Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Thomas W Thrash, Jr
Case #: 1:23-cv-00510
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 et seq. Americans with Disabilities Act of 1990
Case Filed:Feb 02, 2023
Terminated:May 09, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 01, 2023 5:45 AM EDT
Defendant
Grand Prix Atlanta LLC
Represented By
Steven J. Flynn
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Howard Cohan
Represented By
Barry Debrow, Jr
Debrow Law P.C.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
1104 Westchase Lane Owner LLC
Terminated: 02/27/2023


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 09, 2023
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Tue 05/09 8:57 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING14 Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii) (jkb)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 05/09 9:00 AM
Civil Case Terminated. (jkb)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 08, 2023
14 14 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 05/08 4:47 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Grand Prix Atlanta LLC. (Flynn, Steven)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 05, 2023
13 13 notice Notice of Settlement Fri 05/05 3:38 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Grand Prix Atlanta LLC (Flynn, Steven)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 21, 2023
12 12 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 04/21 2:58 PM
ORDER granting11 Second MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendant GPA to Respond re:4 Amended Complaint . Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 04/21/2023. (jkb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 20, 2023
11 11 motion Extension of Time Thu 04/20 4:33 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time for Defendant GPA to Respond re:4 Amended Complaint, by Grand Prix Atlanta LLC.(Flynn, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Second Consent Motion
Thursday, March 30, 2023
10 10 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 03/30 2:10 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer the4 Amended Complaint. Grand Prix Atlanta LLC Answer due 4/24/2023. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 3/30/2023. (jeh)
Related: [-]
misc Clerks Notation for LOA/CIP Thu 03/30 2:12 PM
Clerks Notation re9 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Reviewed and approved by Judge Thrash. (jeh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 28, 2023
9 9 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 03/28 5:12 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Grand Prix Atlanta LLC identifying Other Affiliate Grand Prix Fixed Lessee LLC for Grand Prix Atlanta LLC. (Flynn, Steven)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint Tue 03/28 3:54 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re4 Amended Complaint, by Grand Prix Atlanta LLC.(Flynn, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/28 3:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven J. Flynn on behalf of Grand Prix Atlanta LLC (Flynn, Steven)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 06, 2023
6 6 service Return of Service Executed Mon 03/06 12:55 PM
Return of Service Executed by Howard Cohan. Grand Prix Atlanta LLC served on 3/3/2023, answer due 3/24/2023. (Debrow, Barry)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 28, 2023
5 5 service Electronic Summons Issued Tue 02/28 10:12 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Grand Prix Atlanta LLC. (jkb)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 24, 2023
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 02/24 12:52 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against 1104 Westchase Lane Owner LLC filed by Howard Cohan.(Debrow, Barry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
Friday, February 17, 2023
3 3 service Return of Service Executed Fri 02/17 5:44 PM
Return of Service Executed by Howard Cohan. 1104 Westchase Lane Owner LLC served on 2/16/2013, answer due 3/9/2013. (Debrow, Barry)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 02, 2023
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Fri 02/03 11:43 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to 1104 Westchase Lane Owner LLC. (pdt)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 02/03 11:39 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Howard Cohan. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-12363186)(pdt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet