Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Benita Y Pearson
Referred: Carmen E Henderson
Case #: 4:23-cv-00242
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Feb 07, 2023
Terminated:Apr 24, 2025
Case in other court:6th Circuit, 24-03852 6th Circuit, 24-03880 6th Circuit, 24-04086
Last checked: Sunday Aug 06, 2023 5:11 AM EDT
3rd Party Plaintiff
Norfolk Southern Railway Co.
Represented By
Christopher A Rheinheimer
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr - San Francisco
contact info
Michelle Liszt Sandals
Wilmer, Cutler, Pickering, Hale & Dorr - Boston
contact info
Aaron M. Ponzo
Dickie Mccamey & Chilcote - Pittsburgh
contact info
Scott D. Clements
Dickie Mccamey & Chilcote - Pittsburgh
contact info
Albinas Prizgintas
Wilmer, Cutler, Pickering, Hale & Dorr - Washington
contact info
Jonathan M. Redgrave
Redgrave - Chantilly
contact info
Paul A. Roman, Jr.
Dickie Mccamey & Chilcote - Pittsburgh
contact info
Alan E. Schoenfeld
Wilmer, Cutler, Pickering, Hale & Dorr - New York
contact info
Davina Pujari
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr - San Francisco
contact info
Martin T. Tully
Redgrave - Chicago
contact info
Forrest A. Norman, III
Dickie Mccamey & Chilcote - Cleveland
contact info
J. Lawson Johnston
Dickie, Mccamey & Chilcote
contact info
Monica McCarroll
Redgrave - Chantilly
contact info
3rd Party Plaintiff
Norfolk Southern Corp.
Represented By
Christopher A Rheinheimer
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr - San Francisco
contact info
Michelle Liszt Sandals
Wilmer, Cutler, Pickering, Hale & Dorr - Boston
contact info
Aaron M. Ponzo
Dickie Mccamey & Chilcote - Pittsburgh
contact info
Scott D. Clements
Dickie Mccamey & Chilcote - Pittsburgh
contact info
Albinas Prizgintas
Wilmer, Cutler, Pickering, Hale & Dorr - Washington
contact info
Jonathan M. Redgrave
Redgrave - Chantilly
contact info
Paul A. Roman, Jr.
Dickie Mccamey & Chilcote - Pittsburgh
contact info
Alan E. Schoenfeld
Wilmer, Cutler, Pickering, Hale & Dorr - New York
contact info
Davina Pujari
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr - San Francisco
contact info
Martin T. Tully
Redgrave - Chicago
contact info
Forrest A. Norman, III
Dickie Mccamey & Chilcote - Cleveland
contact info
J. Lawson Johnston
Dickie, Mccamey & Chilcote
contact info
Monica McCarroll
Redgrave - Chantilly
contact info
3rd Pty Defendant
Trinity Industries Leasing Company
3rd Pty Defendant
Oxy Vinyls LP
3rd Pty Defendant
General American Marks Company
3rd Pty Defendant
GATX Corporation
Defendant
Norfolk Southern Corp.
650 W. Peachtree Street NW
Atlanta, GA 30308
Represented By
Christopher A Rheinheimer
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr - San Francisco
contact info
Michelle Liszt Sandals
Wilmer, Cutler, Pickering, Hale & Dorr - Boston
contact info
Aaron M. Ponzo
Dickie Mccamey & Chilcote - Pittsburgh
contact info
Scott D. Clements
Dickie Mccamey & Chilcote - Pittsburgh
contact info
Albinas Prizgintas
Wilmer, Cutler, Pickering, Hale & Dorr - Washington
contact info
Jonathan M. Redgrave
Redgrave - Chantilly
contact info
Paul A. Roman, Jr.
Dickie Mccamey & Chilcote - Pittsburgh
contact info
Katherine V. Mackey
Wilmer, Cutler, Pickering, Hale & Dorr - Boston
contact info
Alan E. Schoenfeld
Wilmer, Cutler, Pickering, Hale & Dorr - New York
contact info
Davina Pujari
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr - San Francisco
contact info
Martin T. Tully
Redgrave - Chicago
contact info
Forrest A. Norman, III
Dickie Mccamey & Chilcote - Cleveland
contact info
J. Lawson Johnston
Dickie, Mccamey & Chilcote
contact info
Monica McCarroll
Redgrave - Chantilly
contact info
Defendant
Norfolk Southern Railway Co.
Corporation Service Company 3366 Riverside Drive, Suite 103
Upper Arlington, OH 43221
Represented By
Christopher A Rheinheimer
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr - San Francisco
contact info
Michelle Liszt Sandals
Wilmer, Cutler, Pickering, Hale & Dorr - Boston
contact info
Aaron M. Ponzo
Dickie Mccamey & Chilcote - Pittsburgh
contact info
Scott D. Clements
Dickie Mccamey & Chilcote - Pittsburgh
contact info
Albinas Prizgintas
Wilmer, Cutler, Pickering, Hale & Dorr - Washington
contact info
Jonathan M. Redgrave
Redgrave - Chantilly
contact info
Paul A. Roman, Jr.
Dickie Mccamey & Chilcote - Pittsburgh
contact info
Katherine V. Mackey
Wilmer, Cutler, Pickering, Hale & Dorr - Boston
contact info
Alan E. Schoenfeld
Wilmer, Cutler, Pickering, Hale & Dorr - New York
contact info
Davina Pujari
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale & Dorr - San Francisco
contact info
Martin T. Tully
Redgrave - Chicago
contact info
Forrest A. Norman, III
Dickie Mccamey & Chilcote - Cleveland
contact info
J. Lawson Johnston
Dickie, Mccamey & Chilcote
contact info
Monica McCarroll
Redgrave - Chantilly
contact info
In Re [civil]
Plaintiffs' Subcommittees
Represented By
Zachary J. Murry
Barkan & Robon
contact info
Michael J. O'Shea
Lipson O'Shea
contact info
Grant W. MacKay
Law Office Of Grant W. Mackay
contact info
Gregory R. Farkas
Frantz Ward
contact info
J. Scott Bertram
Bertram & Graf - Kansas City
contact info
Patrick J. Perotti
Dworken & Bernstein - Painesville
contact info
In Re [civil]
Co-Lead Counsel
Represented By
M. Elizabeth Graham
Grant & Eisenhofer
contact info
T. Michael Morgan
Morgan & Morgan - Orlando
contact info
Jayne Conroy
Simmons Hanly Conroy - Illinois
contact info
Seth A. Katz
Burg Simpson Eldredge Hersh Jardine - Englewood
contact info
In Re [civil]
Community Liaison Counsel
Represented By
Nicholas T. Amato
contact info
Nils Paul Johnson, Jr.
Johnson & Johnson
contact info
In Re [civil]
Plaintiffs' Steering Committee
Represented By
Daniel R. Karon
Law Office Of Daniel R. Karon
contact info
Roger C. Denton
Wright & Schulte - Vandalia
contact info
Neal E. Shapero
Shapero & Roloff
contact info
Douglas J. Olcott
Edgar Snyder - Pittsburgh
contact info
Joyce Chambers Reichard
Kelley & Ferraro
contact info
Gary M. Klinger
Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman - Chicago
contact info
Ronald R. Parry
Strauss Troy - Cincinnati
contact info
D. Aaron Rihn
Robert Peirce & Associates
contact info
Ashlie Case Sletvold
Peiffer Wolf Carr Kane Conway & Wise
contact info
Kelly K. Iverson
Lynch Carpenter - Pittsburgh
contact info
Alyson Beridon
Herzfeld, Suetholz, Gastel, Leniski & Wall - Cincinnatti
contact info
Gary A. Corroto
Plakas Mannos - Canton
contact info
Andrew D. Schlichter
Schlichter Bogard - St. Louis
contact info
Wesley D. Merillat
Law Office Of Charles E. Boyk
contact info
Margaret M. Murray
Murray & Murray
contact info
Daniel J. Thornburgh
Aylstock Witkin Kreis & Overholtz
contact info
Dena R. Young
Berger Montague - Philadelphia
contact info
Brian P. Kopp
Betras, Kopp & Harshman - Canfield
contact info
In Re [civil]
Interim Class Counsel
Represented By
M. Elizabeth Graham
Grant & Eisenhofer
contact info
Jayne Conroy
Simmons Hanly Conroy - Illinois
contact info
Seth A. Katz
Burg Simpson Eldredge Hersh Jardine - Englewood
contact info
In Re [civil]
Plaintiffs' Executive Committee
Represented By
Christopher A. Seeger
Seeger Weiss - Newark
contact info
Mark P. Chalos
Lieff, Cabraser, Heimann & Bernstein - Nashville
contact info
Charles E. Schaffer
Levin Sedran & Berman
contact info
James J. Bilsborrow
Weltz & Luxenberg - New York
contact info
Vincent L. Greene, IV
Motley Rice - Providence
contact info
Michelle L. Kranz
Zoll & Kranz
contact info
Jeffrey S. Goldenberg
Goldenberg Schneider
contact info
Mikal C. Watts
Watts Guerra - San Antonio
contact info
Plaintiff
Jon Luke Affeltranger
Represented By
Max Kelly
Seeger Weiss - Newark
contact info
Michael J. O'Shea
Lipson O'Shea
contact info
Stephen R. Basser
Barrack, Rodos & Bacine - San Diego
contact info
Melanie S. Bailey
Burg Simpson Eldredge Hersh & Jardine - Cincinnati
contact info
David R. Buchanan
Seeger Weiss - Newark
contact info
David C. Harman
Burg Simpson - Cincinnati
contact info
Alyson Beridon
Herzfeld, Suetholz, Gastel, Leniski & Wall - Cincinnatti
contact info
John D. Hurst
Motley Rice - Morgantown
contact info
Wesley Kelman
Seeger Weiss - Newton
contact info
Andrew D. Schlichter
Schlichter Bogard - St. Louis
contact info
Christopher A. Seeger
Seeger Weiss - Newark
contact info
John G. Emerson
Emerson Firm
contact info
Michelle L. Kranz
Zoll & Kranz
contact info
Jacob R. Stout
Motley Rice - Morgantown
contact info
Matthew F. Pawa
Seeger Weiss - Newton Centre
contact info
Plaintiff
Harold R. Feezle
On Behalf of Themselves and All Others Similarly Situated 50263 State Route 14
East Palestine, OH 44413
Represented By
Jeffrey A. Barrack
Barrack, Rodos & Bacine - Philadelphia
contact info
Gary Martin DiMuzio
Simmons Hanly Conroy - Illinois
contact info
Michael J. O'Shea
Lipson O'Shea
contact info
Justin J. Presnal
Simmons Hanly Conroy - College Station
contact info
Stephen R. Basser
Barrack, Rodos & Bacine - San Diego
contact info
Benjamin A. Gastel
Herzfeld, Suetholz, Gastel, Leniski & Wall - Nashville
contact info
John Bierce Wetmore
Simmons Hanly Conroy - New York
contact info
Melanie S. Bailey
Burg Simpson Eldredge Hersh & Jardine - Cincinnati
contact info
Neal E. Shapero
Shapero & Roloff
contact info
Andrew J. Heo
Barrack, Rodos & Bacine
contact info
David C. Harman
Burg Simpson - Cincinnati
contact info
Andrew D. Schlichter
Schlichter Bogard - St. Louis
contact info
Sindhu S. Daniel
Grant & Eisenhofer - Wilmington
contact info
Nicholas T. Amato
contact info
Michelle L. Kranz
Zoll & Kranz
contact info
Benjamin A. Bertram
Bertram & Graf - Kansas City
contact info
Jayne Conroy
Simmons Hanly Conroy - Illinois
contact info
Daniel J. Thornburgh
Aylstock Witkin Kreis & Overholtz
contact info
Timothy Ray West
Bertram & Graf - Kansas City
contact info
Jo Anna Pollock
Simmons Hanly Conroy
contact info
Caitlin Lee Stephenson
Bertram & Graf - Kansas City
contact info
Luke T. Pepper
Burg Simpson Eldredge Hersh Jardine - Englewood
contact info
Thien An Vinh Truong
Simmons Hanly Conroy - New York
contact info
Adam J. Gomez
Grant & Eisenhofer - Wilmington
contact info
J. Scott Bertram
Bertram & Graf - Kansas City
contact info
Sarah Steffen Burns
Simmons Hanly Conroy - Illinois
contact info
Alyson Beridon
Herzfeld, Suetholz, Gastel, Leniski & Wall - Cincinnatti
contact info
John D. Hurst
Motley Rice - Morgantown
contact info
John G. Emerson
Emerson Firm
contact info
Andrew J. Thompson
Shapero Roloff
contact info
Jacob R. Stout
Motley Rice - Morgantown
contact info
Plaintiff
David J. Scheufele
On Behalf of Themselves and All Others Similarly Situated 298 East Clark Street
East Palestine, OH 44413
Represented By
Jo Anna Pollock
Simmons Hanly Conroy
contact info
Gary Martin DiMuzio
Simmons Hanly Conroy - Illinois
contact info
Michael J. O'Shea
Lipson O'Shea
contact info
Justin J. Presnal
Simmons Hanly Conroy - College Station
contact info
Stephen R. Basser
Barrack, Rodos & Bacine - San Diego
contact info
John Bierce Wetmore
Simmons Hanly Conroy - New York
contact info
Melanie S. Bailey
Burg Simpson Eldredge Hersh & Jardine - Cincinnati
contact info
Neal E. Shapero
Shapero & Roloff
contact info
Thien An Vinh Truong
Simmons Hanly Conroy - New York
contact info
Sarah Steffen Burns
Simmons Hanly Conroy - Illinois
contact info
David C. Harman
Burg Simpson - Cincinnati
contact info
Alyson Beridon
Herzfeld, Suetholz, Gastel, Leniski & Wall - Cincinnatti
contact info
John D. Hurst
Motley Rice - Morgantown
contact info
Andrew D. Schlichter
Schlichter Bogard - St. Louis
contact info
Nicholas T. Amato
contact info
John G. Emerson
Emerson Firm
contact info
Andrew J. Thompson
Shapero Roloff
contact info
Michelle L. Kranz
Zoll & Kranz
contact info
Jacob R. Stout
Motley Rice - Morgantown
contact info
Jayne Conroy
Simmons Hanly Conroy - Illinois
contact info
Plaintiff
Susan E Scheufele
On Behalf of Themselves and All Others Similarly Situated 298 East Clark Street
East Palestine, OH 44413
Represented By
Jo Anna Pollock
Simmons Hanly Conroy
contact info
Gary Martin DiMuzio
Simmons Hanly Conroy - Illinois
contact info
Michael J. O'Shea
Lipson O'Shea
contact info
Justin J. Presnal
Simmons Hanly Conroy - College Station
contact info
Stephen R. Basser
Barrack, Rodos & Bacine - San Diego
contact info
John Bierce Wetmore
Simmons Hanly Conroy - New York
contact info
Melanie S. Bailey
Burg Simpson Eldredge Hersh & Jardine - Cincinnati
contact info
Neal E. Shapero
Shapero & Roloff
contact info
Thien An Vinh Truong
Simmons Hanly Conroy - New York
contact info
Sarah Steffen Burns
Simmons Hanly Conroy - Illinois
contact info
David C. Harman
Burg Simpson - Cincinnati
contact info
Alyson Beridon
Herzfeld, Suetholz, Gastel, Leniski & Wall - Cincinnatti
contact info
John D. Hurst
Motley Rice - Morgantown
contact info
Andrew D. Schlichter
Schlichter Bogard - St. Louis
contact info
Nicholas T. Amato
contact info
John G. Emerson
Emerson Firm
contact info
Andrew J. Thompson
Shapero Roloff
contact info
Michelle L. Kranz
Zoll & Kranz
contact info
Jacob R. Stout
Motley Rice - Morgantown
contact info
Jayne Conroy
Simmons Hanly Conroy - Illinois
contact info
Plaintiff
Rosemary Mozuch
Represented By
Michael J. O'Shea
Lipson O'Shea
contact info
Stephen R. Basser
Barrack, Rodos & Bacine - San Diego
contact info
Melanie S. Bailey
Burg Simpson Eldredge Hersh & Jardine - Cincinnati
contact info
Lane L Vines
Berger Montague - Philadelphia
contact info
Shanon J. Carson
Berger & Montague - Philadelphia
contact info
David C. Harman
Burg Simpson - Cincinnati
contact info
Alyson Beridon
Herzfeld, Suetholz, Gastel, Leniski & Wall - Cincinnatti
contact info
John D. Hurst
Motley Rice - Morgantown
contact info
Andrew D. Schlichter
Schlichter Bogard - St. Louis
contact info
John G. Emerson
Emerson Firm
contact info
Michelle L. Kranz
Zoll & Kranz
contact info
Jacob R. Stout
Motley Rice - Morgantown
contact info
Dena R. Young
Berger Montague - Philadelphia
contact info
Plaintiff
Charles Mozuch
Represented By
Michael J. O'Shea
Lipson O'Shea
contact info
Stephen R. Basser
Barrack, Rodos & Bacine - San Diego
contact info
Melanie S. Bailey
Burg Simpson Eldredge Hersh & Jardine - Cincinnati
contact info
Lane L Vines
Berger Montague - Philadelphia
contact info
Shanon J. Carson
Berger & Montague - Philadelphia
contact info
David C. Harman
Burg Simpson - Cincinnati
contact info
Alyson Beridon
Herzfeld, Suetholz, Gastel, Leniski & Wall - Cincinnatti
contact info
John D. Hurst
Motley Rice - Morgantown
contact info
Andrew D. Schlichter
Schlichter Bogard - St. Louis
contact info
John G. Emerson
Emerson Firm
contact info
Michelle L. Kranz
Zoll & Kranz
contact info
Jacob R. Stout
Motley Rice - Morgantown
contact info
Dena R. Young
Berger Montague - Philadelphia
contact info
Plaintiff
Laura Mann
650 E. Martin St.
East Palestine, OH 44413
Represented By
Paige Boldt
Watts Guerra - San Antonio
contact info
Alyson Beridon
Herzfeld, Suetholz, Gastel, Leniski & Wall - Cincinnatti
contact info
Michael J. O'Shea
Lipson O'Shea
contact info
John D. Hurst
Motley Rice - Morgantown
contact info
Andrew D. Schlichter
Schlichter Bogard - St. Louis
contact info
Jay H. Henderson
Watts Guerra - San Antonio
contact info
Michelle L. Kranz
Zoll & Kranz
contact info
Jacob R. Stout
Motley Rice - Morgantown
contact info
Plaintiff
Marilyn Figley
Represented By
Jo Anna Pollock
Simmons Hanly Conroy
contact info
Gary Martin DiMuzio
Simmons Hanly Conroy - Illinois
contact info
Michael J. O'Shea
Lipson O'Shea
contact info
Justin J. Presnal
Simmons Hanly Conroy - College Station
contact info
Stephen R. Basser
Barrack, Rodos & Bacine - San Diego
contact info
John Bierce Wetmore
Simmons Hanly Conroy - New York
contact info
Melanie S. Bailey
Burg Simpson Eldredge Hersh & Jardine - Cincinnati
contact info
Neal E. Shapero
Shapero & Roloff
contact info
Thien An Vinh Truong
Simmons Hanly Conroy - New York
contact info
Sarah Steffen Burns
Simmons Hanly Conroy - Illinois
contact info
David C. Harman
Burg Simpson - Cincinnati
contact info
Alyson Beridon
Herzfeld, Suetholz, Gastel, Leniski & Wall - Cincinnatti
contact info
John D. Hurst
Motley Rice - Morgantown
contact info
Andrew D. Schlichter
Schlichter Bogard - St. Louis
contact info
Nicholas T. Amato
contact info
John G. Emerson
Emerson Firm
contact info
Andrew J. Thompson
Shapero Roloff
contact info
Michelle L. Kranz
Zoll & Kranz
contact info
Jacob R. Stout
Motley Rice - Morgantown
contact info
Jayne Conroy
Simmons Hanly Conroy - Illinois
contact info
Plaintiff
Edward E. Barnhouse
Represented By
Michael J. O'Shea
Lipson O'Shea
contact info
Stephen R. Basser
Barrack, Rodos & Bacine - San Diego
contact info
Melanie S. Bailey
Burg Simpson Eldredge Hersh & Jardine - Cincinnati
contact info
David C. Harman
Burg Simpson - Cincinnati
contact info
Katherine G. McCormick
Elk & Elk
contact info
Alyson Beridon
Herzfeld, Suetholz, Gastel, Leniski & Wall - Cincinnatti
contact info
John D. Hurst
Motley Rice - Morgantown
contact info
Andrew D. Schlichter
Schlichter Bogard - St. Louis
contact info
Aaron S. Freedman
Weitz & Luxenberg - New York
contact info
John G. Emerson
Emerson Firm
contact info
James M. Kelley, III
Elk & Elk
contact info
Michelle L. Kranz
Zoll & Kranz
contact info
Jacob R. Stout
Motley Rice - Morgantown
contact info
Plaintiff
Rollerena Auto Sales, LLC
Represented By
Jo Anna Pollock
Simmons Hanly Conroy
contact info
Gary Martin DiMuzio
Simmons Hanly Conroy - Illinois
contact info
Michael J. O'Shea
Lipson O'Shea
contact info
Justin J. Presnal
Simmons Hanly Conroy - College Station
contact info
Stephen R. Basser
Barrack, Rodos & Bacine - San Diego
contact info
John Bierce Wetmore
Simmons Hanly Conroy - New York
contact info
Melanie S. Bailey
Burg Simpson Eldredge Hersh & Jardine - Cincinnati
contact info
Neal E. Shapero
Shapero & Roloff
contact info
Thien An Vinh Truong
Simmons Hanly Conroy - New York
contact info
Sarah Steffen Burns
Simmons Hanly Conroy - Illinois
contact info
David C. Harman
Burg Simpson - Cincinnati
contact info
Alyson Beridon
Herzfeld, Suetholz, Gastel, Leniski & Wall - Cincinnatti
contact info
John D. Hurst
Motley Rice - Morgantown
contact info
Andrew D. Schlichter
Schlichter Bogard - St. Louis
contact info
Nicholas T. Amato
contact info
John G. Emerson
Emerson Firm
contact info
Andrew J. Thompson
Shapero Roloff
contact info
Michelle L. Kranz
Zoll & Kranz
contact info
Jacob R. Stout
Motley Rice - Morgantown
contact info
Jayne Conroy
Simmons Hanly Conroy - Illinois
contact info

GPO Mar 13 2024
Memorandum of Opinion and Order For the reasons set forth herein and as earlier announced, Norfolk Southern's Motion to Dismiss and to Strike (ECF No. 76) is granted in part and denied in part. To the extent that Plaintiffs have pleaded "medical monitoring" as a separate cause of action on behalf of the Ohio residents, the Court grants the motion to dismiss Count XIII. Nevertheless, because, in Ohio, medical monitoring is an element of damages, should Norfolk Southern become liable for an underlying tort claim, medical monitoring can be imposed. All other claims and remedies of Plaintiffs remain pending against Norfolk Southern. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 3/13/2024. (JLG)
GPO Mar 13 2024
Memorandum of Opinion and Order For the reasons set forth herein and as earlier announced, Third-party Defendant OxyVinyls LP's Motion to Dismiss the Third-party Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) (ECF No. 188) is granted in part and denied in part. Third-party Defendant Trinity Industries Leasing Company's Motion to Dismiss the Third-party Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2) and (6) (ECF No. 190) is granted in part and denied in part.Third-party Defendants GATX Corporation and General American Marks Company's Motion to Dismiss the Third-party Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) (ECF No. 194) is granted in part and denied in part. The Court grants the motions to dismiss Count Four without prejudice. All other claims and remedies of Norfolk Southern remain pending against Trinity, OxyVinyls, GATX, and General American. At this juncture, Norfolk Southern's claim for contribution (Count Four) against Trinity, OxyVinyls, GATX, and General American under Ohio law is premature. Should Norfolk Southern become liable, that claim will ripen. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 3/13/2024. (JLG)
GPO Mar 13 2024
Memorandum of Opinion and Order For the reasons set forth herein and as earlier announced, New Party Defendants GATX Corporation and General American Marks Company's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Master Consolidated Class Action Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) (ECF No. 205) is granted in part and denied in part. New Party Defendant Trinity Industries Leasing Company's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Master Consolidated Class Action Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)( 2) and (6) (ECF No. 206) is granted in part and denied in part. New Party Defendant OxyVinyls LP's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Master Consolidated Class Action Complaint Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) and/or to Strike Request for Punitive Damages Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) (ECF No. 207) is granted in part and denied in part. To the extent that Plaintiffs have pleaded "medical monitoring" as a separate cause of action on behalf of the Ohio residents, the Court grants the motion to dismiss Count XIII. Nevertheless, because, in Ohio, medical monitoring is an element of damages, should GATX,General American, Trinity, and/or OxyVinyls become liable for an underlying tort claim, medical monitoring can be imposed against that tortfeasor(s). All other claims and remedies of Plaintiffs remain pending against GATX, General American, Trinity, and OxyVinyls. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 3/13/2024. (JLG)
GPO Jan 14 2025
Order Norfolk Southern's Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Pleading to the Third-Party Complaint (ECF No. 569) is granted. Norfolk Southern shall file its Supplemental Pleading to its Third-Party Complaint within one day of the filing of this Order. Within seven days of the filing of this Order, OxyVinyls, GATX, and General American shall file any specific answer or affirmative defenses to the contribution claim they believe appropriate. No additional dispositive motions may be filed by any party, including Norfolk Southern. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 1/13/25.(P,R)
GPO Jan 16 2025
Memorandum Opinion and Order For the reasons set forth herein, Plaintiffs' Motions for an Order Requiring Objector Rev. Joseph Sheely to Post an Appeal Bond (ECF No. 567) and for an Order Requiring Appellants Zsuzsa Troyan, Tamara Freeze, Sharon Lynch, and Carly Tunno to Post an Appeal Bond (ECF No. 671) are granted. Within 14 days of entry of this Order, Appellants Rev. Joseph Sheely, Zsuzsa Troyan, Tamara Freeze, Sharon Lynch, and Carly Tunno shall each contribute $170,000 towards a total bond of $850,000 to be posted with the Clerk of Court to protect the interests of the Class and ensure payment of costs on appeal. The appeal bond shall be the responsibility of all Appellants. If any Appellant withdraws their appeal, the remaining Appellants are responsible for the entire bond amount. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 1/16/2025. (JLG)
GPO Jan 19 2025
Memorandum of Opinion and Order For the reasons set forth herein and those that have been articulated in the memorandum of the points and authorities on which GATX relies, Norfolk Southern's Motion to Exclude the Expert Report and Testimony of Dr. Lemberg (ECF No. 627) is denied. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 1/19/2025. Related document(s) 586, 622, 624, 627, 629. (JLG)
GPO Jan 22 2025
Order For the reasons set forth herein, the Court denies GATX's Motion to Exclude the Testimony of Gary Wolf (ECF No. 624). Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 1/22/2025. Related document(s) 682, 697. (JLG)
GPO Jan 22 2025
Order For the reasons set forth herein, the Court grants in part, and denies in part, Norfolk Southern's Motion to Exclude the Expert Report and Testimony of Dr. Chason Coelho (ECF No. 621) as set forth herein. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 1/22/2025. Related document(s) 673, 700. (JLG)
GPO Jan 24 2025
Memorandum of Opinion and Order For the reasons set forth herein and those that have been articulated in the memorandum of the points and authorities on which GATX relies, Norfolk Southern's Motion to Exclude the Expert Report and Testimony of James H. Rader (ECF No. 629) is denied. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 1/24/2025. (JLG)
GPO Jan 27 2025
Order For the reasons set forth herein, the Court grants Third-Party Plaintiffs Norfolk Southern Corporation and Norfolk Southern Railway Company's Motion to Exclude the Expert Report and Testimony of Dr. Abid Kemal. (ECF No. 625). Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 1/27/2025. Related document(s) 687, 702. (JLG)
GPO Jan 27 2025
d scientific accuracy of the warnings and safety data sheets. His opinions on witness credibility are excluded. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 1/27/2025. Related document(s) 677, 693. (JLG) Order For the reasons set forth herein, OxyVinyls' Motion to Exclude (ECF No. 616) is denied in part and granted in part. The Court denies the motion to exclude Dr. Coates' opinions regarding his expertise on polymerization an
GPO Jan 27 2025
Order For the reasons set forth herein, Norfolk Southern's Motion to Exclude (ECF No. 623) is granted in part and denied in part. Because the Court finds that Mr. Harnett's opinions on risk assessment, SDS, and emergency response are reliable and based on reliable methodology, the motion to exclude them is denied. Because Mr. Harnett is not qualified to opine on confirmation bias, the opinions he rendered on that topic are excluded. Accordingly, Section VI(B) and conclusion Section VII(C)(2) of his report are excluded. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 1/27/2025. Related document(s) 669, 701. (JLG)
GPO Jan 29 2025
Order For the reasons set forth herein, Norfolk Southern's Motion to Exclude (ECF No. 628) is granted in its entirety. Dr. Melhem and his opinion are excluded. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 1/29/2025. Related document(s) 668, 704. (JLG)
GPO Jan 31 2025
Order GATX's Motion to Exclude (ECF No. 619) is granted in part, that is: the Court excludes Mr. Lunsford's opinion and testimony on the identification or existence of biases. GATX's motion to exclude Mr. Lunsford's opinions is denied in all other respects. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 1/31/25.(P,R)
GPO Jan 31 2025
Memorandum of Opinion and Order denying Norfolk Southern's Motion to Exclude the Expert Report and Testimony of Drs. Lee Swanger and Sarah Parker (Related Doc # 630). Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 1/31/25.(P,R)
GPO Jan 31 2025
Order denying in its entirety GTX's Motion to Exclude Testimony of Joseph Poplawski (Related Doc # 622). Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 1/31/25.(P,R)
GPO Feb 03 2025
Order For the reasons set forth herein, Third-Party Defendants GATX Corporation and General American Marks Company's Motion to Exclude in Part the Expert Testimony of Allan Zarembski (ECF No. 626) is denied. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 2/3/2025. Related document(s) 683, 708. (JLG)
GPO Feb 21 2025
Memorandum of Opinion and Order For the reasons set forth herein, Norfolk Southern's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against OxyVinyls (ECF No.615) is denied. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 2/21/2025. Related document(s) 685, 698. (JLG)
GPO Feb 21 2025
Memorandum of Opinion and Order For the reasons set forth herein, Norfolk Southern's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against GATX (ECF No. 618) is denied. The statement in the prior Daubert rulings that "the L1 wheel of GPLX 75465 - whose failed roller bearing caused the derailment on February 3, 2023" is corrected to read "the L1 wheel of GPLX 75465 - whose failed roller bearing Norfolk Southern argues caused the derailment on February 3, 2023." See Memorandum of Opinion and Order (ECF No. 734) at PageID #: 51940; Memorandum of Opinion and Order (ECF No. 741) at PageID #: 52344; and, Memorandum of Opinion and Order (ECF No. 753-1) at PageID #: 52576. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 2/21/2025. Related document(s) 684, 699. (JLG)
GPO Feb 21 2025
Memorandum of Opinion and Order Because Norfolk Southern does not oppose OxyVinyls' Motion for Summary Judgment as to Count One (ECF No. 631), summary judgment is granted in favor of OxyVinyls on Count One. Because the elements raised in Count Two are material and in genuine dispute, OxyVinyls' Motion for Summary Judgment on Count Two is denied. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 2/21/2025. Related document(s) 676, 694. (JLG)
GPO Feb 21 2025
Memorandum of Opinion and Order For the reasons set forth herein, GATX's Motion for Summary Judgment on Norfolk Southern's Count One and Count Three (ECF No. 645) is granted in part and denied in part. Accordingly, GATX's Motion for Summary Judgment on Count One is granted. GATX's Motion for Summary Judgment on Count Three is denied. General American Marks Company is dismissed. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 2/21/2025. Related document(s) 675, 709. (JLG)
GPO Mar 24 2025
Order Trial commences on 3/31/2025. The parties expected at Trial have filed 26 Motions in Limine. The Court resolves them as follows. ECF Nos. 810, 816, 822, 823, 824, 826, and 830 are denied. ECF Nos. 805, 806, 807, 811, 812, 813, 814, 815, 819, and 820 are granted. ECF Nos. 808, 809, and 821 are deferred. ECF Nos. 817, 818, 825, and 828 are granted with caution. ECF Nos. 827 and 829 are deferred and denied in part. In adion, or argument shall contravene the rulings made herein. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 3/24/2025. (JLG)dition, as ordered by the Court above, Norfolk Southern shall identify the specific evidence it seeks to exclude and explain why, within 3 pages, by 3/26/2025 at 4:00 p.m. (regarding ECF No. 809); OxyVinyls shall reply, within 3 pages, by 3/26/2025 at 4:00 p.m. (regarding ECF No. 821); and parties shall consult and agree on proper redactions and suggest an appropriate cautionary instruction for the jury by 3/26/2025 at 4:00 p.m (regarding ECF No. 827). No statement, question, oral object

Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
appeal Acknowledgment from the USCA Fri 05/02 2:17 PM
Acknowledgment from the USCA for Sixth Circuit of receipt of975 Notice of Appeal (USCA# 25-3342 . Date filed in USCA 5/2/25. (H,SP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
976 976 minutes ~Util - Terminate Motions Order Tue 04/29 11:55 AM
Order For good cause shown, Plaintiffs CeramFab, Inc., CeramSource, Inc., Yonggong, LLC, and WYG Refractories, LLC's (collectively "CeramFab Plaintiffs") Motion to Restore Case to Active Docket (ECF No.732 ) is granted without opposition. Case No. 4:23CV2206 is reinstated to the Court's active docket. Counsel for CeramFab Plaintiffs and Defendants Norfolk Southern Corporation and Norfolk Southern Railway Company ("Norfolk Southern") shall meet and confer. On or before 5/13/2025, counsel for CeramFab Plaintiffs and Norfolk Southern shall file a Joint Status Report that sets forth a proposed schedule for Case No. 4:23CV2206 going forward (including a cutoff date for Norfolk Southern to move, plead or otherwise respond to the Complaint (ECF No.1 )). Furthermore, between 1/30/2025 and 2/5/2025, 14 new cases were filed by individuals and businesses who have allegedly validly opted out of the Settlement. On or before 5/13/2025, counsel for Norfolk Southern shall file a separate Status Report updating the Court on any consultations they have had with any of the other 414 individuals and businesses who have validly opted out of the Settlement and are not named in the 14 new cases. In addition, the separate Status Report shall update the Court on any consultations they have hadwith Plaintiffs' counsel in Case Nos. 4:24CV0587 and 4:24CV1024 ("the insurance cases"). A separate Case Management Conference Scheduling Order will be issued for Case No. 4:23CV2206. The Clerk of Court shall docket the within Order in Case Nos. 4:23CV242 and 4:23CV2206. Thereafter, all pleadings and other papers for the case brought by CeramFab Plaintiffs shall only be filed in and docket entries shall only be made in Case No. 4:23CV2206. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 4/29/2025. (JLG)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
975 975 appeal Notice of Appeal Mon 04/28 11:19 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to the Sixth Circuit Court of Appeals as to923 Order on Motion to extend deadlines, by David Graham. ( Filing fee $ 605 receipt number AOHNDC-13072115.). (Graham, David)
Related: [-]