New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 15
Judge:John P Mastando III
Case #: 1:23-bk-10193
Case Filed:Feb 08, 2023

Debtor
Oi S.A.

,
Represented By
Philip Abelson
White & Case
contact info
Last checked: never
Foreign Representative
Antonio Reinaldo Rabelo Filho
Represented By
Philip Abelson
White & Case
contact info
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee - NY Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green, Room 534
New York, NY 10004


Docket last updated: 38 minutes ago
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
44 44 misc Certificate of Service Tue 06/18 5:40 PM
Certificate of Service of Richard S. Kebrdle Related [+] filed by Richard Kebrdle on behalf of Antonio Reinaldo Rabelo Filho. (Kebrdle, Richard)
Related: [-] 41 ,42 ,43
43 43 notice Notice, Hearing Tue 06/18 10:10 AM
Notice of Hearing / Notice of Cancelled Hearing on Motion for Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a), 1145(a), 1507(a), 1521(a), and 1525(a) (I) Enforcing the Brazilian RJ Plan in the United States and (II) Granting Related Relief Related [+] filed by Richard Kebrdle on behalf of Antonio Reinaldo Rabelo Filho. with hearing to be held on 6/20/2024 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (JPM) (Kebrdle, Richard)
Related: [-] 37 ,40 ,39 ,42
Monday, June 17, 2024
42 42 order Motion, Approve Mon 06/17 2:59 PM
Order signed on 6/17/2024 Granting Full Force And Effect To The Brazilian RJ Plan in the United States and (II) Granting Related Relief Related [+]. (Rodriguez-Castillo, Maria)
Related: [-] 37
Friday, June 14, 2024
41 41 misc Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 Fri 06/14 11:49 AM
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 Related [+] Filed by Richard Kebrdle on behalf of Antonio Reinaldo Rabelo Filho.(Kebrdle, Richard)
Related: [-] 37 ,39 ,38
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
Monday, June 03, 2024
40 40 misc Certificate of Service Mon 06/03 1:03 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Richard Kebrdle on behalf of Antonio Reinaldo Rabelo Filho. (Kebrdle, Richard)
Related: [-] 37 ,39 ,38
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
39 39 notice Notice, Hearing Wed 05/29 11:59 PM
Notice of Hearing on Motion for Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a), 1145(a), 1507(a), 1521(a), and 1525(a) (I) Enforcing the Brazilian RJ Plan in the United States and (II) Granting Related Relief Related [+] filed by Ricardo Pasianotto on behalf of Antonio Reinaldo Rabelo Filho. with hearing to be held on 6/20/2024 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (JPM) Objections due by 6/13/2024, (Pasianotto, Ricardo)
Related: [-] 37
38 38 answer Declaration Wed 05/29 11:46 PM
Declaration of Sergio Savi Pursuant to 20 U.S.C. § 1746 in Support of the Motion for Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a), 1145(a), 1507(a), 1521(a), and 1525(a) (I) Enforcing the Brazilian RJ Plan and (II) Granting Related Relief Related [+] filed by Richard Kebrdle on behalf of Antonio Reinaldo Rabelo Filho. with hearing to be held on 6/20/2024 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (JPM) Objections due by 6/13/2024,
Related: [-] 37
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Judicial Administrators Report and Minutes of the Final GCM (English and Portuguese
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Brazilian Confirmation Order) (Kebrdle, Richard
37 37 motion Motion, Approve Wed 05/29 11:38 PM
Motion to Approve / Motion for Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a), 1145(a), 1507(a), 1521(a), and 1525(a) (I) Enforcing the Brazilian RJ Plan in the United States and (II) Granting Related Relief filed by Richard Kebrdle on behalf of Antonio Reinaldo Rabelo Filho with hearing to be held on 6/20/2024 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (JPM) Responses due by 6/13/2024,. (Kebrdle, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Notice Parties List
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
36 36 ans Statement Tue 04/23 4:25 PM
Statement Notifying the Court of Developments in the Brazilian RJ Proceeding Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 1518 filed by Ricardo Pasianotto on behalf of Antonio Reinaldo Rabelo Filho. (Pasianotto, Ricardo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Final RJ Plan
Friday, February 09, 2024
35 35 ans Statement Fri 02/09 5:04 PM
Statement Notifying the Court of Developments in the Brazilian RJ Proceeding Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 1518 filed by Ricardo Pasianotto on behalf of Antonio Reinaldo Rabelo Filho. (Pasianotto, Ricardo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
34 34 ans Statement Thu 12/21 10:11 AM
Statement Notifying the Court of Developments in the Brazilian RJ Proceeding Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 1518 filed by Philip Abelson on behalf of Antonio Reinaldo Rabelo Filho. (Abelson, Philip)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 18, 2023
33 33 20 pgs misc Transcript Tue 04/18 7:16 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 3/29/2023 at 10:00am RE: Order signed on 2/13/2023 Pursuant to Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure 2002(m) and (q) and 9007 for Order Scheduling Hearing and Approving Form and Manner of Service of Notice. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 7/17/2023. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Legal Solutions.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.) Related [+]. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 4/25/2023. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 5/9/2023. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 5/19/2023. Transcript access will be restricted through 7/17/2023. (Garcia, Pedro)
Related: [-] 13
Friday, April 07, 2023
32 32 misc Certificate of Service Fri 04/07 12:02 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Philip Abelson on behalf of Antonio Reinaldo Rabelo Filho. (Abelson, Philip)
Related: [-] 30
31 31 misc Certificate of Service Fri 04/07 12:02 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Philip Abelson on behalf of Antonio Reinaldo Rabelo Filho. (Abelson, Philip)
Related: [-] 29 ,28
Wednesday, March 29, 2023
30 30 5 pgs order Motion, Approve Wed 03/29 9:31 PM
Order signed on 3/29/2023 Granting Recognition of Foreign Proceeding and Certain Related Relief Related [+]. (Rodriguez-Castillo, Maria)
Related: [-] 3
Saturday, March 25, 2023
29 29 4 pgs misc Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 Sat 03/25 7:57 PM
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 Filed by Philip Abelson on behalf of Antonio Reinaldo Rabelo Filho.(Abelson, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 6 pgs Exhibit A - Proposed Order
Att: 2 7 pgs Exhibit B - Blacklined Proposed Order
28 28 4 pgs ans Statement Sat 03/25 7:42 PM
Statement Notifying The Court Of Developments In The Brazilian Proceeding Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. Section 1518 filed by Philip Abelson on behalf of Antonio Reinaldo Rabelo Filho. (Abelson, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 84 pgs Exhibit A - RJ Acceptance Order
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
27 27 misc Certificate of Service Wed 03/22 6:26 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Philip Abelson on behalf of Antonio Reinaldo Rabelo Filho. (Abelson, Philip)
Related: [-] 26
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
26 26 5 pgs ans Statement Wed 03/15 4:54 PM
Statement Notifying the Court of Developments in the Brazilian Proceeding Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 1518 filed by Philip Abelson on behalf of Antonio Reinaldo Rabelo Filho. (Abelson, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 76 pgs Exhibit A - RJ Petition
Tuesday, February 28, 2023
25 25 4 pgs notice Notice, Appearance Tue 02/28 2:17 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Francisco Vazquez on behalf of The Bank of New York Mellon. (Vazquez, Francisco)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 24, 2023
24 24 3 pgs ans Statement Fri 02/24 1:11 PM
Statement / Notice of Filing of Certified Translations of the Brazilian Preliminary Application and the Brazilian Preliminary Order Related [+] filed by Philip Abelson on behalf of Antonio Reinaldo Rabelo Filho. (Abelson, Philip)
Related: [-] 4
Att: 1 40 pgs Exhibit A - Brazilian Preliminary Application
Att: 2 12 pgs Exhibit B - Brazilian Preliminary Order
Wednesday, February 15, 2023
23 23 misc Certificate of Service Wed 02/15 1:29 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Philip Abelson on behalf of Antonio Reinaldo Rabelo Filho. (Abelson, Philip)
Related: [-] 2 ,3 ,4 ,1 ,20 ,5 ,7 ,21 ,6 ,13
22 22 misc Certificate of Service Wed 02/15 12:43 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Philip Abelson on behalf of Antonio Reinaldo Rabelo Filho. (Abelson, Philip)
Related: [-] 2 ,3 ,4 ,1 ,5 ,6
Monday, February 13, 2023
21 21 9 pgs order Motion, Approve Mon 02/13 2:27 PM
Order signed on 2/13/2023 Pursuant to Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure 2002(m) and (q) and 9007 for Order Scheduling Hearing and Approving Form and Manner of Service of Notice Related [+] . with hearing to be held on 3/29/2023 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (JPM) (Rodriguez-Castillo, Maria)
Related: [-] 13
20 20 6 pgs order Order Re: Motion for Provisional Relief under Section 1519 Mon 02/13 2:21 PM
Order signed on 2/13/2023 Granting Motion for Provisional Relief under Section 1519 Related [+]. (Rodriguez-Castillo, Maria)
Related: [-] 5
19 19 3 pgs notice Notice, Appearance Mon 02/13 9:33 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Papers filed by Timothy E. Graulich on behalf of Ad Hoc Group. (Graulich, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 10, 2023
18 18 2 pgs notice Notice, Appearance Fri 02/10 3:39 PM
Notice of Appearance Request for Notice filed by Shawn M. Christianson on behalf of Oracle America, Inc.. (Christianson, Shawn)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Application, Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/10 12:07 PM
Order signed on 2/10/2023 Re: Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice For Ricardo Pasianotto Related [+]. (Rodriguez-Castillo, Maria)
Related: [-] 11
16 16 order Application, Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/10 12:00 PM
Order signed on 2/10/2023 Re: Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice For Amanda Parra Criste. Related [+]. (Rodriguez-Castillo, Maria)
Related: [-] 10
15 15 order Application, Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/10 11:56 AM
Order signed on 2/10/2023 Re: Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice For Richard Kebrdle Related [+]. (Rodriguez-Castillo, Maria)
Related: [-] 9
14 14 order Application, Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/10 11:51 AM
Order signed on 2/10/2023 Re: Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice for Jason Zakia Related [+] . (Rodriguez-Castillo, Maria)
Related: [-] 8
Thursday, February 09, 2023
13 13 8 pgs motion Motion, Approve Thu 02/09 7:02 PM
Motion to Approve / Motion Pursuant to Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure 2002(m) and (q) and 9007 for Order Scheduling Hearing and Approving Form and Manner of Service of Notice filed by Philip Abelson on behalf of Antonio Reinaldo Rabelo Filho. (Abelson, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to Exhibit A - Recognition Hearing Notice
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Notice Party List
12 12 3 pgs order Motion, Joint Administration Thu 02/09 4:46 PM
Order signed on 2/9/2023 Granting Motion Directing Joint Administration of Related Chapter 15 Cases 23-10194 and 23-10195 under Lead Case Number 23-10193 JPM)of Oi S.A.and Antonio Reinaldo Rabelo Filho Related [+] . (Rodriguez-Castillo, Maria)
Related: [-] 2
11 11 motion Application, Pro Hac Vice Admission Thu 02/09 4:17 PM
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Ricardo Pasianotto on behalf of Antonio Reinaldo Rabelo Filho. (Pasianotto, Ricardo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
10 10 motion Application, Pro Hac Vice Admission Thu 02/09 4:11 PM
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Amanda Ann Parra Criste on behalf of Antonio Reinaldo Rabelo Filho. (Parra Criste, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
9 9 motion Application, Pro Hac Vice Admission Thu 02/09 4:06 PM
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Richard Kebrdle on behalf of Antonio Reinaldo Rabelo Filho. (Kebrdle, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
8 8 motion Application, Pro Hac Vice Admission Thu 02/09 4:02 PM
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Jason Zakia on behalf of Antonio Reinaldo Rabelo Filho. (Zakia, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
7 7 3 pgs order Motion, Shorten Time Thu 02/09 1:59 PM
Order signed on 2/9/2023 Granting Motion to Shorten Notice And Setting Procedures For Hearing To Consider Motion For Provisional Relief Related [+] . with hearing to be held on 2/13/2023 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (JPM) (Rodriguez-Castillo, Maria)
Related: [-] 6
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Thu 02/09 4:03 PM
Receipt of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission([LINK 23-10193 jpm] ) [motion,122] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16086264. Fee amount 200.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #8
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Thu 02/09 4:08 PM
Receipt of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission([LINK 23-10193 jpm] ) [motion,122] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16086281. Fee amount 200.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #9
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Thu 02/09 4:13 PM
Receipt of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission([LINK 23-10193 jpm] ) [motion,122] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16086298. Fee amount 200.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #10
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Thu 02/09 4:20 PM
Receipt of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission([LINK 23-10193 jpm] ) [motion,122] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16086323. Fee amount 200.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #11
Wednesday, February 08, 2023
6 6 7 pgs motion Motion, Shorten Time Wed 02/08 9:01 PM
Motion to Shorten Time / Motion to Shorten Notice and Setting Procedures for a Hearing to Consider Motion for Provisional Relief filed by Philip Abelson on behalf of Antonio Reinaldo Rabelo Filho. (Abelson, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Notice Party List
5 5 27 pgs motion Motion, Provisional Relief under Section 1519 Wed 02/08 7:46 PM
Motion for Provisional Relief under 11 U.S.C. Section 1519 ,1521(a)(7), 105(a) and 362 filed by Philip Abelson on behalf of Antonio Reinaldo Rabelo Filho. (Abelson, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 7 pgs Exhibit A - Proposed Order
4 4 21 pgs answer Declaration Wed 02/08 7:19 PM
Declaration of Sergio Savi Pursuant 28 U.S.C. § 1794 in Support of the Petitioner's Declaration and Verified Petitioner for Recognition of the Brazilian Proceeding and Motion for Order Granting Related Relief Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(A), 1509, 1515, 1517, 1520, and 1521 Related [+] filed by Philip Abelson on behalf of Antonio Reinaldo Rabelo Filho. (Abelson, Philip)
Related: [-] 3
Att: 1 64 pgs Exhibit A - 2016 Acceptance Order
Att: 2 98 pgs Exhibit B - Brazilian Preliminary Application
Att: 3 21 pgs Exhibit C - Brazilian Preliminary Order
3 3 56 pgs motion Motion, Approve Wed 02/08 6:43 PM
Motion to Approve / Petitioner's Declaration and Verified Petition for Recognition of the Brazilian Proceeding and Motion for Order Granting Related Relief Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(A), 1509, 1515, 1517, 1520, and 1521 filed by Philip Abelson on behalf of Antonio Reinaldo Rabelo Filho. (Abelson, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 6 pgs Exhibit A - Proposed Order
Att: 2 904 pgs Exhibit B - 2018 Election Solicitation Statement
Att: 3 8 pgs Exhibit C - Notice Party List
2 2 8 pgs motion Motion, Joint Administration Wed 02/08 4:57 PM
Motion for Joint Administration of the Chapter 15 Cases of Oi S.A. and Its Debtor Affiliates Pursuant to Section 105(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 1015(b) filed by Philip Abelson on behalf of Antonio Reinaldo Rabelo Filho. (Abelson, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Exhibit A - Proposed Order
1 1 3 pgs misc Petition for Recognition of Foreign Proceeding (Chapter 15) Wed 02/08 2:35 PM
Chapter 15 Petition for Recognition of Foreign Proceeding . Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Philip Abelson of White & Case on behalf of Oi S.A., Antonio Reinaldo Rabelo Filho. (Abelson, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 36 pgs Exhibit A - Registration Certificate
Att: 2 5 pgs Exhibit B - Appointment Resolutions
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Wed 02/08 2:36 PM
Receipt of Petition for Recognition of Foreign Proceeding (Chapter 15)([LINK 23-10193 ) [misc,petfp15] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16084468. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1
misc Add Judge Wed 02/08 3:33 PM
Judge John P. Mastando III added to the case. (Porter, Minnie)
Related: [-]