion for extension of time to submit a Pre-Trial Order is not timely submitted, this adversary proceeding shall be dismissed. FURTHER, no date set by this Order shall be modified except upon good cause shown and by filing a written application with a proposed Order at least five (5) days before thescheduled date. (Corley, Cheryl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 03/22 11:14 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] Notice Date 03/22/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Returned Mail (Adversary)
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
10 10 misc Subpoena Duces Tecum Tue 03/21 10:10 AM
Subpoena Duces Tecum Issued on Premiere Copier, Inc. Filed by Ron D Brown on behalf of Dennis Earl Bettis. (Brown, Ron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-Subpoena Duces Tecum
Monday, March 20, 2023
9 9 court Returned Mail (Adversary) Mon 03/20 3:57 PM
Please be advised that the clerk's office could not notice and/or serve Dennis Earl Bettis regarding Order Concerning Compliance with Rules 26(a)(l) and (f) and Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference (Prentice, Margaret)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 attachment
Friday, March 03, 2023
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 03/03 11:16 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 03/03/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order and Notice of Telephonic Scheduling Conference
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
7 7 order Telephonic Scheduling Conference Wed 03/01 2:10 PM
Order and Notice of Telephonic Scheduling Conference. Seven (7) days prior to the conference, counsel for the parties shall conduct a Rule 26(f) conference and exchange information and documents. A joint written report of the results of the conference and a discovery plan shall be filed with the court unless a Scheduling Order is submitted to the court five (5) days prior to the Scheduling Conference. CALL-IN INSTRUCTIONS: Call-in number: 888.684.8852 Access Code: 8488521 Security Code, if prompted: 1347. Once connected, please mute your microphone until the Judge calls your case. Telephonic Scheduling Conference to be conducted on 4/18/2023 11:00AM at Tele Hearing 888-684-8852 Access 8488521 Code 1347. (Prentice, Margaret)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 03/01 7:52 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Ron D Brown on behalf of Dennis Earl Bettis. (Brown, Ron)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 30, 2023
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 01/30 2:23 PM
Summons Service Executed on Dennis Earl Bettis 1/30/2023 by First Class Mail postage paid Related [+]. (Williams, Jay)
Related: [-] Notice that Adversary reviewed.
Att: 1 Complaint Summons Complaint and Exhibits Served
4 4 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Mon 01/30 1:30 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Jay Barton Williams on behalf of Arvest Bank. (Williams, Jay)
Related: [-]
3 3 crditcrd none Mon 01/30 1:24 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 23-08002 ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A3520503. Fee Amount 350.00 (Williams, Jay) (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (Auto) Mon 01/30 1:21 PM
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp ADI - Complaint Mon 01/30 1:21 PM
Adversary case 23-08002 Complaint by Arvest Bank against Dennis Earl Bettis. Fee Amount $350 (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (Williams, Jay)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint