Original Case: 3:13-cv-01763

Federal Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:15-cvpri-01011
Typecivil private
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Case Filed:Oct 03, 2014
Terminated:Jun 15, 2015
Last checked: Thursday Sep 03, 2015 8:47 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
THE BIMECO GROUP, INC.
Represented By
Vicki Elizabeth Farrar
Catheter Connections
contact info
Edward F. O'Connor I
Avyno Law, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
IVERA MEDICAL CORPORATION
Represented By
Jonathan Hangartner
X-Patents, APC
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/03/2015 8:26 AM EDT
Friday, October 03, 2014
1 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 09/27/2014. [187697] Entry of Appearance due 10/17/2014. Certificate of Interest is due on 10/17/2014. Docketing Statement due 10/17/2014. Appellant/Petitioner's brief is due 12/02/2014.
Related: [-]