New York Southern District Court
Judge:Cathy Seibel
Case #: 7:22-cv-10560
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Dec 12, 2022
Terminated:Jun 11, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 01, 2023 9:44 PM EST
Defendant
Damian Cruz
Defendant
Courtney E. Ferris
Defendant
Timothy D. Fitzpatrick
Defendant
George Gilmore, Sr.
Defendant
George Gilmore, Jr.
Defendant
Adam Hauser
Defendant
Jane Morrow
Defendant
John Doe
Defendant
Christopher J. Kinne
Defendant
John H. Kratz
Plaintiff
Steve Jude
17-A-0890 Five Points Correctionals Facility State Route 96 Box 119
Romulus, NY 14541


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, July 08, 2024
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Voluntary Dismissal Mon 07/08 10:27 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Amy Agnew. RE-FILE Document No. 95 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The document filed is not for this Court. Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed PDF. (km)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
95 95 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 07/03 1:54 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Damian Cruz, Courtney E. Ferris, Timothy D. Fitzpatrick, George Gilmore, Sr, George Gilmore, Jr, Adam Hauser, Paul Holland, Christopher J. Kinne, John H. Kratz, Virginia Morrow and without costs. Document filed by Steve Jude. Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. ..(Agnew, Amy)
Related: [-]