Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:F Kay Behm
Referred: David R Grand
Case #: 4:22-cv-12079
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause15:2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Case Filed:Sep 02, 2022
Last checked: Thursday Mar 02, 2023 7:47 AM EST
Defendant
Ford Motor Company
Represented By
Derek J. Linkous
Bush Seyferth PLLC
contact info
Stephanie A. Douglas
Bush Seyferth PLLC
contact info
Perry W. Miles, IV
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Brendan Lawless
Represented By
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Everett Sylvester Wilson III
Represented By
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Matthew Wilson
Represented By
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Dennis A. Lienhardt
The Miller Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Mark Willard
Represented By
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Dennis A. Lienhardt
The Miller Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Jonathan Taylor
Represented By
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
John Stowers
Represented By
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
John Schabinger
Represented By
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Edward Blaine Schabinger
Represented By
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Justin Sager
Represented By
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ryan Robbins
Represented By
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Stephen T. Rhodes
Represented By
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Dennis A. Lienhardt
The Miller Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
E. Powell Miller
The Miller Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Brenda L. Rhodes
Represented By
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Dennis A. Lienhardt
The Miller Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
E. Powell Miller
The Miller Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard Powell
Represented By
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jesse Porter
Represented By
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Donald Marshall
Represented By
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
John Koblasz
Represented By
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Douglas Holicz
Represented By
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Catherine Gosser
Represented By
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Gneckow
Represented By
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Gail Gneckow
Represented By
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Sarah Ellers
Represented By
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Greg Duenes
Represented By
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
William Brock
Represented By
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
David Braden
Represented By
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Dennis A. Lienhardt
The Miller Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Steven Beck
Represented By
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Dennis A. Lienhardt
The Miller Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Thomas Eric Loeser
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info
Sharon S. Almonrode
The Miller Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
E. Powell Miller
The Miller Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Mark Anderson
Represented By
Steve W. Berman
Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP
contact info

GPO Mar 28 2023
Stipulated ORDER Consolidating Cases. Signed by District Judge F. Kay Behm. (SSch)

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
46 46 1 pgs order Order Wed 03/06 10:27 AM
ORDER Granting45 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance. Signed by District Judge F. Kay Behm. (KMac)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
45 45 notice Withdrawal of Attorney Tue 03/05 1:50 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Thomas Eric Loeser for on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Loeser, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
notice Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled Tue 02/20 2:48 PM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Hearing on March 6, 2024 is Cancelled re43 Notice of Hearing on Motion. (KMac)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
44 44 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Tue 01/16 1:54 PM
ORDER Granting42 Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney. Signed by District Judge F. Kay Behm. (KMac)
Related: [-]
43 43 notice Hearing on Motion* Tue 01/16 10:06 AM
RE-NOTICE OF REMOTE HEARING on29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Class Action Complaint ,31 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Plaintiffs' Motion for Appointment of Proposed Leadership Structure . Motion Hearing RESET for 3/6/2024 at 2:00 PM before District Judge F. Kay Behm. *THE PARTIES ARE TO USE THE ZOOM LINK PREVIOUSLY EMAILED TO THEM* |Remote Access Phone Number: 669 254 5252 and Meeting ID: 161 400 6364| (KMac)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
42 42 notice Withdrawal of Attorney Fri 01/12 4:09 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Emma Marguerite Wright for on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Wright, Emma)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Tue 01/09 10:04 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER Granting41 Motion for Leave to File. SO ORDERED. Issued by District Judge F. Kay Behm. (KMac)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
41 41 motion Leave to File Mon 01/08 5:18 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Notice of Supplemental Authority Regarding Its Pending Motion to Dismiss by Ford Motor Company. (Linkous, Derek)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Notice of Supplemental Authority,
Att: 2 Exhibit A-1 - Norman v FCA US LLC
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
40 40 notice Hearing on Motion* Wed 11/15 2:10 PM
RE-NOTICE OF REMOTE HEARING on29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Class Action Complaint and31 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Plaintiffs' Motion for Appointment of Proposed Leadership Structure . Motion Hearing RESET for 1/24/2024 at 2:00 PM before District Judge F. Kay Behm. *VIDEO CONFERENCE LINK WILL BE EMAILED TO THE PARTIES* |Remote Access Phone Number: 669 254 5252 and Meeting ID: 161 400 6364| (KMac)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2023
39 39 notice Hearing on Motion* Fri 09/22 12:48 PM
RE-NOTICE OF VIDEO CONFERENCE HEARING on29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Class Action Complaint AND31 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Plaintiffs' Motion for Appointment of Proposed Leadership Structure . Motion Hearings RESET for 11/29/2023 at 2:00 PM before District Judge F. Kay Behm. |Zoom Webinar Information: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1614006364?pwd=OTBoQUVNZ3Bqd3RTcmFNa0RhdExCZz09 Passcode: 548440 Or One tap mobile: +16692545252,,1614006364# US (San Jose) +16468287666,,1614006364# US (New York)| (KMac)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2023
38 38 notice Hearing on Motion* Tue 09/05 1:02 PM
NOTICE OF VIDEO CONFERENCE HEARING on31 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Plaintiffs' Motion for Appointment of Proposed Leadership Structure . Motion Hearing set for 12/6/2023 10:00 AM before District Judge F. Kay Behm *THIS MOTION WILL BE HEARD AT THE SAME TIME AS ECF NO. 29* |Zoom Webinar Information:. https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1614006364?pwd=OTBoQUVNZ3Bqd3RTcmFNa0RhdExCZz09 Passcode: 548440 Or One tap mobile: +16692545252,,1614006364# US (San Jose) +16468287666,,1614006364# US (New York)| (MacKay, K)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
37 37 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 08/17 11:49 AM
REPLY to Response re29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Ford Motor Company. (Linkous, Derek)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 27, 2023
36 36 respm Response to Motion Thu 07/27 8:38 PM
RESPONSE to29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Mark Anderson, Steven Beck, David Braden, Curtis Bright, William Brock, Greg Duenes, Sarah Ellers, Gail Gneckow, Michael Gneckow, Catherine Gosser, William Griffitt, Douglas Holicz, Ryan Katch, John Koblasz, Brendan Lawless, Donald Marshall, Jesse Porter, Richard Powell, Desmond Rains, Brenda L. Rhodes, Stephen T. Rhodes, Ryan Robbins, Justin Sager, Edward Blaine Schabinger, John Schabinger. (Berman, Steve)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 07, 2023
35 35 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 07/07 4:15 PM
REPLY to Response re31 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Plaintiffs' Motion for Appointment of Proposed Leadership Structure filed by Mark Anderson, Steven Beck, David Braden, Curtis Bright, William Brock, Greg Duenes, Sarah Ellers. (Berman, Steve)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2023
34 34 respm Response to Motion Fri 06/30 4:15 PM
RESPONSE to31 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Plaintiffs' Motion for Appointment of Proposed Leadership Structure filed by Ford Motor Company. (Linkous, Derek)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 26, 2023
33 33 notice Hearing on Motion* Mon 06/26 5:01 PM
NOTICE OF VIDEO CONFERENCE HEARING on29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Class Action Complaint . Motion Hearing RESET for 12/6/2023 10:00 AM before District Judge F. Kay Behm |Zoom Webinar Information: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1614006364?pwd=OTBoQUVNZ3Bqd3RTcmFNa0RhdExCZz09 Passcode: 548440 Or One tap mobile : +16692545252,,1614006364# US (San Jose) +16468287666,,1614006364# US (New York)| (THal)
Related: [-]
32 32 notice Hearing on Motion* Mon 06/26 4:22 PM
NOTICE OF VIDEO CONFERENCE HEARING on29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Class Action Complaint . Motion Hearing set for 10/18/2023 10:00 AM before District Judge F. Kay Behm |Zoom Webinar Information: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1614006364?pwd=OTBoQUVNZ3Bqd3RTcmFNa0RhdExCZz09 Passcode: 548440 Or One tap mobile : +16692545252,,1614006364# US (San Jose) +16468287666,,1614006364# US (New York)| (THal)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 16, 2023
31 31 motion Appoint Counsel Fri 06/16 3:02 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel Plaintiffs' Motion for Appointment of Proposed Leadership Structure by Mark Anderson, Steven Beck, David Braden, Curtis Bright, William Brock, Greg Duenes, Sarah Ellers, Gail Gneckow, Michael Gneckow, Catherine Gosser, William Griffitt, Douglas Holicz, Ryan Katch, John Koblasz, Brendan Lawless, Donald Marshall, Jesse Porter, Richard Powell, Desmond Rains, Brenda L. Rhodes, Ryan Robbins, Justin Sager, Edward Blaine Schabinger, John Schabinger, Ryan Scott, John Stowers, Dwaine Stutler Jr., Jonathan Taylor, Ivan Tellez, Kevin Thomas, Mark Willard, Matthew Wilson, Everett Sylvester Wilson III. (Berman, Steve)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Hagens Berman Sobol Shapiro LLP Firm Resume,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - The Miller Law Firm, P.C. Resume,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP Firm Resume,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - Keller Rohrback L.L.P. Firm Resume,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - Fegan Scott LLC Firm Resume,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 - Unpublished Authorities
30 30 order Stipulation and Order Fri 06/16 2:03 PM
STIPULATED ORDER increasing page limitations. Signed by District Judge F. Kay Behm. (DPer)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 12, 2023
29 29 motion Dismiss Mon 06/12 4:09 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Consolidated Class Action Complaint by Ford Motor Company. (Linkous, Derek)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Doolin Judgment,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Johnson Judgment,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - Holden Johnson,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - Hill Sanctions Order,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - Appendix A - Statute of Limitations Chart
Monday, May 01, 2023
28 28 notice Appearance Mon 05/01 1:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Shelby Smith on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Smith, Shelby)
Related: [-]
27 27 notice Appearance Mon 05/01 1:40 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Kingerski on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Kingerski, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 28, 2023
26 26 2 pgs order Order on Motion for More Definite Statement Fri 04/28 1:57 PM
ORDER Terminating18 Motion for More Definite Statement as Moot. Signed by District Judge F. Kay Behm. (THal)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2023
25 25 cmp Civil Case - Complaint, Amended Thu 04/27 6:19 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Second Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by Catherine Gosser, Gail Gneckow, John Stowers, Richard Powell, William Griffitt, Steven Beck, John Koblasz, Douglas Holicz, Ryan Scott, Curtis Bright, Jonathan Taylor, Sarah Ellers, Everett Sylvester Wilson III, Edward Blaine Schabinger, Jesse Porter, John Schabinger, Justin Sager, Ivan Tellez, Greg Duenes, David Braden, Brendan Lawless, Stephen T. Rhodes, Kevin Thomas, Mark Willard, Donald Marshall, Michael Gneckow, Brenda L. Rhodes, William Brock, Ryan Robbins, Mark Anderson, Ryan Katch, Dwaine Stutler Jr., Desmond Rains against Ford Motor Company. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Berman, Steve)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Byron Bloch, Protecting Occupants in Rollover Crashes: Case Examples and Latest Technologies,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Welday v. Ford Motor Co., No. 19CV33212 (Multnomah Cir. Ct.), Plaintiffs Motion for Leave To File Third Amended Complaint To Add Punitive Damages Claims Against Defendant Ford Motor Company,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Monash University, Rollover Crash Study Vehicle design and occupant injuries (appendix omitted),
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - Ford Forums, U.S.: Danger Overhead: Crushed Roofs, Thousands Killed, hurt as auto roofs collapse,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - Taylor v. Ford Motor Co., No. 06-cv-00069 (D. Me.), Dkt. No. 86,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 - Hill v. Ford Motor Co., No. 16 C 04179-2 (Sept. 22, 2017), Plaintiffs Response to Ford Motor Companys Three Motions for Partial Summary Judgment,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 - August 22, 2022 Wall Street Journal article titled Roof Strength on Older Ford Trucks Called Into Question by $1.7 Billion Jury Verdict,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8 - Motorbiscuit.com article titled What You Should Know About the Ford Super Duty Death Wobble,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9 - Ford Authority, FORD SUPER DUTY LINEUP IS AN EXTREMELY VALUABLE PROFIT GENERATOR, May 6, 2022,
Att: 11 Exhibit 10 - Macrotrends, Ford Motor Gross Profit 2010-2022,
Att: 12 Exhibit 11 - PickupTrucks.com, Ford Super Duty Solidifies Reign as King of Heavy-Duty Truck Sales, Nov. 15, 2010,
Att: 13 Exhibit 12 - MY 1999 Ford SuperDuty brochure,
Att: 14 Exhibit 13 - MY 2009 Ford SuperDuty brochure,
Att: 15 Exhibit 14 - MY 2010 Ford SuperDuty brochure,
Att: 16 Exhibit 15 - MY 2011 Ford SuperDuty brochure,
Att: 17 Exhibit 16 - MY 2012 Ford SuperDuty brochure,
Att: 18 Exhibit 17 - MY 2013 Ford SuperDuty brochure,
Att: 19 Exhibit 18 - MY 2014 Ford SuperDuty brochure,
Att: 20 Exhibit 19 - 2013 Ford F-350, Motortrend.com,
Att: 21 Exhibit 20 - 2016 Ford F-350, Motortrend.com,
Att: 22 Exhibit 21 - Taylor v. Ford Motor Co., No. 06-cv-00069 (D. Me.), Dkt. No. 97,
Att: 23 Exhibit 22 - Gibson v. Ford Motor Co., No. 1:06-cv-01237 (N.D. Ga.), Dkt. No. 177-1,
Att: 24 Exhibit 23 - Ott v. Ford Motor Co., No. 03-cv-00101 (W.D. Ky.), Dkt. No. 76-2,
Att: 25 Exhibit 24 - August 25, 2022 Wall Street Journal article titled Ford Trucks Highlighted in $1.7 Billion Verdict Werent Subject to Tougher Safety Rules,
Att: 26 Exhibit 25 - 1964 Ford Country Squire station wagon advertisement,
Att: 27 Exhibit 26 - Article titled Industry Concealment of Tests Undermined Development of Meaningful Rollover Crash Roof Crush Resistance Standard in 1971,
Att: 28 Exhibit 27 - Article regarding Alliance of Automobile Manufacturers,
Att: 29 Exhibit 28 - Article titled 1971 Roof Strength Standard: 33-Year Old Standard Does Not Provide Basic Rollover Crashworthiness Protections,
Att: 30 Exhibit 29 - May 14, 2005 N.Y.T. article titled Not the Top of the Safety Priorities,
Att: 31 Exhibit 30 - This is Volvo, Volvo,
Att: 32 Exhibit 31 - CNN, Memos tell of Ford-Volvo safety dispute, May 16, 2005,
Att: 33 Exhibit 32 - Vehicle Size and Weight, Insurance Institute for Highway Safety, Highway Loss Data Institute, July 2022,
Att: 34 Exhibit 33 - Body Nomenclature, Automotive Design in the Digital Age,
Att: 35 Exhibit 34 - NHTSA, Evaluation of FMVSS No. 216a, Roof Crush Resistance, Upgraded Standard,
Att: 36 Exhibit 35 - Hannah Albarazi, Ford's $1.7B Trial Loss Puts Spotlight On Hush Deals, Ga. Law, Law360 (Aug. 26, 2022)
Tuesday, March 28, 2023
24 24 notice Notice to Parties Regarding Consolidated Case* Tue 03/28 3:22 PM
Notice to Parties Regarding Consolidated Case: Order of consolidation entered on *3/28/23*. Designated lead case number is 22-12079 . (SSch)
Related: [-]
23 23 7 pgs order Order Tue 03/28 3:22 PM
Stipulated ORDER Consolidating Cases. Signed by District Judge F. Kay Behm. (SSch)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 09, 2023
22 22 notice Hearing on Motion* Thu 03/09 1:20 PM
NOTICE OF VIDEO CONFERENCE HEARING on18 MOTION for More Definite Statement Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(e) . Motion Hearing set for 7/19/2023 at 2:00 PM before District Judge F. Kay Behm |Zoom Webinar Information: https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1614670586?pwd=bmFPMUZvbW9xZklvendkTGZuYjQrUT09 Passcode: 927791 Or One tap mobile : US: +16692545252,,1614670586# or +16468287666,,1614670586#| (RLou)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 23, 2023
21 21 order Stipulation and Order Thu 02/23 10:20 AM
STIPULATED ORDER to Accept Ford Motor Company's Reply Brief Out of Time. Signed by District Judge F. Kay Behm. (RLou)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 18, 2023
20 20 respm Reply to Response to Motion Sat 02/18 12:19 PM
REPLY to Response re18 MOTION for More Definite Statement Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(e) filed by Ford Motor Company. (Linkous, Derek)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 06, 2023
order Text-Only Reassignment Mon 02/06 11:11 AM
Text-Only Order of reassignment from District Judge Paul D. Borman to District Judge F. Kay Behm pursuant to Administrative Order 23-AO-003. (SSch)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
19 19 RESPONSE to18 MOTION for More Definite Statement Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(e) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Berman, Steve)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Unpublished Cases
Friday, December 16, 2022
18 18 MOTION for More Definite Statement Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(e) by Ford Motor Company. (Linkous, Derek)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Unpublished Cases
Tuesday, November 01, 2022
17 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Perry W. Miles, IV on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (Miles, Perry)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 28, 2022
16 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Consolidated Class Action Complaint filed by All Plaintiffs against Ford Motor Company. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Berman, Steve)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Byron Bloch, Protecting Occupants in Rollover Crashes: Case Examples and Latest Technologies,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Welday v. Ford Motor Co., No. 19CV33212 (Multnomah Cir. Ct.), Plaintiffs Motion for Leave To File Third Amended Complaint To Add Punitive Damages Claims Against Defendant Ford Motor Company,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Monash University, Rollover Crash Study Vehicle design and occupant injuries (appendix omitted),
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - Ford Forums, U.S.: Danger Overhead: Crushed Roofs, Thousands Killed, hurt as auto roofs collapse,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - Taylor v. Ford Motor Co., No. 06-cv-00069 (D. Me.), Dkt. No. 86,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 - Hill v. Ford Motor Co., No. 16 C 04179-2 (Sept. 22, 2017), Plaintiffs Response to Ford Motor Companys Three Motions for Partial Summary Judgment,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 - August 22, 2022 Wall Street Journal article titled Roof Strength on Older Ford Trucks Called Into Question by $1.7 Billion Jury Verdict,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8 - Motorbiscuit.com article titled What You Should Know About the Ford Super Duty Death Wobble,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9 - Ford Authority, FORD SUPER DUTY LINEUP IS AN EXTREMELY VALUABLE PROFIT GENERATOR, May 6, 2022,
Att: 11 Exhibit 10 - Macrotrends, Ford Motor Gross Profit 2010-2022,
Att: 12 Exhibit 11 - PickupTrucks.com, Ford Super Duty Solidifies Reign as King of Heavy-Duty Truck Sales, Nov. 15, 2010,
Att: 13 Exhibit 12 - MY 1999 Ford SuperDuty brochure,
Att: 14 Exhibit 13 - MY 2009 Ford SuperDuty brochure,
Att: 15 Exhibit 14 - MY 2010 Ford SuperDuty brochure,
Att: 16 Exhibit 15 - MY 2011 Ford SuperDuty brochure,
Att: 17 Exhibit 16 - MY 2012 Ford SuperDuty brochure,
Att: 18 Exhibit 17 - MY 2013 Ford SuperDuty brochure,
Att: 19 Exhibit 18 - MY 2014 Ford SuperDuty brochure,
Att: 20 Exhibit 19 - 2013 Ford F-350, Motortrend.com,
Att: 21 Exhibit 20 - 2016 Ford F-350, Motortrend.com,
Att: 22 Exhibit 21 - Taylor v. Ford Motor Co., No. 06-cv-00069 (D. Me.), Dkt. No. 97,
Att: 23 Exhibit 22 - Gibson v. Ford Motor Co., No. 1:06-cv-01237 (N.D. Ga.), Dkt. No. 177-1,
Att: 24 Exhibit 23 - Ott v. Ford Motor Co., No. 03-cv-00101 (W.D. Ky.), Dkt. No. 76-2,
Att: 25 Exhibit 24 - August 25, 2022 Wall Street Journal article titled Ford Trucks Highlighted in $1.7 Billion Verdict Werent Subject to Tougher Safety Rules,
Att: 26 Exhibit 25 - 1964 Ford Country Squire station wagon advertisement,
Att: 27 Exhibit 26 - Article titled Industry Concealment of Tests Undermined Development of Meaningful Rollover Crash Roof Crush Resistance Standard in 1971,
Att: 28 Exhibit 27 - Article regarding Alliance of Automobile Manufacturers,
Att: 29 Exhibit 28 - Article titled 1971 Roof Strength Standard: 33-Year Old Standard Does Not Provide Basic Rollover Crashworthiness Protections,
Att: 30 Exhibit 29 - May 14, 2005 N.Y.T. article titled Not the Top of the Safety Priorities,
Att: 31 Exhibit 30 - This is Volvo, Volvo,
Att: 32 Exhibit 31 - CNN, Memos tell of Ford-Volvo safety dispute, May 16, 2005,
Att: 33 Exhibit 32 - Vehicle Size and Weight, Insurance Institute for Highway Safety, Highway Loss Data Institute, July 2022
Friday, October 14, 2022
15 15 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Dennis A. Lienhardt appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Lienhardt, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 12, 2022
14 14 Notice to Parties Regarding Consolidated Case: Order of consolidation entered on *10/12/22*. Designated lead case number is 22-12079 . (SSch)
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER and Agreed upon Stipulation (Modified) for Consolidation of these related actions and Setting Schedule for the Filing of a Consolidated Complaint and Responsive Pleading. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (SSch)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
12 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Steven Beck, David Braden, Mark Willard, Matthew Wilson against Ford Motor Company. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Berman, Steve)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - August 22, 2022 Wall Street Journal article titled Roof Strength on Older Ford Trucks Called Into Question by $1.7 Billion Jury Verdict,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Motorbiscuit.com article titled What You Should Know About the Ford Super Duty Death Wobble,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - MY 2013 Ford SuperDuty brochure,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - MY 2009 Ford SuperDuty brochure,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - MY 2011 Ford SuperDuty brochure,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 - 2013 Ford F-350, Motortrend.com,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 - 2016 Ford F-350, Motortrend.com,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8 - Ott v. Ford Motor Co., No. 03-cv-00101 (W.D. Ky.), Dkt. No. 76-2,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9 - August 25, 2022 Wall Street Journal article,
Att: 11 Exhibit 10 - Taylor v. Ford Motor Co., No. 06-cv-00069 (D. Me.), Dkt. No. 97,
Att: 12 Exhibit 11 - Taylor v. Ford Motor Co., No. 06-cv-00069 (D. Me.), Dkt. No. 86,
Att: 13 Exhibit 12 - Gibson v. Ford Motor Co., No. 1:06-cv-01237 (N.D. Ga.), Dkt. No. 177-1,
Att: 14 Exhibit 13 - Byron Bloch, Protecting Occupants in Rollover Crashes: Case Examples and Latest Technologies,
Att: 15 Exhibit 14 - 1964 Ford Country Squire station wagon advertisement,
Att: 16 Exhibit 15 - Ford Forums, U.S.: Danger Overhead: Crushed Roofs, Thousands Killed, hurt as auto roofs collapse,
Att: 17 Exhibit 16 - Article titled Industry Concealment of Tests Undermined Development of Meaningful Rollover Crash Roof Crush Resistance Standard in 1971,
Att: 18 Exhibit 17 - Article regarding Alliance of Automobile Manufacturers,
Att: 19 Exhibit 18 - Monash University study titled Rollover Crash Study Vehicle design and occupant injuries,
Att: 20 Exhibit 19 - Article titled 1971 Roof Strength Standard: 33-Year Old Standard Does Not Provide Basic Rollover Crashworthiness Protections,
Att: 21 Exhibit 20 - May 14, 2005 N.Y.T. article titled Not the Top of the Safety Priorities
11 11 STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Ford Motor Company (Linkous, Derek)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 26, 2022
10 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek J. Linkous on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (Linkous, Derek)
Related: [-]
9 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie A. Douglas on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (Douglas, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 23, 2022
8 8 STIPULATED ORDER ON EXTENSION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by District Judge Paul D. Borman. (DTof)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 09, 2022
7 7 CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Ford Motor Company served on 9/8/2022, answer due 9/29/2022. (Berman, Steve)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 02, 2022
6 6 SUMMONS Issued for *Ford Motor Company* (LGra)
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Eric Loeser on behalf of Steven Beck. (Loeser, Thomas)
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Steve W. Berman on behalf of Steven Beck. (Berman, Steve)
Related: [-]
3 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Sharon S. Almonrode appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Almonrode, Sharon)
Related: [-]
2 2 NOTICE of Appearance by E. Powell Miller on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Miller, E.)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint filed by Steven Beck against Ford Motor Company with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9041046 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: San Luis Obispo - California - County Where Action Arose: Detroit - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Berman, Steve)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Index of Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Wall Street Journal Roof Strength on Older Ford Trucks Called Into Question by $1.7 Billion Jury Verdict,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Motorbiscuit.com What You Should Know About the Ford Super Duty Death Wobble,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - MY 2013 Ford SuperDuty brochure,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - MY 2009 Ford SuperDuty brochure,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5 - MY 2011 Ford SuperDuty brochure,
Att: 7 Exhibit 6 - 2013 Ford F-350, Motortrend.com,
Att: 8 Exhibit 7 - 2016 Ford F-350, Motortend.com,
Att: 9 Exhibit 8 - Ott v. Ford Motor Co., No. 4:03-cv-00101 (W.D. Ky.), Dkt. No. 76-2,
Att: 10 Exhibit 9 - Wall Street Journal Ford Trucks Highlighted in $1.7 Billion Verdict Werent Subject to Tougher Safety Rules,
Att: 11 Exhibit 10 - Ford Forums - U.S.: Danger Overhead: Crushed Roofs, Thousands Killed, hurt as auto roofs collapse,
Att: 12 Exhibit 11 - Taylor v. Ford Motor Co., No. 06-69-B-W (D. Me.), Dkt. No. 97