Texas Northern District Court
Judge:David C Godbey
Case #: 3:23-cv-00242
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Feb 02, 2023
Terminated:Jul 21, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 01, 2023 7:13 AM CDT
Defendant
Dwyght Mack
1016 Chipola Road
Fort Pierce, FL 34950
Represented By
Shauna A Izadi
Izadi Legal Group PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Mack's Move Management LLC
4285 SW Martin Suite 107
Palm City, FL 34490
Represented By
Shauna A Izadi
Izadi Legal Group PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Mack's Moving Company LLC
4 Center Court
Green Island, NY 12183
Represented By
Shauna A Izadi
Izadi Legal Group PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Mack's Relocation & Storage LLC
4285 SW Martin Suite 107
Palm City, FL 34490
Represented By
Shauna A Izadi
Izadi Legal Group PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Mack's Training LLC
4 Center Court
Green Island, NY 12183
Represented By
Shauna A Izadi
Izadi Legal Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
SmartMoving Software LLC
12720 Hillcrest Road Suite 980
Dallas, TX 75230
Represented By
Mark J Dyer
Martin Disiere Jefferson & Wisdom
contact info
Maria Wyckoff Boyce
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Jillian C Beck
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Lacy Brown
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Cristina Espinosa Rodriguez
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, July 21, 2023
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Fri 07/21 4:14 PM
NOTICE of Dismissal without Prejudice filed by SmartMoving Software LLC (Boyce, Maria)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case (Optional) Mon 07/24 9:51 AM
Civil Case Terminated per11 Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice. (ndt)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2023
10 10 misc Status Report Mon 07/17 12:45 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT filed by SmartMoving Software LLC. (Boyce, Maria)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 29, 2023
9 9 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 05/29 11:00 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Defendants response to the complaint is due June 2, 2023. (Ordered by Chief District Judge David C Godbey on 5/29/2023) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 26, 2023
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 05/26 4:40 PM
Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Dwyght Mack, Mack's Move Management LLC, Mack's Moving Company LLC, Mack's Relocation & Storage LLC, Mack's Training LLC (Izadi, Shauna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Extension
Friday, May 12, 2023
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 05/12 3:44 PM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re4 First Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer ,1 Complaint. The Court orders that Defendants must answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by due 5/26/2023. (Ordered by Chief District Judge David C Godbey on 5/12/2023) (ykp)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 05, 2023
6 6 respm Reply Fri 05/05 6:27 PM
REPLY filed by Dwyght Mack, Mack's Move Management LLC, Mack's Moving Company LLC, Mack's Relocation & Storage LLC, Mack's Training LLC re:4 First Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer (Izadi, Shauna)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order proposed Order
5 5 respm Response/Objection Fri 05/05 4:46 PM
RESPONSE filed by SmartMoving Software LLC re:4 First Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer (Boyce, Maria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
4 4 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 05/05 2:14 PM
First Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Dwyght Mack, Mack's Move Management LLC, Mack's Moving Company LLC, Mack's Relocation & Storage LLC, Mack's Training LLC Attorney Shauna A Izadi added to party Dwyght Mack(pty:dft), Attorney Shauna A Izadi added to party Mack's Move Management LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Shauna A Izadi added to party Mack's Moving Company LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Shauna A Izadi added to party Mack's Relocation & Storage LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Shauna A Izadi added to party Mack's Training LLC(pty:dft) (Izadi, Shauna)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 02, 2023
3 3 qcref Godbey Fri 02/03 9:35 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (acm)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Thu 02/02 3:28 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by SmartMoving Software LLC. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Boyce, Maria) Modified text on 2/2/2023 (acm)
Related: [-]
1 1 24 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 02/02 3:04 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by SmartMoving Software LLC. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number ATXNDC-13489016) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Boyce, Maria) Modified text on 2/2/2023 (acm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) C,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) D,
Att: 5 Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet