Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Karoline Mehalchick
Case #: 3:23-cv-00194
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Feb 06, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Aug 05, 2023 6:13 AM EDT
Defendant
GTC Logistics, Inc.
Represented By
Stephen J Alexander
Capehart Scatchard
contact info
Edward F Kuhn, III
Capehart Scatchard
contact info
Defendant
Sabuhi Hasanli
Represented By
Stephen J Alexander
Capehart Scatchard
contact info
Edward F Kuhn, III
Capehart Scatchard
contact info
Plaintiff
Brian Elliott
Represented By
Job Stepanski
Fellerman & Ciarimboli Law P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Cassandra Yenchik
Represented By
Job Stepanski
Fellerman & Ciarimboli Law P.C.
contact info

GPO Jan 21 2025
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re 27 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GTC Logistics, Inc., Sabuhi Hasanli, 26 MOTION for Leave to File An Amended Answer filed by GTC Logistics, Inc., Sabuhi Hasanli Signed by Honorable Karoline Mehalchick on 1/21/2025. (cw)

Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 01, 2025
46 46 1 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings 1 - Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines Thu 05/01 2:04 PM
ORDER - that the telephonic status conference call scheduled for Wednesday, May 14, 2025 at 8:30 AM is CANCELED. Signed by Honorable Karoline Mehalchick on 5/1/2025. (cw)
Related: [-]
45 45 misc Letter Thu 05/01 12:18 PM
Letter from Edward F. Kuhn, III, Esq. requesting rescheduling of status conference due to mediation date . (Kuhn, Edward)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
44 44 order Scheduling Order Wed 02/12 1:39 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 5/14/2025 08:30 AM before Honorable Karoline Mehalchick. Signed by Honorable Karoline Mehalchick on 2/12/2025. (cw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
42 42 order Scheduling Order Tue 02/04 3:34 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 2/12/2025 01:30 PM before Honorable Karoline Mehalchick. Signed by Honorable Karoline Mehalchick on 2/4/2025. (cw)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Tue 02/04 3:33 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Doc 42 deleted and will be refiled. (cw)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
41 41 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 01/24 1:23 PM
Amended ANSWER to1 Complaint by GTC Logistics, Inc., Sabuhi Hasanli.(Kuhn, Edward)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
40 40 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Tue 01/21 11:28 AM
ORDER granting26 Motion for Leave to File; denying27 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Honorable Karoline Mehalchick on 1/21/2025 (cw)
Related: [-]
39 39 16 pgs order Memorandum (Order to follow as separate docket entry) Tue 01/21 11:27 AM
MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re27 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GTC Logistics, Inc., Sabuhi Hasanli,26 MOTION for Leave to File An Amended Answer filed by GTC Logistics, Inc., Sabuhi Hasanli Signed by Honorable Karoline Mehalchick on 1/21/2025. (cw)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
38 38 1 pgs order Order Mon 09/09 7:36 PM
CIVIL PRACTICE ORDER - Use of Generative Artificial Intelligence ("AI"). See Order for details. Signed by Honorable Karoline Mehalchick on 9/9/2024. (cd)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
37 37 respm Reply Brief Fri 08/09 11:07 AM
REPLY BRIEF re27 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GTC Logistics, Inc., Sabuhi Hasanli.(Kuhn, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit M,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit N,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit O
Friday, July 26, 2024
36 36 misc Response (Do not use this event if your document is a Brief) Fri 07/26 10:32 PM
RESPONSE by Cassandra Yenchik to27 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Stepanski, Job)
Related: [-]
35 35 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment Fri 07/26 10:27 PM
BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re27 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Cassandra Yenchik.(Stepanski, Job)
Related: [-]
34 34 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Briefs Fri 07/26 11:46 AM
ORDER granting32 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re32 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed,27 MOTION for Summary Judgment Brief in Opposition due by 7/26/2024 Signed by Honorable Karoline Mehalchick on 7/26/2024 (cw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
33 33 misc Document Filed Thu 07/25 8:39 AM
Proposed Order by Cassandra Yenchik.32 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed July 24, 2024 . (Stepanski, Job)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Thu 07/25 8:15 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Atty Stepanski is asked to file a proposed order for the motion for extension of time (Doc. 32). Counsel shall file the proposed order as a document filed not as another motion for extension of time. (cw)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Thu 07/25 11:00 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Atty Kuhn is asked to file a certificate of concurrence/non concurrence for the motion for leave to file an amended answer. (cw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
32 32 motion Extension of Time to File Brief to a Motion Wed 07/24 1:10 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Cassandra Yenchik.(Stepanski, Job)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
31 31 respm Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment Mon 07/15 1:13 PM
BRIEF IN SUPPORT re27 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GTC Logistics, Inc., Sabuhi Hasanli.(Kuhn, Edward)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Mon 07/15 9:19 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Documents 29 & 30 terminated as these documents are not motions but certificates that the Court directed counsel to file in relation to the pending motions (Docs. 26 & 27). (cw)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Mon 07/15 9:24 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Kuhn is asked to refile the brief in support to the motion for summary judgment, which is attached to the motion, as a separate document. Brief in Support is found under other responses and replies. (cw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
30 30 motion Amend/Correct Wed 07/10 2:01 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct27 MOTION for Summary Judgment Attorney Certification by GTC Logistics, Inc., Sabuhi Hasanli.(Kuhn, Edward)
Related: [-]
29 29 motion Amend/Correct Wed 07/10 1:59 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct26 MOTION for Leave to File An Amended Answer Certification of Attorney by GTC Logistics, Inc., Sabuhi Hasanli.(Kuhn, Edward)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 05, 2024
28 28 order Verbal Order (Not Ruling on Motions) Fri 07/05 12:12 PM
VERBAL ORDER: Counsel for Defendants is directed to file a certificate of concurrence or nonconcurrence for each of his motions (Doc. 26 and Doc. 27 ) in accordance with Local Rule 7.1. (jkc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
27 27 1 pgs motion Summary Judgment Wed 07/03 1:52 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by GTC Logistics, Inc., Sabuhi Hasanli.(Kuhn, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Proposed Order,
Att: 2 5 pgs Statement,
Att: 3 13 pgs Brief,
Att: 4 Certificate of Service,
Att: 5 27 pgs Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) B,
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) C,
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) D,
Att: 9 Exhibit(s) E,
Att: 10 Exhibit(s) F,
Att: 11 Exhibit(s) G,
Att: 12 Exhibit(s) H,
Att: 13 Exhibit(s) I,
Att: 14 Exhibit(s) J,
Att: 15 Exhibit(s) K,
Att: 16 Exhibit(s) L
26 26 motion Leave to File Document Wed 07/03 1:37 PM
MOTION for Leave to File An Amended Answer by GTC Logistics, Inc., Sabuhi Hasanli.(Kuhn, Edward)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Proposed Order,
Att: 2 3 pgs Brief,
Att: 3 Attorney Cert,
Att: 4 Certificate of Service,
Att: 5 27 pgs Exhibit(s) A,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) B,
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) C
Friday, May 03, 2024
25 25 order Scheduling Order Fri 05/03 9:32 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/3/2024. Motions due by 7/4/2024. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Honorable Karoline Mehalchick on 5/3/2024. (cw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
24 24 misc Letter Wed 05/01 2:37 PM
Letter from Edward F. Kuhn, III, Esq. regarding Discovery Extension . (Kuhn, Edward)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
order Verbal Order Reassigning Case Wed 02/07 4:31 PM
VERBAL ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - Case reassigned to Honorable Karoline Mehalchick for all further proceedings. (jw)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
23 23 order Scheduling Order Fri 02/02 11:27 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/2/2024. Plaintiff Expert Report is due by 7/5/2024. Defendant Expert Report is due by 8/1/2024. Expert Discovery Deadline is due by 8/29/2024. Motions due by 5/30/2024. Supplemental due by 8/13/2024. Signed by Chief MJ Karoline Mehalchick on 2/2/2024. (cw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
22 22 misc Letter Thu 02/01 4:32 PM
Letter from Defendants, GTCLogistics and Sabuhi Hasanli . (Alexander, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 18, 2023
21 21 order Scheduling Order Fri 08/18 8:43 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 8/29/2023. Discovery due by 2/2/2024. Plaintiff Expert Report is due by 4/5/2023. Defendant Expert Report is due by 5/3/2023. Expert Discovery Deadline is due by 5/31/2024. Motions due by 3/1/2024. Supplemental due by 5/15/2024. Signed by Chief MJ Karoline Mehalchick on 8/18/2023. (cw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 06, 2023
19 19 order Scheduling Order Thu 07/06 2:48 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 8/14/2023 12:30 PM before Chief MJ Karoline Mehalchick. Signed by Chief MJ Karoline Mehalchick on 7/6/2023. (cw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 05, 2023
18 18 1 pgs order Order - Consent to Proceed before U.S. Magistrate Judge Approved Wed 07/05 3:14 PM
CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Approved. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the Clerk of Court is directed to reassign this action to Chief Magistrate Judge Karoline Mehalchick, who is to conduct all pretrial and trial proceedings in this case. The Case Management Conference scheduled for 7/7/23 is CANCELLED. Signed by Honorable Robert D Mariani on 7/5/23. (jam)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2023
17 17 misc Letter Fri 06/30 3:22 PM
Letter from Job T. Stepanski, Esquire . (Stepanski, Job)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Case Management Plan Fri 06/30 3:11 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN (JOINT) by Cassandra Yenchik. (Stepanski, Job)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 29, 2023
15 15 discov Disclosure Report Pursuant to FRCP 26(a)3 - Pretrial Disclosures Thu 06/29 3:56 PM
DISCLOSURE REPORT by Brian Elliott, Cassandra Yenchik by Brian Elliott, Cassandra Yenchik.(Stepanski, Job)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 16, 2023
14 14 order Scheduling Order Fri 06/16 4:08 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference VIA TELEPHONE set for 7/7/2023 11:00 AM in Scranton before Honorable Robert D Mariani. The placement of the telephone conference call is the responsibility of the plaintiff. The completed Joint Case Management Plan must be filed at least 3 business days prior to the Case Management Conference. Signed by Honorable Robert D Mariani on 6/16/23. (jam)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 19, 2023
13 13 misc Reply (Do not use this event if your document is a Brief) Fri 05/19 8:53 AM
REPLY by Brian Elliott, Cassandra Yenchik. to12 Answer to Complaint REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES . (Stepanski, Job)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 12, 2023
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/12 12:49 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by GTC Logistics, Inc., Sabuhi Hasanli.(Kuhn, Edward)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 03/14 11:25 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Cassandra Yenchik, Brian Elliott. GTC Logistics, Inc. waiver sent on 3/14/2023, answer due 5/15/2023. (Stepanski, Job)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 03/14 11:24 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Cassandra Yenchik, Brian Elliott. Sabuhi Hasanli waiver sent on 3/14/2023, answer due 5/15/2023. (Stepanski, Job)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 09, 2023
9 9 misc Letter Thu 03/09 9:32 PM
Letter from Job T. Stepanski, Esquire . (Stepanski, Job)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Thu 03/09 10:55 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Edward F Kuhn, III on behalf of GTC Logistics, Inc., Sabuhi Hasanli (Kuhn, Edward)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance Thu 03/09 10:49 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen J Alexander on behalf of GTC Logistics, Inc., Sabuhi Hasanli (Alexander, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 08, 2023
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Wed 03/08 3:06 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Sabuhi Hasanli on 02 9-2023 filed by Cassandra Yenchik. (Stepanski, Job)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
5 5 misc Stipulation Wed 03/01 9:07 AM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer or Other Responsive Pleadings by GTC Logistics, Inc., Sabuhi Hasanli. (Scuteri, Sergio)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 28, 2023
4 4 service Affidavit of Service Tue 02/28 1:03 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Sabuhi Hasanli on 2 9-2023 filed by Brian Elliott, Cassandra Yenchik. (Stepanski, Job)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 07, 2023
3 3 2 pgs order Order Re: Case Assignment and Procedures Tue 02/07 1:22 PM
ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. You are directed to file a written report within 30 days as to whether service has been effected or a waiver of service obtained. Signed by Honorable Robert D Mariani on 2/7/23. (jam)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 06, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 02/06 1:50 PM
Summons Issued as to GTC Logistics, Inc., Sabuhi Hasanli and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (dw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Packet
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 02/06 1:49 PM
COMPLAINT against GTC Logistics, Inc., Sabuhi Hasanli ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-6190009), filed by Cassandra Yenchik, Brian Elliott.(dw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet