New York Southern District Court
Judge:Vincent L Briccetti
Case #: 7:23-cv-00806
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1441ea Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Jul 30, 2023 5:50 AM EDT
Defendant
Bon Secours Community Hospital
Represented By
Daniel David Schudroff
Jackson Lewis P.C. (ny)
contact info
Shevonne Greene
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Leo Ernst
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Lyn Wessels
Represented By
Daniel David Schudroff
Jackson Lewis P.C. (ny)
contact info
Shevonne Greene
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Leo Ernst
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Samantha DeJesus
Represented By
Siobhan E. C. Klassen
Goddard Law PLLC
contact info
Megan Sarah Goddard
Goddard Law PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
77 77 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/09 5:09 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Cheri Quigley on behalf of Samantha DeJesus..(Quigley, Cheri)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
76 76 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/08 5:51 PM
ORDER granting75 Motion for Cheri A. Chestnut to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Cheri A. Chestnut, Esq. is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 4/8/2025) (ar)
Related: [-]
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Tue 04/08 10:43 AM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 75 FIRST MOTION for Cheri A. Chestnut to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-30894037. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (rju)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
75 75 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/07 6:58 PM
FIRST MOTION for Cheri A. Chestnut to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-30894037. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Samantha DeJesus..(Goddard, Megan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Cheri Chestnut's Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 2 Exhibit A. Certificates of Good Standing From Louisiana and South Carolina,
Att: 3 Proposed Order For Admission Pro Hac Vice