California Northern District Court
Judge:Jon S Tigar
Case #: 4:23-cv-00582
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Feb 08, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Aug 12, 2023 5:01 AM PDT
Defendant
Leighton St. Edison Scott
Defendant
Donald G. Metcalfe
Defendant
Sergio Mora
Defendant
Jason C. Musselman
Defendant
Hector Javier Orozco
Defendant
Joshua Kurt Peffley
Defendant
Isidro Pantoja Perez
Defendant
Cory D. Perryman
Defendant
Justin D. Pierce
Defendant
Jeffrey John Reed
Defendant
Robert O. Salas
Defendant
Jesus Pedro Bojorquez
Defendant
Alex B. Serrato
Defendant
Jesse Daniel Sesma
Defendant
Steven T. Slimp
Defendant
D. Thompson
Defendant
Humberto Vera
Defendant
Carlos A. Vergara
Defendant
Russell Villalba
Defendant
Arturo Villalobos
Defendant
M Hernandez
Defendant
V Garcia
Defendant
Blake R Barron
Defendant
Cesar S Bravo
Defendant
Zachary Scott Brown
Defendant
California Department of Corrections and REhabilitation CTF- Soledad
Defendant
Richard Cavagnolo
Defendant
Brandon Nelson Cope
Defendant
Jeffrey Dane DeAnzo
Defendant
Enrique Galvan
Defendant
Keith E. Mensing
Defendant
J. Hunter
Defendant
Craig Alan Koenig
Defendant
Javiar G. Lopez
Defendant
Rodolpho S. Luna
Defendant
Derrick Thomas Marion
Defendant
Yonatan U Cerna Martinez
Defendant
Patrick A. McDonald
Defendant
Nathan S. McDowell
Defendant
Christian Eugene Mell
Plaintiff
Adam Sanford
Represented By
Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Pavone & Fonner, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Saul Pelayo
Represented By
Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Pavone & Fonner, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Vickter Estrada
Represented By
Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Pavone & Fonner, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
William Pardue
Represented By
Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Pavone & Fonner, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Clark
Represented By
Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Pavone & Fonner, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
William Milton
Represented By
Benjamin Laurence Pavone
Pavone & Fonner, LLP
contact info

GPO Apr 23 2024
Order by Judge Jon S. Tigar granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion to Dismiss. Amended Pleadings due by 5/21/2024.(mll, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2024)
GPO Feb 18 2025
ORDER GRANTING 45 MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge Jon S. Tigar. (dms, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2025)

Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
50 50 respoth Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 05/09 2:28 PM
Answer to Amended Complaint40 Amended Complaint by Jesus Pedro Bojorquez, Cesar S Bravo, Zachary Scott Brown, Richard Cavagnolo, Brandon Nelson Cope, Jeffrey Dane DeAnzo, Enrique Galvan, V Garcia, M Hernandez, J. Hunter, Javiar G. Lopez, Rodolpho S. Luna, Derrick Thomas Marion, Yonatan U Cerna Martinez, Patrick A. McDonald, Nathan S. McDowell, Christian Eugene Mell, Keith E. Mensing, Donald G. Metcalfe, Sergio Mora, Jason C. Musselman, Hector Javier Orozco, Joshua Kurt Peffley, Isidro Pantoja Perez, Cory D. Perryman, Justin D. Pierce, Jeffrey John Reed, Robert O. Salas, Leighton St. Edison Scott, Alex B. Serrato, Jesse Daniel Sesma, Steven T. Slimp, D. Thompson, Humberto Vera, Carlos A. Vergara, Russell Villalba, Arturo Villalobos, California Department of Corrections and REhabilitation CTF- Soledad, Craig Alan Koenig, Blake R Barron. (Faulconer, John)
Related: [-]