Ad Hoc Group of Borrowers v. Celsius Network LLC et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10964
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10964
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Martin Glenn |
Case #: | 1:23-ap-01007 |
Nature of Suit | 2 Bankruptcy - Other 21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property 91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Feb 07, 2023 |
Terminated: | Feb 21, 2024 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Celsius Network LLC
121 River Street PH05
Hoboken, NJ 07030 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
CELSIUS KEYFI LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Celsius Lending LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Celsius Mining LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Celsius Network Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Celsius Network Limited
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Celsius Networks Lending LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Celsius US Holdings LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ad Hoc Group of Borrowers
825 8th Avenue 31st Floor
New York, NY 10019 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Wednesday, February 21, 2024 | ||
misc
Close Adversary Proceeding
Wed 02/21 3:08 PM
Adversary Case 1:23-ap-1007 Closed. This Adversary Proceeding is Closed Subject to the Filing of a Notice of Appeal Within Fourteen (14) Days of the Entry of the Order Terminating this Adversary Proceeding. (Anderson, Deanna) |
||
Monday, February 05, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice, Dismissal
Mon 02/05 10:52 AM
Notice of Dismissal /Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant To FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i) filed by David J. Adler on behalf of Ad Hoc Group of Borrowers. (Adler, David) |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
115
pgs
misc
Transcript
Wed 08/23 8:45 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 07/18/2023 At 10:01 AM RE: Status Conference.; Etc. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 11/21/2023. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.) . Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 8/30/2023. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 9/13/2023. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 9/25/2023. Transcript access will be restricted through 11/21/2023. (Ramos, Jonathan) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Affidavit of Service
Tue 07/18 7:27 PM
Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Status Conference on the Complaint for Declaratory Judgment (Docket No. 6) filed by Stretto.(Klamser, Robert) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice, Hearing
Fri 07/14 3:25 PM
Notice of Hearing / Notice of Status Conference on the Complaint for Declaratory Judgment filed by Joshua Sussberg on behalf of Celsius Network LLC. with hearing to be held on 7/18/2023 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (MG) (Sussberg, Joshua) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
147
pgs
misc
Transcript
Wed 07/12 8:49 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 06/28/2023 At 10:03 AM RE: Status Conference. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 10/10/2023. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.) . Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 7/19/2023. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 8/2/2023. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 8/14/2023. Transcript access will be restricted through 10/10/2023. (Ramos, Jonathan) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Affidavit of Service
Wed 06/14 2:33 PM
Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Status Conference (Docket No. 3) filed by Stretto.(Klamser, Robert) |
|
Wednesday, June 07, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice, Hearing
Wed 06/07 11:37 PM
Notice of Hearing / Notice of Status Conference filed by Joshua Sussberg on behalf of Celsius Network LLC. with hearing to be held on 6/28/2023 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (MG) (Sussberg, Joshua) |
|
Thursday, February 09, 2023 | ||
crditcrd
Auto - docket of credit card
Thu 02/09 10:24 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 23-01007 mg] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16085524. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Wednesday, February 08, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
cmp
Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference
Wed 02/08 10:28 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office with Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/18/2023 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (MG), Answer due by 3/10/2023, (Ramos, Jonathan) |
|
Tuesday, February 07, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (fee)
Tue 02/07 3:59 PM
Adversary case 23-01007 Complaint against Celsius Network LLC (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (91 (Declaratory judgment)), (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)), (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by David J. Adler on behalf of Ad Hoc Group of Borrowers. (Adler, David) |