Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:21-bk-41019

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Thomas J Tucker
Case #: 2:23-ap-04052
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Feb 02, 2023
Terminated:Apr 10, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Rex Lowe Enterprises, LLC
Represented By
Rex Lowe Enterprises, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Rex Lowe
Represented By
Rex Lowe
contact info
Plaintiff
Karen E. Evangelista
Represented By
Matthew Boyd
The Taunt Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Wednesday, June 14, 2023
14 14 2 pgs misc Garnishee Disclosure Wed 06/14 1:05 PM
Garnishee Disclosure Re: Filed by Bank of America . (ts)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
13 13 1 pgs misc Request and Writ of Garnishment Wed 05/03 1:49 PM
Request And Writ For Garnishment (Nonperiodic) Directed To: JPMorgan Chase N.A. (ckata)
Related: [-]
12 12 1 pgs misc Request and Writ of Garnishment Wed 05/03 1:47 PM
Request And Writ For Garnishment (Nonperiodic) Directed To: Bank of America (ckata)
Related: [-]
11 11 1 pgs misc Request and Writ of Garnishment Wed 05/03 1:45 PM
Request And Writ For Garnishment (Nonperiodic), Directed To: Guaranty Bank & Trust, N.A. (ckata)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 12, 2023
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 04/13 12:22 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/12/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Clerk's Entry of Default
Monday, April 10, 2023
9 9 3 pgs order Default Judgment Mon 04/10 4:02 PM
Default Judgment Against Defendants Rex Lowe Enterprises, LLC And Rex Lowe Related [+]. (kcm)
Related: [-] 8 Motion
8 8 motion Default Judgment Mon 04/10 3:25 PM
Motion for Default Judgment against Defendants Rex Lowe Enterprises, LLC and Rex Lowe Filed by Plaintiff Karen E. Evangelista (Boyd, Matthew)
Related: [-]
7 7 court Clerk's Entry of Default Mon 04/10 8:49 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default of Rex Lowe, Rex Lowe Enterprises, LLC - Default Judgment Motion due by 4/24/2023. (kcm)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Mon 04/10 4:03 PM
Disposition of Adversary 2:23-ap-4052 : Granted by Default Judgment. (kcm)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Mon 04/10 4:04 PM
Adversary Case 2:23-ap-4052 Closed. (kcm)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 03, 2023
6 6 order stipulated order Fri 03/03 4:26 PM
Order Extending Complaint Response Deadline. Related [+]. (kcm)
Related: [-] 5 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Karen E. Evangelista
5 5 misc Stipulation Fri 03/03 8:44 AM
Stipulation By and Between Plaintiff and Defendants Re: to Extend Complaint Response Deadline . Filed by Plaintiff Karen E. Evangelista. (Boyd, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 07, 2023
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 02/07 10:44 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Karen E. Evangelista. (Nelson, Dean)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 02, 2023
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 02/02 12:54 PM
Summons Service Executed on Rex Lowe 2/2/2023; Rex Lowe Enterprises, LLC 2/2/2023 (Boyd, Matthew)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Thu 02/02 12:42 PM
Summons Issued on Rex Lowe Enterprises, LLC Answer Due 03/6/2023; Rex Lowe Answer Due 03/6/2023 (Boyd, Matthew)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 02/02 12:42 PM
Adversary case 23-04052 (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Karen E. Evangelista against Rex Lowe Enterprises, LLC, Rex Lowe. Receipt Number deferred, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Boyd, Matthew)
Related: [-]