Florida Northern District Court
Judge:Allen C Winsor
Referred: Michael J Frank
Case #: 4:23-cv-00059
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Feb 05, 2023
Terminated:May 01, 2023
Last checked: Friday Aug 04, 2023 5:08 AM EDT
Defendant
BIG BEND COMMUNITY BASED CARE INC
Represented By
ROBERT B BUCHANAN
Buchanan & Buchanan Pa - Ocala Fl
contact info
Plaintiff
BLAIR WULFEKUHL
Represented By
NOAH E STORCH
Richard Celler Legal Pa - Davie Fl
contact info
ANDRES KROBOTH
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, May 01, 2023
12 12 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Mon 05/01 9:30 AM
ORDER CLOSING THE FILE re joint stipulation of dismissal with prejudice. ECF No. 11 . This order confirms that the case has been dismissed. The clerk will close the file. Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 5/1/2023. (atm)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 28, 2023
11 11 2 pgs misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 04/28 11:13 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by BLAIR WULFEKUHL. (STORCH, NOAH)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 06, 2023
10 10 order Scheduling Order Mon 03/06 2:42 PM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 3/6/23. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 3/20/2023 . Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/3/2023 . Discovery due by 8/28/2023 . Trial set for 1/9/2024 at 08:30 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR. (tss)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
9 9 12 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Wed 03/01 9:46 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by BIG BEND COMMUNITY BASED CARE INC. (BUCHANAN, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 14, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/14 8:46 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT B BUCHANAN on behalf of BIG BEND COMMUNITY BASED CARE INC (BUCHANAN, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 09, 2023
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 02/09 8:38 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by BLAIR WULFEKUHL. BIG BEND COMMUNITY BASED CARE INC served on 2/7/2023, answer due 2/28/2023. (STORCH, NOAH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 07, 2023
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/07 11:35 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by ANDRES KROBOTH on behalf of BLAIR WULFEKUHL (KROBOTH, ANDRES)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Tue 02/07 11:35 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by BLAIR WULFEKUHL. (STORCH, NOAH)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Tue 02/07 11:34 AM
NOTICE of Pendency of Other Actions by BLAIR WULFEKUHL (STORCH, NOAH)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 06, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 02/06 2:43 PM
Summons Issued as to BIG BEND COMMUNITY BASED CARE INC. (atm)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 05, 2023
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 02/06 2:29 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (atm)
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs cmp Complaint Sun 02/05 6:52 PM
COMPLAINT against Big Bend Community Based Care Inc ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-7680912.), filed by Blair Wulfekuhl. (STORCH, NOAH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet