Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:22-bk-31771

Oregon Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:David W Hercher
Case #: 3:23-ap-03008
Nature of Suit65 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - other
67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Jan 30, 2023
Terminated:Oct 27, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Megan Sue Fehrenbacher
10401 White Birch Lane
La Grande, OR 97850
Represented By
Megan Sue Fehrenbacher
contact info
Defendant
Mega Tiny Homes LLC
62415 Wallowa Lake Highway Building C
La Grande, OR 97850
Represented By
Mega Tiny Homes LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kiyomi Koike
Represented By
D ZACHARY HOSTETTER
contact info
Plaintiff
Sei Mee Tea, LLC
Represented By
D ZACHARY HOSTETTER
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Friday, October 27, 2023
17 17 notice Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 10/27 11:00 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal Filed By Kiyomi Koike, Sei Mee Tea, LLC (HOSTETTER, D)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Fri 10/27 3:21 PM
Adversary Case 3:23-ap-3008 Closed (krw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
16 16 court CHAP ME Pretrial Hearing Continued/Held - CHAP Wed 05/31 7:48 AM
Record of Proceeding Re Pretrial Hearing Held. Trial set for 10/30/2023 and 11/1/2023 at 9 am in courtroom 3, Portland. Hybrid video appearances of some partie approved. (smj)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 25, 2023
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Generic Thu 05/25 9:09 PM
Certificate of Notice Re:14 Returned Mail to Defendant/Plaintiff- D Zachary Hostetter (krw). (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 23, 2023
14 14 court Returned Mail to Defendant/Plaintiff Tue 05/23 4:34 PM
Returned Mail to Defendant/Plaintiff- D Zachary Hostetter (krw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 02, 2023
13 13 court CHAP ME Pretrial Hearing Continued/Held - CHAP Tue 05/02 11:44 AM
Record of Proceeding Re Pretrial Hearing Held. Further Pretrial Hearing Set for 05/30/2023 at 09:00 AM by Telephone. (smj)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 31, 2023
12 12 misc Document Tue 04/04 12:57 PM
Settlement Conference held (bls)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
11 11 court CHAP ME Pretrial Hearing Continued/Held - CHAP Tue 03/21 2:58 PM
Record of Proceeding Re Pretrial Hearing Held. Further Pretrial Hearing Set for 05/02/2023 at 09:00 AM by Telephone. (smj)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 04, 2023
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Generic Sat 03/04 9:07 PM
Certificate of Notice Re:9 Scheduling Order (krw). (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 02, 2023
9 9 order Scheduling Order Thu 03/02 4:24 PM
Scheduling Order (krw)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 03/02 2:31 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Megan Sue Fehrenbacher (KUNI, JONATHAN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 08, 2023
7 7 misc Notice of Appearance/Representation Wed 02/08 9:35 AM
Text-only Entry: Notice of Appearance/Representation Filed By Kiyomi Koike, Sei Mee Tea, LLC (DUBAY, ELEANOR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 07, 2023
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed [May use LBF 305 12/1/19] Tue 02/07 11:22 AM
Summons Served on Megan Sue Fehrenbacher 2/7/2023. (HOSTETTER, D)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 06, 2023
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed [May use LBF 305 12/1/19] Mon 02/06 8:40 AM
Summons Served on Mega Tiny Homes LLC 2/3/2023. (HOSTETTER, D)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 03, 2023
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed [May use LBF 305 12/1/19] Fri 02/03 12:15 PM
Summons Served on Kiyomi Koike 2/3/2023. (HOSTETTER, D)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 31, 2023
3 3 court Summons Issued Tue 01/31 12:42 PM
Summons Issued for service on Megan Sue Fehrenbacher Answer Due 3/2/2023; Mega Tiny Homes LLC Answer Due 3/2/20231 Complaint Pretrial Hearing Set for 3/21/2023 at 09:00 AM by Telephone Hearing. (jbk)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 30, 2023
2 2 crditcrd none Mon 01/30 5:51 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Complaint([LINK 23-03008 dwh] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A20660525. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 01/30 5:49 PM
Adversary case 23-03008 Complaint by Kiyomi Koike, Sei Mee Tea, LLC against Megan Sue Fehrenbacher, Mega Tiny Homes LLC. $350 Filing Fee. Nature of Suit:(62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)),(65 (Dischargeability - other))(HOSTETTER, D)
Related: [-]