Original Case: 4:08-cv-02295

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:23-cv-15162
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Feb 07, 2023
Terminated:Feb 13, 2025
Last checked: Friday Feb 14, 2025 4:23 AM PST
Defendant - Appellee
BOARD OF REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA
Represented By
Erik S. Faussner
Hassard Bonnington, LLP
contact info
Warren Richmond Webster Jr.
Hassard Bonnington, LLP
contact info
Jessica Julia Hansen-Arenas
Hassard Bonnington, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ANDREW BRAUN
Represented By
Jessica Julia Hansen-Arenas
Hassard Bonnington, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ROBERT DYNES
Represented By
Jessica Julia Hansen-Arenas
Hassard Bonnington, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ROBERT OKIN
Represented By
Jessica Julia Hansen-Arenas
Hassard Bonnington, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
MARK LEARY
Represented By
Jessica Julia Hansen-Arenas
Hassard Bonnington, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ALICIA F. LIEBERMAN
Represented By
Jessica Julia Hansen-Arenas
Hassard Bonnington, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
RICK PATEL
Represented By
Jessica Julia Hansen-Arenas
Hassard Bonnington, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
HURBERT OCHITILL
Represented By
Jessica Julia Hansen-Arenas
Hassard Bonnington, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
FREDERICK HUANG
Represented By
Jessica Julia Hansen-Arenas
Hassard Bonnington, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
TAMAR SEIVER
Represented By
Jessica Julia Hansen-Arenas
Hassard Bonnington, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
REGINA GRAHAM
Represented By
Jessica Julia Hansen-Arenas
Hassard Bonnington, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JESSICA FOGLER
Represented By
Jessica Julia Hansen-Arenas
Hassard Bonnington, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
TRUDY SINGZON
Represented By
Jessica Julia Hansen-Arenas
Hassard Bonnington, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ESTER CHOO
Represented By
Jessica Julia Hansen-Arenas
Hassard Bonnington, LLP
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ANNE BRAUN
Defendant - Appellee
TROY WILLIAMS
Represented By
James Frederick Hannawalt
San Francisco City Attorney's Office
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JEFF ADACHI
Represented By
James Frederick Hannawalt
San Francisco City Attorney's Office
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ROBERT BUNKER
Represented By
James Frederick Hannawalt
San Francisco City Attorney's Office
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JOHN CRUDO
Represented By
James Frederick Hannawalt
San Francisco City Attorney's Office
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
GAVIN NEWSOM
Represented By
James Frederick Hannawalt
San Francisco City Attorney's Office
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
PAUL DAVIES
Represented By
James Frederick Hannawalt
San Francisco City Attorney's Office
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
MITCHELL KATZ
Represented By
James Frederick Hannawalt
San Francisco City Attorney's Office
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
HEATHER FONG
Represented By
James Frederick Hannawalt
San Francisco City Attorney's Office
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
LEON LOEW
Represented By
James Frederick Hannawalt
San Francisco City Attorney's Office
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
GREGORY HICKS
Represented By
James Frederick Hannawalt
San Francisco City Attorney's Office
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
HUGH HALL
Represented By
James Frederick Hannawalt
San Francisco City Attorney's Office
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
MATHEW MASON
Represented By
James Frederick Hannawalt
San Francisco City Attorney's Office
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO
Represented By
James Frederick Hannawalt
San Francisco City Attorney's Office
contact info
Plaintiff
CHERYL JOY COTTERILL
Plaintiff - Appellant
GREGORY MELVIN HAYNES
Represented By
Gregory Melvin Haynes
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/14/2025 4:21 AM PST
Tuesday, February 07, 2023
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 03/06/2023. Transcript due 04/05/2023. Appellant Gregory Melvin Haynes opening brief due 05/15/2023. Appellees Jeff Adachi, Robert Bunker, City and County of San Francisco, John Crudo, Paul Davies, Heather Fong, Hugh Hall, Gregory Hicks, Mitchell Katz, Leon Loew, Mathew Mason, Gavin Newsom and Troy Williams answering brief due 06/15/2023. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [12647949] (RT) [Entered: 02/07/2023 11:24 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Docketing Letter and Briefing Schedule
Att: 2 2 pgs Notice to All Parties and Counsel
Att: 3 56 pgs Case Opening Packet
2 2 Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: CKP): Order to show cause docket fee due [12648198] (CKP) [Entered: 02/07/2023 02:05 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Fee Due OSC
Att: 2 1 pgs Main Document
Att: 3 7 pgs Additional Document