Oregon District Court
Judge:Mustafa T Kasubhai
Case #: 6:23-cv-00176
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:623 Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Feb 06, 2023
Terminated:Aug 11, 2023
Case in other court:Marion County Circuit Court, 22CV24722
Last checked: Sunday Aug 06, 2023 2:41 AM PDT
Defendant
Roseburg Forest Products Co.
Represented By
Natalie Pattison
Barran Liebman LLP
contact info
Sean P. Ray
Barran Liebman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Tracey Middlebrooks
Represented By
Angela M. Ferrer
Buchanan Angeli Altschul & Sullivan LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, August 11, 2023
9 9 order Judgment Fri 08/11 2:46 PM
JUDGMENT: Based on the record, this matter is dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) and without costs or fees to any party. (jk)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Voluntary Dismissal of Case Fri 08/11 11:58 AM
Stipulated Notice of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice . Filed by Tracey Middlebrooks. (Ferrer, Angela)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 09, 2023
order 1 - Scheduling Wed 08/09 2:37 PM
ORDER by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai: The Court having been informed by counsel for the parties that this action has been settled, IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall file final papers or a status report updating the Court on the status of settlement within 30 days from the date of this Order. Pending motions, if any, are denied as moot. All pretrial deadlines and any trial date are stricken. (jk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 28, 2023
minute Rule 16 Conference Tue 02/28 2:44 PM
MINUTES of Proceedings: Rule 16 Conference by telephone. Amended pleadings are due 9/29/2023. Discovery is to be completed by 9/29/2023. Dispositive Motions are due by 10/30/2023. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report and Pretrial Order are due 30 days after dispositive motions are ruled on or by 11/30/2023 if no dispositive motions filed. Exchange of Expert Witness Disclosures must be completed 30 days after dispositive motions are ruled on or by 11/30/2023 if no dispositive motions filed. Exchange of Rebuttal Expert Witness Statements must be completed by 1/31/2024. Expert Discovery to be completed by 2/29/2024. Angela Ferrer present as counsel for plaintiff. Sean Ray; Natalie Pattison present as counsel for defendant. Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai presiding. (FTR - Eugene Courtroom 3) (jk)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 24, 2023
order 1 - Scheduling Fri 02/24 4:08 PM
Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai: Rule 16 Conference is set for 2/28/2023 at 10:30AM in Eugene by telephone before Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. The parties are ordered to call into the Court's conference line at least 5 minutes prior to the scheduled hearing. Call-in information will be sent by e-mail the day before the hearing. Please use a land line connection without external noise. The Court prohibits speaker phones due to the greatly diminished sound quality. The parties should be prepared to discuss the status of discovery, any actual or potential discovery related conflicts, consent to a magistrate judge, potential trial dates, other issues presented by this action, and proposed modifications to the schedule outlined in the initial Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order issued by the Court at the commencement of the action. The parties additionally should be prepared to discuss Alternate Dispute Resolution (ADR) pursuant to L.R. 16.4. All deadlines are VACATED and will be reset at the Rule 16 Conference. Pronoun Usage : The parties and counsel are encouraged to advise the Court of their pronouns and honorifics (such as Ms., Mx., or Mr.). People appearing before this Court may provide their pronouns and honorifics in writing or orally when appearing for conferences, hearings, or trials. Attorneys are encouraged to identify their pronouns and honorifics in their signature lines when submitting documents for filing. Parties and counsel are instructed to address each other in all written documents and court proceedings by those previously identified pronouns and honorifics. (jk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 08, 2023
4 4 5 pgs order Order Wed 02/08 2:24 PM
Case Management Order signed on 2/8/2023 by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (jk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 07, 2023
3 3 order 3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT Tue 02/07 9:12 AM
Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 6/7/2023. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/7/2023. Pretrial Order is due by 7/7/2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai. (jw)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 06, 2023
2 2 oth_doc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 02/06 4:48 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Roseburg Forest Products Co.. (Ray, Sean)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 02/06 4:41 PM
Notice of Removal of Case Number 22CV24722 from Marion County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-8811367 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Roseburg Forest Products Co.. (Ray, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Exhibit,
Att: 10 Exhibit,
Att: 11 Exhibit,
Att: 12 Exhibit,
Att: 13 Exhibit,
Att: 14 Exhibit,
Att: 15 Exhibit,
Att: 16 Exhibit,
Att: 17 Exhibit,
Att: 18 Exhibit,
Att: 19 Exhibit,
Att: 20 Exhibit,
Att: 21 Exhibit,
Att: 22 Civil Cover Sheet