Washington Western District Court
Judge:Kymberly K Evanson
Case #: 2:23-cv-00158
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Case Filed:Feb 02, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 01, 2023 4:53 AM PDT
Defendant
Secret Harbor
Represented By
Tristan Noel Swanson
Miller Nash Llp (sea)
contact info
Plaintiff
Markel Insurance Company
Represented By
James Edward Horne
Forsberg & Umlauf (sea)
contact info
Carl Edward Forsberg
Forsberg & Umlauf (sea)
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
82 82 2 pgs order Order on Stipulated Motion ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 05/07 3:14 PM
ORDER granting the Parties'81 Stipulated Motion for Civil Trial Scheduling Order. The Court GRANTS the parties' motion (Dkt. No.81 ) and ORDERS that this case shall conform to the following case schedule: Amended Pleadings due by 7/1/2025, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 8/25/2025, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 9/24/2025, Discovery Motions due by 9/24/2025, Discovery completed by 10/24/2025, Dispositive motions due by 11/23/2025, Settlement Conference, if mediation has been requested by the parties per LCR 39.1, held no later than 1/23/2026, Proposed jury instructions and agreed LCR 16.1 Pretrial Order due, including exhibit list with completed authenticity, admissibility, and objections fields 3/2/2026, Trial briefs, joint brief on motions in limine, proposed voir dire questions, and deposition designations due 3/9/2026. Jury Trial is set for 3/23/2026 at 09:30 AM before District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (APH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
81 81 motion Stipulated Motion Tue 05/06 4:30 PM
Stipulated MOTION FOR CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER , filed by Defendant Secret Harbor. Noting Date 5/6/2025, (Mount, Carolyn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order