Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:F Kay Behm
Referred: David R Grand
Case #: 4:22-cv-12560
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Oct 25, 2022
Terminated:Oct 12, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Apr 23, 2023 5:17 AM EDT
Defendant
52nd District Court of Michigan
Represented By
Christopher M. Trebilcock
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
Vincent C. Sallan
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
Defendant
Joseph G. Fabrizio
Represented By
Christopher M. Trebilcock
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
Vincent C. Sallan
Clark Hill PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Shelly McLeod
Represented By
Noah S. Hurwitz
Hurwitz Law PLLC
contact info
Grant Michael Vlahopoulos
Hurwitz Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, October 12, 2023
22 22 order Dismissing Case - Stipulated Order Thu 10/12 1:22 PM
STIPULATED ORDER of Dismissal With Prejudice. Signed by District Judge F. Kay Behm. (KMac)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2023
21 21 2 pgs order Order Mon 05/15 3:58 PM
DISCOVERY MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (EBut)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
20 20 notice Appear* Wed 04/05 9:26 AM
NOTICE TO APPEAR IN PERSON: Settlement Conference set for 5/8/2024 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge David R. Grand (EBut)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 03, 2023
19 19 order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge* Mon 04/03 4:53 PM
ORDER Referring All Pretrial Discovery Matters to Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. Signed by District Judge F. Kay Behm. (RLou)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Referring Other Matters to Magistrate Judge* Mon 04/03 4:51 PM
ORDER REFERRING OTHER MATTERS to Magistrate Judge Grand: Settlement Conference - To be conducted sometime in May of 2024. Signed by District Judge F. Kay Behm. (RLou)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Scheduling Order Mon 04/03 4:49 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 12/6/2023 , Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 1/17/2024 , Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/10/2024 at 1:00 PM before District Judge F. Kay Behm , Jury Trial set for 7/23/2024 at 8:30 AM before District Judge F. Kay Behm . Signed by District Judge F. Kay Behm. Related [+] (RLou)
Related: [-] fer to image for additional dates
16 16 notice Appearance Mon 04/03 9:01 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Grant Michael Vlahopoulos on behalf of Shelly McLeod. (Vlahopoulos, Grant)
Related: [-]
notice Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled Mon 04/03 4:47 PM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Telephonic Scheduling Conference on 4/6/2023 is Cancelled (RLou)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 30, 2023
15 15 misc Discovery Plan - Rule 26f Thu 03/30 2:49 PM
DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Sallan, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 27, 2023
14 14 notice Appear* Mon 02/27 4:03 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Scheduling Conference set for 4/6/2023 at 11:00 AM before District Judge F. Kay Behm . Notice includes call-in information. (RLou)
Related: [-]
notice Text-Only Notice of Hearing Cancelled Mon 02/27 3:59 PM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: Scheduling Conference on 3/20/2023 is Cancelled. (RLou)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 06, 2023
order Text-Only Reassignment Mon 02/06 12:41 PM
Text-Only Order of reassignment from District Judge David M. Lawson to District Judge F. Kay Behm pursuant to Administrative Order 23-AO-003. (SSch)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 31, 2023
13 13 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by All Defendants. (Sallan, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 24, 2023
12 12 NOTICE TO APPEAR IN PERSON: Scheduling Conference set for 3/20/2023 at 10:00 AM before District Judge David M. Lawson. See image for document deadline. (SPin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 04, 2023
11 11 ORDER to Extend Time to Answer or Respond to1 Complaint. Answer or Response due by 1/31/2023. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 30, 2022
10 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher M. Trebilcock on behalf of 52nd District Court of Michigan, Joseph G. Fabrizio. (Trebilcock, Christopher)
Related: [-]
9 9 STIPULATION Extending time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by 52nd District Court of Michigan, Joseph G. Fabrizio (Sallan, Vincent)
Related: [-]
8 8 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Vincent C. Sallan appearing on behalf of All Defendants (Sallan, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 29, 2022
7 7 ORDER to Extend Time to Answer or Respond to1 Complaint. Response or Answer due by 1/13/2023. Signed by District Judge David M. Lawson. (SPin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 22, 2022
6 6 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by All Defendants (Sallan, Vincent)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 04, 2022
5 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Joseph G. Fabrizio waiver sent on 10/28/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. (Hurwitz, Noah)
Related: [-]
4 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. 52nd District Court of Michigan waiver sent on 10/28/2022, answer due 12/27/2022. (Hurwitz, Noah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 26, 2022
3 3 SUMMONS Issued for *Joseph G. Fabrizio* (SKra)
Related: [-]
2 2 SUMMONS Issued for *52nd District Court of Michigan* (SKra)
Related: [-]
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (SKra)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 25, 2022
1 1 COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9104670 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Hurwitz, Noah)
Related: [-]