Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Eli J Richardson
Referred: Jeffery S Frensley
Case #: 3:23-cv-00110
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Feb 06, 2023
Terminated:Apr 17, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Aug 05, 2023 5:32 AM CDT
Defendant
Four Leaf Liquidators, LLC
Plaintiff
Calvert Health, LLC
Represented By
Cheshire Rigler
Shrum Hicks & Associates
contact info
Barry Neil Shrum
Shrum & Associates
contact info

GPO May 01 2023
ORDER: The Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default against Four Leaf Liquidators LLC, 14, is GRANTED. To the extent Plaintiff's Motion seeks an award of damages at this phase, Plaintiff's Motion is DENIED without prejudice to filing a properly supported Motion for Default Judgment pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(b). Signed by Clerk of Court Lynda M. Hill on 5/1/2023. (xc: Order forwarded to Four Leaf Liquidators LLC by certified mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc) Modified on 5/2/2023 (kc).
GPO Jan 05 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 1/4/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc)
GPO Apr 17 2024
JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT: Plaintiff is awarded judgment in the total amount of $657,336.99. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to enter final judgment under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58 and close the file. Notwithstanding the closing of the file, P(DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(vk)laintiff may file a motion for attorneys fees under and in conformity with Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(2) and LR54.01(b). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 4/17/2024. (xc: Defendant Four Leaf Liquidators, LLC, by regular mail.)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, July 25, 2024
39 39 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Thu 07/25 4:30 PM
ORDER granting37 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 7/25/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
38 38 misc Mail Returned Wed 05/15 12:00 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Return to Sender. Attempted Not Known.35 Entry of Judgment,34 Default Judgment. Mail sent to Four Leaf Liquidators, LLC. (kc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
37 37 2 pgs motion Attorney Fees Wed 04/24 2:57 PM
MOTION for Attorney Fees by Calvert Health, LLC.(Shrum, Barry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Memorandum in Support of Attorney's Fees,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Mr. Barry Shrum,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Invoices
Thursday, April 18, 2024
36 36 misc Certified Mail Receipt Thu 04/18 10:40 AM
CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT re34 Default Judgment. (mg)
Related: [-]
35 35 1 pgs misc Entry of Judgment Thu 04/18 9:18 AM
ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY CLERK: re:34 Default Judgment (xc: Defendant Four Leaf Liquidators, LLC.) (vk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 17, 2024
34 34 2 pgs order Judgment - Default Wed 04/17 5:45 PM
JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT: Plaintiff is awarded judgment in the total amount of $657,336.99. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to enter final judgment under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58 and close the file. Notwithstanding the closing of the file, Plaintiff may file a motion for attorneys fees under and in conformity with Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(2) and LR54.01(b). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 4/17/2024. (xc: Defendant Four Leaf Liquidators, LLC, by regular mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (vk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
33 33 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/16 3:27 PM
NOTICE by Calvert Health, LLC (Shrum, Barry)
Related: [-]
minutes Motion Hearing Tue 04/16 10:16 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Eli J. Richardson: Motion Hearing held on 4/16/2024 re12 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Four Leaf Liquidators, LLC filed by Calvert Health, LLC. (Court Reporter Debbie Watson.) (Hearing lasted :40)(Jackson, Julie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
32 32 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/11 10:21 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Barry Neil Shrum on behalf of Calvert Health, LLC (Shrum, Barry)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
31 31 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 04/08 2:37 PM
ORDER: The Motion to Ascertain Status of Case30 is granted. The status of the case is that the Court is hereby scheduling a hearing on damages for April 16, 2024, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 4/8/2024. (kc)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
30 30 motion Ascertain Status Fri 04/05 3:28 PM
First MOTION to Ascertain Status of February 7, 2024 Order by Calvert Health, LLC. (Shrum, Barry)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
29 29 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Wed 02/07 10:41 AM
ORDER: Because the damages amount remains unsettled, the Motion for Attorney's Fees27 is DENIED without prejudice to file an updated motion for attorney's fees at a later time. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 2/7/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 04, 2024
28 28 4 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Sun 02/04 12:20 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of27 First MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Calvert Health, LLC .(Shrum, Barry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Barry Neil Shrum Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit Invoices for Time Spent on Litigation
27 27 2 pgs motion Attorney Fees Sun 02/04 12:16 PM
First MOTION for Attorney Fees by Calvert Health, LLC. (Shrum, Barry)
Related: [-]
26 26 3 pgs respoth Brief (non-appeal) Sun 02/04 12:13 PM
BRIEF filed by Calvert Health, LLC re25 Order on Motion for Default Judgment,, Order to Ascertain Status,.(Shrum, Barry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Unpaid Invoices,
Att: 2 Exhibit Declaration of Kyle Calvert
Friday, January 05, 2024
25 25 5 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Order to Ascertain Status Fri 01/05 9:33 AM
ORDER: The Motion for Default Judgment17 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Plaintiff's Motion to Ascertain Status22 is DENIED as moot. Defendant is hereby PERMANENTLY ENJOINED according to the enumerated terms below, effective as of January 4, 2024. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 1/4/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
24 24 28 pgs order Memorandum Opinion of the Court Fri 01/05 9:27 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION OF THE COURT. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 1/4/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
23 23 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 11/21 8:43 AM
ORDER granting21 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Cheshire Rigler terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 11/20/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
22 22 3 pgs motion Ascertain Status Fri 11/17 11:50 AM
First MOTION to Ascertain Status of Motion for Default Judgement by Calvert Health, LLC. (Shrum, Barry)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 11/17 11:41 AM
First MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Cheshire Rigler by Calvert Health, LLC. (Shrum, Barry)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 22, 2023
20 20 6 pgs misc Letter Thu 06/22 3:36 PM
Letter from Mike Langenfeld. (kc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 23, 2023
19 19 misc Mail Returned Tue 05/23 10:10 AM
Mail Returned as Unable to Forward "Vacant" re15 Order on Motion for Entry of Default. Mail sent to Four Leaf Liquidators, LLC. (af)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 16, 2023
18 18 service Green Card Returned Tue 05/16 3:50 PM
GREEN CARD RETURNED Executed as to15 Order on Motion for Default Judgment, Order on Motion to Enforce Judgment, Order on Motion for Entry of Default. (kc)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2023
17 17 motion Default Judgment Mon 05/15 11:34 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Four Leaf Liquidators, LLC by Calvert Health, LLC.(Rigler, Cheshire)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Motion for Default Judgment Affidavit
Monday, May 08, 2023
16 16 misc Certified Mail Receipt Mon 05/08 11:20 AM
CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT re15 Order on Motion for Default Judgment, Order on Motion to Enforce Judgment, Order on Motion for Entry of Default. (kc)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 01, 2023
15 15 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Order on Motion to Enforce Judgment Order on Motion for Entry of Default Tue 05/02 9:58 AM
ORDER: The Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default against Four Leaf Liquidators LLC,14 , is GRANTED. To the extent Plaintiff's Motion seeks an award of damages at this phase, Plaintiff's Motion is DENIED without prejudice to filing a properly supported Motion for Default Judgment pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(b). Signed by Clerk of Court Lynda M. Hill on 5/1/2023. (xc: Order forwarded to Four Leaf Liquidators LLC by certified mail.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc) Modified on 5/2/2023 (kc)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 07, 2023
14 14 motion Entry of Default Fri 04/07 8:54 AM
Amended MOTION for Entry of Default as to Four Leaf Liquidators, LLC by Calvert Health, LLC. (Rigler, Cheshire)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Deficiency Notice Fri 04/07 8:22 AM
NOTICE TO FILER re DE#12 and13 : The wrong event was used. The correct event should be Motion for Entry of Default. Counsel shall re-file the document. (kc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 06, 2023
13 13 motion Enforce Judgment Entry of Default Thu 04/06 3:59 PM
MOTION to Enforce Judgment , MOTION for Entry of Default as to Four Leaf Liquidators, LLC by Calvert Health, LLC. (Rigler, Cheshire)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Default Judgment Thu 04/06 3:56 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Four Leaf Liquidators, LLC by Calvert Health, LLC. (Rigler, Cheshire)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 31, 2023
11 11 1 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Hearings Fri 03/31 3:41 PM
ORDER: The Initial Case Management Conference in this matter is scheduled for April 4, 2023 at 9:00 a.m. Docket No.5 . Currently pending before the Court are motions for default judgment against all Defendants. Docket Nos.9 and10 . In light of the pending motions, the Initial Case Management Conference in this matter is cancelled, to be reset if necessary upon resolution of the motions for default. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 3/31/2023. (kc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 27, 2023
misc Annotation - Deficiency Notice Mon 03/27 12:59 PM
NOTICE TO FILER re DE#9 and10 : The wrong event was used. The correct event should be Motion for Entry of Default. Counsel shall re-file the document. (kc)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 24, 2023
10 10 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Fri 03/24 4:26 PM
Additional Attachments to Main Document re:8 Affidavit of Service. (Rigler, Cheshire)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Fri 03/24 3:52 PM
Additional Attachments to Main Document re:8 Affidavit of Service. (Rigler, Cheshire)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Wed 03/01 3:39 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on David Langefeld o/b/o Four Leaf Liquidators LLC on February 9, 2023, filed by Calvert Health, LLC. (Rigler, Cheshire)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 08, 2023
7 7 2 pgs order Order Wed 02/08 3:34 PM
ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 2/8/2023. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 07, 2023
6 6 4 pgs service Summons Issued Tue 02/07 12:47 PM
Summons issued as to Four Leaf Liquidators, LLC. (Service packet placed at intake window for counsel to pick up. HOURS: 8-4.) (kc)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Case Management Conference Tue 02/07 8:23 AM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone is set for 4/4/2023 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (kc)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Tue 02/07 8:20 AM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement Tue 02/07 8:20 AM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (kc)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Tue 02/07 8:43 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Barry Neil Shrum, Cheshire Rigler admitted to this court . (kc)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 06, 2023
2 2 misc Business Entity Disclosure Statement Tue 02/07 8:14 AM
BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Calvert Health, LLC. (kc)
Related: [-]
1 1 28 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 02/07 8:13 AM
COMPLAINT against Four Leaf Liquidators, LLC (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3757804), filed by Calvert Health, LLC.(kc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 The Purchase Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 Registration Certificate for Plaintiff's CARE+TRANSPORT Mark,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 Registration Certificate for Plaintiffs CALIBER PATIENT CARE Mark,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 Copies of Assignment Documents,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 Samples of Plaintiff's Use of Its CARE+TRANSPORT Mark,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 Samples of Plaintiff's Use of Its CALIBER PATIENT CARE Mark,
Att: 7 Exhibit 8 Examples of Plaintiff Goods and Services Promotion,
Att: 8 Exhibit 9 Plaintiffs Customer Testimonials,
Att: 9 Exhibit 10 Examples of Unsolicited News Coverage of Plaintiffs Marks,
Att: 10 Exhibit 11 Redacted Cease-And-Desist Letters sent by Plaintiff to Parties Outside this Complaint,
Att: 11 Exhibit 12 Representative Sample of a Monthly Plaintiff Invoice Sent to Defendant,
Att: 12 Exhibit 13 Plaintiffs August 31, 2022 Cease-And-Desist Letter to Defendant,
Att: 13 Exhibit 14 Plaintiffs Counsel's December 1, 2022 Cease-And-Desist Letter to Defendant,
Att: 14 4 pgs Exhibit 15 Plaintiffs Affidavit,
Att: 15 4 pgs Exhibit 16 Email Dated October 6, 2022 Between Kyle Calvert and Mike Langenfeld,
Att: 16 Exhibit 17 Defendant's Employees' Wage Complaints Mistakenly Sent to Plaintiff,
Att: 17 Exhibit 18 Samples of Defendant's Use of the Infringing Marks,
Att: 18 Exhibit 19 Defendant's Customer Testimonials,
Att: 19 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet