Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-13283

Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:David D Cleary
Case #: 1:23-ap-00020
Nature of Suit68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Feb 02, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Michael W Swain
2045 Highland Ave
Wilmette, IL 60091
Represented By
Michael W Swain
contact info
Plaintiff
Ryan Dennis
984 Cherry Street
Winnetka, IL 60093
Represented By
Adam Hirsch
Roetzel & Andress
contact info
Plaintiff
Kristen Dennis
984 Cherry Street
Winnetka, IL 60093
Represented By
Adam Hirsch
Roetzel & Andress
contact info

GPO Jan 17 2025
Memorandum Opinion (RE: 51 Motion for Summary Judgment). (Green, Ron)

Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 1:06 PM CDT
Monday, April 14, 2025
79 79 misc Brief Mon 04/14 3:22 PM
Brief Pretrial Filed by David P Lloyd on behalf of Michael W Swain. (Lloyd, David)
Related: [-]
78 78 misc Brief Mon 04/14 1:48 PM
Brief PLAINTIFFS PRETRIAL Filed by Adam Hirsch on behalf of Kristen Dennis, Ryan Dennis. (Hirsch, Adam)
Related: [-]
77 77 misc Pretrial Statement Mon 04/14 1:43 PM
Joint Pretrial Statement Filed by Adam Hirsch on behalf of Kristen Dennis, Ryan Dennis. (Hirsch, Adam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
76 76 answer Response Tue 04/08 1:41 PM
Response to Related [+] Filed by Adam Hirsch on behalf of Kristen Dennis, Ryan Dennis (Hirsch, Adam)
Related: [-] 71 List of Witnesses, List of Exhibits
75 75 answer Objection Tue 04/08 11:11 AM
Objection to Related [+] Filed by David P Lloyd on behalf of Michael W Swain (Lloyd, David)
Related: [-] 74 List of Exhibits