Connecticut District Court
Case #: 3:23-mj-00011
Case Filed:Jan 06, 2023
Terminated:Jan 06, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Feb 05, 2023 2:25 AM EST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Geoffrey M. Stone
U.S. Attorney'S Office - Htfd
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
James Rhodes (1)
Terminated: 01/06/2023
Represented By
Cody Nolan Guarnieri
Brown Paindiris & Scott, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/05/2023 2:43 AM EST
Friday, January 06, 2023
Self-Surrender (Rule 5) of James Rhodes (Wood, R.)
Related: [-]
1 1 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Thomas O. Farrish:Initial Appearance in Rule 5 Proceedings as to James Rhodes held on 1/6/2023, Appearance entered by Cody Nolan Guarnieri for James Rhodes on behalf of defendant., Bond Hearing as to James Rhodes held on 1/6/2023. Time 24 minutes(Court Reporter Court Smart.)(Wood, R.)
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER as to James Rhodes pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 5(f) and the Due Process Protections Act, Pub. L. No.116-182, 134 Stat. 894 (Oct. 21, 2020). Signed by Judge Thomas O. Farrish on 1/6/23. (Wood, R.)
Related: [-]
3 3 WAIVER of Rule 5 & 5.1 Hearings by James Rhodes (Wood, R.)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER REQUIRING A DEFENDANT TO APPEAR IN THE DISTRICT WHERE CHARGES ARE PENDING AND TRANSFERRING BAIL as to James Rhodes. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Farrish on 1/6/23. (Wood, R.)
Related: [-]
5 5 USM Return of Service on Arrest Warrant executed as to James Rhodes on 1/6/2023 (Wood, R.)
Related: [-]
6 6 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL as to James Rhodes - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Farrish on 1/6/23. (Wood, R.)
Related: [-]
7 7 Unsecured Surety Bond Entered as to James Rhodes in amount of $50,000.00. (Wood, R.)
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to James Rhodes. Signed by Judge Thomas O. Farrish on 1/6/23. (Wood, R.)
Related: [-]
9 9 SEALED BAIL INFORMATION SHEET by James Rhodes (Wood, R.)
Related: [-]
10 10 SEALED SURETY INFORMATION SHEET by James Rhodes (Wood, R.)
Related: [-]
11 11 SEALED SURETY INFORMATION SHEET by James Rhodes (Wood, R.)
Related: [-]
12 12 Notice to District of South Dakota of a Rule 5 or Rule 32 Initial Appearance as to James Rhodes; Your case number is: 5:22-CR-50187. Using your PACER account please retrieve any necessary documents. The clerk will transmit restricted documents via email. (If you require certified copies of any documents, please send a request to InterdistrictTransfer_CTD@ctd.uscourts.gov.) (Wood, R.)
Related: [-]