Wisconsin Western District Court
Judge:James D Peterson
Referred: Anita Marie Boor
Case #: 3:23-cv-00096
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Feb 08, 2023
Terminated:Jan 10, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Aug 12, 2023 6:55 AM CDT
Defendant
Amber Brozek
Represented By
Kiley B. Zellner
Crivello Carlson, S.C.
contact info
Samuel C. Hall, Jr.
Crivello Carlson, S.C.
contact info
Defendant
Marie Nofodji
Represented By
Kiley B. Zellner
Crivello Carlson, S.C.
contact info
Samuel C. Hall, Jr.
Crivello Carlson, S.C.
contact info
Defendant
Alexa Graham
Represented By
Kiley B. Zellner
Crivello Carlson, S.C.
contact info
Amanda Jane Kaiser
Boardman & Clark LLP
contact info
Austin Doan
Boardman & Clark LLP
contact info
Defendant
Aaron Baratz
Represented By
Kiley B. Zellner
Crivello Carlson, S.C.
contact info
Samuel C. Hall, Jr.
Crivello Carlson, S.C.
contact info
Defendant
Kurt Wege
Represented By
Kiley B. Zellner
Crivello Carlson, S.C.
contact info
Amanda Jane Kaiser
Boardman & Clark LLP
contact info
Austin Doan
Boardman & Clark LLP
contact info
Defendant
Joel Stelter
Represented By
Kiley B. Zellner
Crivello Carlson, S.C.
contact info
Amanda Jane Kaiser
Boardman & Clark LLP
contact info
Austin Doan
Boardman & Clark LLP
contact info
Defendant
Norbert Schaetz
Represented By
Kiley B. Zellner
Crivello Carlson, S.C.
contact info
Samuel C. Hall, Jr.
Crivello Carlson, S.C.
contact info
Defendant
Edjron Pearson
Represented By
Kiley B. Zellner
Crivello Carlson, S.C.
contact info
Samuel C. Hall, Jr.
Crivello Carlson, S.C.
contact info
Defendant
Ryan Moorad
Represented By
Kiley B. Zellner
Crivello Carlson, S.C.
contact info
Samuel C. Hall, Jr.
Crivello Carlson, S.C.
contact info
Defendant
Elijah Misener
Represented By
Kiley B. Zellner
Crivello Carlson, S.C.
contact info
Amanda Jane Kaiser
Boardman & Clark LLP
contact info
Austin Doan
Boardman & Clark LLP
contact info
Defendant
Melisa Mendoza
Represented By
Kiley B. Zellner
Crivello Carlson, S.C.
contact info
Samuel C. Hall, Jr.
Crivello Carlson, S.C.
contact info
Defendant
Jeff Meek
Represented By
Kiley B. Zellner
Crivello Carlson, S.C.
contact info
Samuel C. Hall, Jr.
Crivello Carlson, S.C.
contact info
Defendant
Catherine Marino
Represented By
Kiley B. Zellner
Crivello Carlson, S.C.
contact info
Amanda Jane Kaiser
Boardman & Clark LLP
contact info
Austin Doan
Boardman & Clark LLP
contact info
Defendant
John Bauman
Represented By
Kiley B. Zellner
Crivello Carlson, S.C.
contact info
Samuel C. Hall, Jr.
Crivello Carlson, S.C.
contact info
Defendant
City of Madison
Represented By
Kiley B. Zellner
Crivello Carlson, S.C.
contact info
Amanda Jane Kaiser
Boardman & Clark LLP
contact info
Austin Doan
Boardman & Clark LLP
contact info
Defendant
Thomas Dahms
Represented By
Kiley B. Zellner
Crivello Carlson, S.C.
contact info
Amanda Jane Kaiser
Boardman & Clark LLP
contact info
Austin Doan
Boardman & Clark LLP
contact info
Defendant
Dane County
Represented By
Kiley B. Zellner
Crivello Carlson, S.C.
contact info
Samuel C. Hall, Jr.
Crivello Carlson, S.C.
contact info
Defendant
Christopher Dornan
Represented By
Kiley B. Zellner
Crivello Carlson, S.C.
contact info
Amanda Jane Kaiser
Boardman & Clark LLP
contact info
Austin Doan
Boardman & Clark LLP
contact info
Defendant
Brittney Lathrop
Represented By
Kiley B. Zellner
Crivello Carlson, S.C.
contact info
Amanda Jane Kaiser
Boardman & Clark LLP
contact info
Austin Doan
Boardman & Clark LLP
contact info
Defendant
Sarah Lawrence
Represented By
Kiley B. Zellner
Crivello Carlson, S.C.
contact info
Amanda Jane Kaiser
Boardman & Clark LLP
contact info
Austin Doan
Boardman & Clark LLP
contact info
Defendant
Rebecca Lindsey
Represented By
Kiley B. Zellner
Crivello Carlson, S.C.
contact info
Amanda Jane Kaiser
Boardman & Clark LLP
contact info
Austin Doan
Boardman & Clark LLP
contact info
Defendant
Javier Loredo
Represented By
Kiley B. Zellner
Crivello Carlson, S.C.
contact info
Amanda Jane Kaiser
Boardman & Clark LLP
contact info
Austin Doan
Boardman & Clark LLP
contact info
Defendant
Haley Massey
Represented By
Kiley B. Zellner
Crivello Carlson, S.C.
contact info
Amanda Jane Kaiser
Boardman & Clark LLP
contact info
Austin Doan
Boardman & Clark LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
State of Wisconsin Department of Health & Family Services
Represented By
Allison Marks Welch
State Of Wisconsin Department Of Health Services
contact info
Plaintiff - The Estate of
Abdoul Malick Sillah
Represented By
Christopher G. Meadows
First, Albrecht & Blondis
contact info
Bryn I Baker
First, Albrecht & Blondis, S.C.
contact info
James P. End
First, Albrecht & Blondis, S.C.
contact info
Thomas Chandler Lenz
First, Albrecht & Blondis, S.C.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
John Doe 1
Terminated: 04/12/2023
Represented By
Kiley B. Zellner
Crivello Carlson, S.C.
contact info

GPO Nov 01 2024
OPINION and ORDER granting in part 114 Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony of Steven F. Oakes; granting in part and denying in part 119 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 124 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 187 Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw fact No. 49 from Plaintiff's Statements of Additional Proposed Facts in Opposition to City & County Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment. Summary judgment is denied for Loredo. Defendants Amber Brozek, Thomas Dahms, Dane County, Christopher Dornan, Brittney Lathrop, Sarah Lawrence, Rebecca Lindsey, Catherine Marino, Haley Massey, Jeff Meek, Melisa Mendoza, Elijah Misener, Ryan Moorad, Marie Nofodji, Edjron Pearson, Norbert Schaetz, Joel Stelter, Kurt Wege, Aaron Baratz, John Bauman, and involuntary plaintiff State of Wisconsin Department of Health & Family Services are dismissed. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 11/1/24. (jat)
GPO Dec 11 2024
OPINION and ORDER granting in part and denying in part 217 Plaintiff's Motions in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 226 Defendant's Motions in Limine. Parties are directed to update their witness and exhibit lists in light of this order. Copies of the court's drafts of the voir dire, special verdict form, and jury instructions are attached. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 12/11/24. (Attachments: # (1) Draft Voir Dire, # (2) Draft Introductory Instructions, # (3) Draft Post-Trial Instructions Liability, # (4) Draft Post-Trial Instructions Damages, # (5) Draft Special Verdict, # (6) Draft Special Verdict: Damages) (jat)

Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, February 24, 2025
293 293 order Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Order on Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 02/24 1:58 PM
** TEXT ONLY ORDER ** After judgment was entered in this case but before the deadline for plaintiff to file a notice of appeal, the parties reached a settlement and they stipulate that all claims may be dismissed with prejudice and that the costs are deemed satisfied. Dkt.292 . The parties' stipulation is APPROVED. Plaintiffs' claims are DISMISSED with prejudice and defendant's motion for attorney fees, Dkt.282 , is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge James D. Peterson on 2/24/25. (jat)
Related: [-]
292 292 motion Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 02/24 10:05 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal and Satisfaction of Costs (Lenz, Thomas)
Related: [-]