California Northern District Court
Judge:Jon S Tigar
Case #: 4:23-cv-00210
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Interpleader Action
Case Filed:Jan 17, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Jul 16, 2023 2:20 AM PDT
Defendant
The Christine Cheng-Yee 2016 Irrevocable Trust
Represented By
Peter E. Nissly
Hopkins & Carley
contact info
Steven A. Ellenberg
Ellenberg & Hull
contact info
Defendant
Cheryl Yee
4836 Springdale Drive
San Jose, CA 95129
Represented By
Peter E. Nissly
Hopkins & Carley
contact info
Steven A. Ellenberg
Ellenberg & Hull
contact info
Plaintiff
Columbus Life Insurance Company
Represented By
Kimberly Michelle Ingram
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info
Kimberly Michelle Ingram-Hogan
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
The Estate of Christine Cheng-Yee, Deceased
Terminated: 05/20/2023

GPO Apr 24 2024
ORDER GRANTING COLUMBUS LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting 40 Motion for Attorney Fees.(mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2024)

Docket last updated: 05/01/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
61 61 misc Joint Case Management Statement Tue 04/29 1:52 PM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Cheryl Yee. (Nissly, Peter)
Related: [-]