Maryland District Court
Judge:Theodore D Chuang
Referred: Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi
Case #: 8:23-cv-00266
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Jul 30, 2023 5:18 AM EDT
Defendant
Blythewood Partners, LLC
2711 Centerville Road Suite 400
Wilmington, DE 19808
Represented By
Timothy Francis Maloney
Joseph Greenwald And Laake PA
contact info
Matthew M Bryant
Joseph Greenwald And Laake PA
contact info
Alyse Lauren Prawde
Joseph, Greenwald & Laake
contact info
Defendant
SHF Project Owner, LLC
CSC-Lawyers Incorporating Service Co. 7 St. Paul Street, Suite 820
Baltimore, MD 21202
Represented By
Timothy Francis Maloney
Joseph Greenwald And Laake PA
contact info
Matthew M Bryant
Joseph Greenwald And Laake PA
contact info
Alyse Lauren Prawde
Joseph, Greenwald & Laake
contact info
Plaintiff
MAB of Parkside Towns 6, LLC
11611 Old Georgetown Road, Second Floor
Rockville, MD 20852
Represented By
Joseph Michael Moeller, Jr.
Stein Sperling Bennett De Jong Driscoll PC
contact info
Matthew John Pavlides
Stein Sperling Bennett De Jong Driscoll PC
contact info
Jeffrey M Schwaber
Stein Sperling Bennett De Jong Driscoll PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
83 83 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 05/16 11:04 AM
ORDER granting81 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi on 5/16/2025. (da3s, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
82 82 corresp Miscellaneous Thu 05/15 9:58 PM
Correspondence re: Discovery Dispute (Prawde, Alyse)
Related: [-]
81 81 motion Extension of Time Thu 05/15 9:56 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Discovery Letter by Blythewood Partners, LLC(Prawde, Alyse)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
80 80 notice Notice of Hearing Tue 05/13 12:22 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Discovery Hearing set for 5/27/2025 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Ajmel Ahsen Quereshi. Zoom information will be provided to the parties in advance. (da3s, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
79 79 corresp Miscellaneous Mon 05/12 11:12 AM
Correspondence re: Discovery Dispute (Moeller, Joseph)
Related: [-]