Women's Health Center of West Virginia et al v. Sheth et al
West Virginia Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Irene C Berger |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-00079 |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Cause | 28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Feb 01, 2023 |
Terminated: | Apr 17, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 01, 2023 8:05 AM EDT |
Defendant
Matthew Christiansen
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ashish P. Sheth
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Plaintiff
State of West Virginia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dr. John Doe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Women's Health Center of West Virginia
|
Represented By
|
1. | ACLU Drops Federal Lawsuit Against W.Va. Abortion Ban (wvpublic.org) |
Submitted Tue 04/18/2023 | |
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, April 17, 2023 | ||
52 | 52
notice
Notice Of Voluntary Dismissal - Rule 41
Mon 04/17 8:30 AM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Without Prejudice by John Doe, Women's Health Center of West Virginia pursuant to Rule 41, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Pomponio, Bren) |
|
Monday, April 10, 2023 | ||
51 | 51
27
pgs
respm
Memorandum In Opposition
Mon 04/10 3:48 PM
MEMORANDUM by John Doe, Women's Health Center of West Virginia in opposition to43 MOTION by State of West Virginia to Dismiss1 Complaint (Pomponio, Bren) |