Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Carl J Barbier
Referred: Eva J Dossier
Case #: 2:23-cv-00442
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Feb 03, 2023
Terminated:Apr 24, 2024
Case in other court:Civil District Court, Parish of Orleans, 22-08262
Last checked: Friday Aug 04, 2023 4:21 AM CDT
Defendant
QBE Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By
Robert I. Siegel
Gieger, Laborde & Laperouse, Llc (new Orleans)
contact info
Leo Raymond McAloon, III
Gieger, Laborde & Laperouse, Llc (new Orleans)
contact info
Jody McMillan
Gieger, Laborde & Laperouse
contact info
Interested Party
Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Represented By
Francis Joseph Lobrano
Carver, Darden, Koretzky, Tessier, Finn, Blossman & Areaux
contact info
Plaintiff
Adam Barth
Represented By
Galen M. Hair
Hair Shunnarah Trial Attorneys, LLC
contact info
Gretchen Liljeberg Casey
Hair Shunnarah Trial Attorneys
contact info
Plaintiff
Cheryl Barth
Represented By
Galen M. Hair
Hair Shunnarah Trial Attorneys, LLC
contact info
Gretchen Liljeberg Casey
Hair Shunnarah Trial Attorneys
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
27 27 21 pgs order Order Tue 01/07 9:56 AM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS: ORDER Regarding Settlement of Former MMA Cases. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/19/2024.(lag)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
26 26 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Case Wed 04/24 4:10 PM
ORDER granting25 Motion to Dismiss Case. All claims in the above-captioned matter are DISMISSED, with prejudice, and with each party to bear its own costs. Signed by Judge Carl J Barbier on 4/24/24. (cg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
25 25 motion Dismiss Case Tue 04/23 12:12 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Case by QBE Specialty Insurance Company.(Smith, Zachary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, April 12, 2024
24 24 30+ pgs order Order Transferring Case Fri 04/12 3:25 PM
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Magistrate Judge Eva J. Dossier. Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 04/12/2024.(lag)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Intervene Mon 03/25 11:46 AM
ORDER granting20 Motion to Intervene. Gretchen Liljeberg, Galen M. Hair, and the law firm of Hair Shunnarah Trial Attorneys d/b/a Insurance Claim Lawyers, Inc. d/b/a Insurance Claim HQ are permitted to intervene in this cause of action. Signed by Judge Carl J Barbier on 3/22/24. (cg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
22 22 misc Statement of Corporate Disclosure Thu 12/21 2:27 PM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Adam Barth, Cheryl Barth (Egenberg, Bradley)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
21 21 order Scheduling Order Wed 12/20 3:22 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/17/2024 02:00 PM before Judge Carl J Barbier. Jury Trial set for 11/12/2024 08:30 AM before Judge Carl J Barbier. All discovery must be completed by 9/17/2024. Signed by Judge Carl J Barbier on 12/19/23.(cg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Pretrial Notice Form
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
20 20 motion Intervene Wed 11/29 9:57 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Intervene by Hair Shunnarah Trial Attorneys.(Liljeberg, Gretchen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Proposed Pleading
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record Tue 11/28 5:05 PM
ORDER granting17 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Zachary Rhys Smith for QBE Specialty Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Carl J Barbier. (gec)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
18 18 motion Intervene Mon 11/27 9:05 AM
MOTION to Intervene by Hair Shunnarah Trial Attorneys. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/13/2023.Attorney Gretchen Elisabeth Liljeberg added to party Hair Shunnarah Trial Attorneys(pty:selreq).(Liljeberg, Gretchen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Proposed Pleading,
Att: 3 Notice of Submission
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
17 17 motion Enroll as Counsel of Record Tue 11/21 10:38 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record by QBE Specialty Insurance Company.(McMillan, Jody)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Tue 11/21 9:29 AM
ORDER granting13 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Bradley Justin Egenberg, Ben Berman, Tanner Mitchell Choate for Adam Barth, Cheryl Barth. Attorney Galen M. Hair and Gretchen Elisabeth Liljeberg terminated. Signed by Judge Carl J Barbier on 11/20/2023. (gec)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 20, 2023
15 15 1 pgs order Order Set Hearings Mon 11/20 3:11 PM
NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 12/5/2023 03:00 PM before case manager by telephone. Counsel must call into the conference at 1-(877)-848-7030, Access Code 2704006. By Clerk.(cg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
14 14 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Tue 10/24 2:56 PM
ORDER NO. 11 CERTIFYING CASES TO BE RETURNED TO THE DOCKET: Pursuant to Sections 3.D and E of CMO No. 1. in this matter, the undersigned hereby certifies that the parties in the cases listed below have complied with the requirements of the Streamlined Settlement Program and have not resolved their respective cases. Accordingly, the stay in these matters is hereby lifted and the Clerk is directed to return each case to the docket of the presiding District Judge so that it can be set for a scheduling conference. The Clerk is further directed to notify the case manager of each affected District Judge of this filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 10/23/23.(cg)(cc: Sec.J)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
13 13 motion Substitute Attorney Mon 10/23 10:13 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Tanner Choate, Ben Berman, Bradley Egenberg to be substituted in place of Galen M. Hair and Gretchen Liljeberg Casey by Adam Barth, Cheryl Barth.(Casey, Gretchen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, October 05, 2023
12 12 misc ADI event Thu 10/05 11:18 AM
Amended Exhibit A to Hurricane Ida Case Management Order. (lag)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 27, 2023
11 11 30+ pgs order Order Wed 09/27 11:16 AM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Third Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 09/14/2023.(lag)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 14, 2023
10 10 30+ pgs order Order Thu 09/14 4:09 PM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Second Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 09/12/2023.(lag)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 03, 2023
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal Fri 03/03 4:08 PM
ANSWER to1 Notice of Removal, by QBE Specialty Insurance Company.(McMillan, Jody)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 10, 2023
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 02/10 11:56 AM
ORDER granting7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to QBE Specialty Insurance Company. Answer due 3/3/2023. Signed by Judge Carl J Barbier on 2/10/23. (cg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 09, 2023
7 7 motion Extension of Time to Answer Thu 02/09 10:02 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Notice of Removal, by QBE Specialty Insurance Company.(McMillan, Jody)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Pleading
Monday, February 06, 2023
6 6 27 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Mon 02/06 11:19 AM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 10/25/22.(gec)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 03, 2023
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Fri 02/03 4:50 PM
NOTICE by QBE Specialty Insurance Company re1 Notice of Removal, Diversity Jurisdiction Statement . (McMillan, Jody)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Initial Case Assignment Fri 02/03 4:46 PM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl J Barbier and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (mb)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Statement of Corporate Disclosure Fri 02/03 4:46 PM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by QBE Specialty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent QBE Insurance Holdings Pty. Ltd., Corporate Parent QBE Insurance Group, Ltd., Corporate Parent QBE Specialty Insurance Company, Corporate Parent QBE Holdings, Inc. for QBE Specialty Insurance Company (McMillan, Jody)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Compliance Fri 02/03 4:41 PM
Notice of Compliance by QBE Specialty Insurance Company re1 Notice of Removal,. (McMillan, Jody)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 02/03 4:39 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Parish of Orleans, case number 2022-08262 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9783590) filed by QBE Specialty Insurance Company.Attorney Jody McMillan added to party QBE Specialty Insurance Company(pty:dft).(McMillan, Jody)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - State Court Record,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet