Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Hope T Cannon
Case #: 3:23-cv-02808
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:Feb 02, 2023
Last checked: Friday Aug 04, 2023 4:48 AM EDT
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Plaintiff
MATT KRAIL
Represented By
JOHN J FOLEY
Simmons Hanly Conroy - Alton Il
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
5 5 2 pgs order Order Wed 03/15 10:24 AM
ORDER - The motions to amend complaints identified on Exhibit A are DENIED without prejudice with leave to re-file following the Eleventh Circuit's decision. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the individual dockets. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/15/2023. (djb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Friday, March 03, 2023
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Fri 03/03 8:49 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:4 MOTION to Amend Complaint (3) Amended Complaint. (no response) (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 16, 2023
4 4 motion Amend/Correct - for Requesting Leave of Court to Amend Thu 02/16 12:35 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct3 Amended Complaint by MATT KRAIL. (FOLEY, JOHN)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 02/16 12:33 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3M COMPANY, filed by MATT KRAIL. (FOLEY, JOHN)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 02/17 10:19 AM
Set Deadlines as to4 MOTION to Amend (3) Amended Complaint (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 3/2/2023) . (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 02, 2023
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 02/02 2:49 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (FOLEY, JOHN)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 02/02 2:47 PM
COMPLAINT against MATT KRAIL ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7676973.), filed by MATT KRAIL. (FOLEY, JOHN)
Related: [-]