California Eastern District Court
Judge:Kimberly J Mueller
Case #: 2:23-cv-00245
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Feb 08, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Aug 12, 2023 5:46 AM PDT
Defendant
Paula Aleyda Aragon De Gonzalez
Represented By
John Robert Whitefleet
Porter Scott
contact info
Defendant
Mary M. Cendana
Represented By
John Robert Whitefleet
Porter Scott
contact info
Defendant
County of San Joaquin
Represented By
John Robert Whitefleet
Porter Scott
contact info
Defendant
Patrick Withrow
Represented By
John Robert Whitefleet
Porter Scott
contact info
Plaintiff
Roy McCollum
Represented By
Sanjay Stephen Schmidt
Law Office Of Sanjay S. Schmidt
contact info
Thomas Kennedy Helm, IV
Helm Law Office, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
M. P.
Represented By
Sanjay Stephen Schmidt
Law Office Of Sanjay S. Schmidt
contact info
Thomas Kennedy Helm, IV
Helm Law Office, PC
contact info

GPO May 10 2023
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 05/09/23 ORDERING plaintiffs' counsel submit a supplemental declaration in compliance with Local Rule 202(c) within 7 days of this order. (Licea Chavez, V)
GPO May 10 2023
ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/10/23 ORDERING defendants to SHOW CAUSE in writing within 10 days of this order why they have not filed their consent/decline forms. Submission of the forms will automatically discharge this order. Failure to file the forms or show good cause may result in sanctions. (Kastilahn, A)
GPO May 15 2023
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/12/2023 GRANTING 9 Motion to Appoint Roy McCollum as guardian ad litem for his minor grandchild, plaintiff M.P. (Perdue, C.)
GPO May 19 2023
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 05/18/23 EXTENDING date to 06/19/23 for defendants County of San Joaquim, Withrow, De Gonzales and Cendana to file their response to the Complaint. (Benson, A.)
GPO Jun 22 2023
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/22/2023 APPROVING IN PART 23 Stipulation. Defendants shall file their response to 1 Complaint by 7/31/2023. If County Defendants elect to file any response other than an answer, Plaintiff shall have 30 days from the filed date to file their opposition. (Donati, J)
GPO Jun 23 2023
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/22/2023. (Perdue, C.)
GPO Aug 01 2023
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/31/23 GRANTING 27 Stipulation. Defendants need not file a response to Plaintiffs' Complaint on 7/31/23. Plaintiffs may have until 9/15/23 to file a First Amended Complaint and County Defendants shall file their response 30 days later. The Initial Scheduling Conference is RE-SET to 11/16/2023 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Kastilahn, A)

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
40 40 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Wed 05/14 3:57 PM
MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) issued by Courtroom Deputy for Magistrate Judge Sean C. Riordan on 5/14/2025: The Settlement Conference on 6/10/2025 is RESET for 12/9/2025 at 10:00 AM via Zoom before Magistrate Judge Sean C. Riordan. Each party is required to have an individual with full settlement authority present. At least seven (7) days prior to the conference, 12/2/2025, the parties are DIRECTED to submit confidential settlement conference statements to chambers via email at scrorders@caed.uscourts.gov by 5:00 p.m. PT. Such statements shall not be filed with the Clerk, however, each party shall e-file a one-page document entitled "Notice of Submission of Confidential Settlement Conference Statement". See Local Rule 270(d). Furthermore, the Pre-settlement Conference on 6/5/2025 is RESET for 12/4/2025 at 2:30 PM, to be conducted through Zoom. The lead attorney from each side is required to attend the Pre-settlement Conference. The parties will receive instructions closer to the hearing date on how to appear. (Deputy Clerk SH)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
39 39 2 pgs order Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Fri 03/28 12:05 PM
ORDER signed by Senior District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 03/26/25 RESETTING the deadlines as follows: Fact Discovery: 11/14/25; Settlement Conference 12/09/25; Expert Disclosures: 01/16/26; Rebuttal Experts: 02/20/26; Expert Discovery: 04/17/26; Dispositive Motions: 06/15/26. (Deputy Clerk VLC)
Related: [-]
38 38 4 pgs order Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Fri 03/28 8:47 AM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Sean C. Riordan on 03/27/25 SETTING a Settlement Conference to 6/10/2025 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (SCR) before Magistrate Judge Sean C. Riordan, via ZOOM and DIRECTING parties to submit a confidential settlement conference no later than 06/03/25 to Magistrate Judge Riordan. (Deputy Clerk VLC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
37 37 order Minute Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Tue 03/25 11:17 AM
MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) issued by Courtroom Deputy for Magistrate Judge Sean C. Riordan on 3/25/2025: The parties are hereby notified that a Settlement Conference is SET for 6/10/2025 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Sean C. Riordan. The Settlement Conference will take place by Zoom. Each party is required to have an individual with full settlement authority present. At least seven (7) days prior to the conference, 6/3/2025, the parties are DIRECTED to submit confidential settlement conference statements to chambers via email at scrorders@caed.uscourts.gov by 5:00 p.m. PT. Such statements shall not be filed with the Clerk, however, each party shall e-file a one-page document entitled "Notice of Submission of Confidential Settlement Conference Statement". See Local Rule 270(d). Furthermore, a Pre-settlement Conference is SET for 6/5/2025 at 2:30 PM, conducted through Zoom. The lead attorney from each side is required to attend the Pre-settlement Conference. The parties will receive instructions closer to the hearing date on how to appear. (Deputy Clerk SH)
Related: [-]
36 36 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 03/25 9:24 AM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER Extending Scheduling Order Deadlines re35 Scheduling Order,, by Roy McCollum, M. P.. (Helm, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
35 35 order Scheduling Order Wed 10/23 1:38 PM
STIPULATION AND SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Senior District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/23/2024 EXTENDING Scheduling Order Dates: Fact Discovery by 5/15/2025; Settlement Conference on 6/10/2025; Expert Disclosures by 7/17/2025; Exchange of Rebuttal Expert Witnesses by 8/21/2025; All Expert Discovery by 10/20/2025; Dispositive Motions filed by 12/15/2025; and assigning Magistrate Judge Sean C. Riordan for the settlement conference. (Becknal, R.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
34 34 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 10/15 2:09 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines re 33 Scheduling Conference,,,,,,,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings,,,,,,,,, by Paula Aleyda Aragon De Gonzalez, Mary M. Cendana, County of San Joaquin, Patrick Withrow. (Whitefleet, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
33 33 minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Thu 11/16 3:19 PM
MINUTES for Scheduling Conference held (via videoconference) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/16/2023, and FRCP 16 ORDER: Plaintiffs' Counsel, Kennedy Helm, present. Defendants; Counsel, John Whitefleet and Nikki Dow, present. The court and counsel discussed case scheduling. After careful consideration of the parties' comments, and confirming that initial disclosures as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a) have been completed the court ORDERS the following pre-trial case schedule: Initial disclosures as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a) shall be completed by 11/30/2023; fact discovery shall be completed by 11/15/2024; expert disclosures shall be completed by 1/17/2025; rebuttal expert witnesses shall be exchanged by 2/21/2025; all expert discovery shall be completed by 4/18/2025; and all dispositive motions, except for motions for continuances, temporary restraining orders or other emergency applications, shall be filed by 6/13/2025, and noticed for a hearing on the earliest available law and motion date in accordance with Local Rule 230(a). Motions regarding discovery shall be noticed before the Magistrate Judge, as provided by Local Rule 302(c). Except as otherwise provided in this order, no further joinder of parties or amendments to pleadings is permitted without leave of court, good cause having been shown. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b); Johnson v. Mammoth Recreations, Inc., 975 F.2d 604, 60910 (9th Cir. 1992). After consideration of the parties' comments related to settlement, the court will refer the matter to a settlement conference before a randomly assigned magistrate judge with the settlement conference to be completed by 12/10/2024. Magistrate Judge Deborah L. Barnes is randomly assigned. The parties shall contact Courtroom Deputy Shelly Her at (916) 930-4128 to schedule a Settlement Conference before Judge Barnes. This case schedule will become final without further order of the court unless objections are filed within fourteen (14) calendar days of this order. The schedule, once final, shall not be modified except by leave of court upon showing of good cause. All provisions of the court's civil standing order, located on the court's webpage for Judge Mueller are incorporated by reference into this Rule 16 order. SO ORDERED. Court Reporter: ECRO: Otilia Rosales. (Text Only Entry) (Francel, M.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
32 32 misc Status Report Thu 11/02 2:53 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by Roy McCollum, M. P.. (Helm, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
31 31 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 10/12 1:18 PM
ANSWER with Jury Demand by Paula Aleyda Aragon De Gonzalez, Cynthia Borges-Odell, Teffany Calica, Mary M. Cendana, County of San Joaquin, Marie Daguman, James Farr, Kayla Long, Rita Mananquil, Pablo Marmalejo, Margarita Palomera, Mario Pena, Moris Senegor, Eric Sessions, Kevin Torres, Patrick Withrow. Attorney Whitefleet, John Robert added.(Whitefleet, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 18, 2023
30 30 service Summons Mon 09/18 10:24 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Cynthia Borges-Odell, Teffany Calica, Marie Daguman, James Farr, Kayla Long, Rita Mananquil, Pablo Marmalejo, Margarita Palomera, Mario Pena, Moris Senegor, Eric Sessions, Kevin Torres* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Sanjay Stephen Schmidt* *Law Office of Sanjay S. Schmidt* *1388 Sutter St., Suite 810* *San Francisco, CA 94109*. (Benson, A.)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
29 29 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 09/15 11:55 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by M. P., Roy McCollum.(Schmidt, Sanjay)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
28 28 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Tue 08/01 11:32 AM
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/31/23 GRANTING27 Stipulation. Defendants need not file a response to Plaintiffs' Complaint on 7/31/23. Plaintiffs may have until 9/15/23 to file a First Amended Complaint and County Defendants shall file their response 30 days later. The Initial Scheduling Conference is RE-SET to 11/16/2023 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Kastilahn, A)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 27, 2023
27 27 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 07/27 2:22 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Filing of First Amended Complaint and Relieving Defendants from Responding to Complaint (ECF No. 25) by Paula Aleyda Aragon De Gonzalez, Mary M. Cendana, County of San Joaquin, Patrick Withrow. (Whitefleet, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 23, 2023
26 26 order Stipulation and Order Protective Order Fri 06/23 9:07 AM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/22/2023. (Perdue, C.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 22, 2023
25 25 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Thu 06/22 3:06 PM
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/22/2023 APPROVING IN PART23 Stipulation. Defendants shall file their response to1 Complaint by 7/31/2023. If County Defendants elect to file any response other than an answer, Plaintiff shall have 30 days from the filed date to file their opposition. (Donati, J)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 16, 2023
24 24 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 06/16 9:48 AM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Protective Order by Paula Aleyda Aragon De Gonzalez, Mary M. Cendana, County of San Joaquin, Patrick Withrow. (Whitefleet, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 13, 2023
23 23 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Tue 06/13 7:19 PM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extending Time To Respond To Complaint re16 Stipulation and Order by Roy McCollum, M. P.. (Helm, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 25, 2023
22 22 misc Civil New Case Documents for KJM Thu 05/25 3:21 PM
AMENDED CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference SET for 10/5/2023 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Order,
Att: 2 Consent Form,
Att: 3 VDRP
21 21 misc Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case Thu 05/25 3:15 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY). This case has been assigned to Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller and Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. The new case number is: 2:23-cv-00245-KJM-AC. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 24, 2023
20 20 misc Consent/Decline of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Wed 05/24 2:36 PM
CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Whitefleet, John)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Consent/Decline of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Wed 05/24 2:34 PM
CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Whitefleet, John)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Consent/Decline of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Wed 05/24 2:32 PM
CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Whitefleet, John)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Consent/Decline of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Wed 05/24 2:24 PM
CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Whitefleet, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 19, 2023
16 16 order Stipulation and Order Fri 05/19 11:13 AM
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 05/18/23 EXTENDING date to 06/19/23 for defendants County of San Joaquim, Withrow, De Gonzales and Cendana to file their response to the Complaint. (Benson, A.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 18, 2023
15 15 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Thu 05/18 10:10 AM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extending Time To Respond To Complaint by Roy McCollum, M. P.. (Helm, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2023
14 14 3 pgs order Order Order on Motion to Appoint Guardian/Attorney ad Litem Mon 05/15 9:29 AM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/12/2023 GRANTING9 Motion to Appoint Roy McCollum as guardian ad litem for his minor grandchild, plaintiff M.P. (Perdue, C.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 11, 2023
13 13 misc Declaration Thu 05/11 5:19 PM
DECLARATION of T. Kennedy Helm, IV re9 Motion to Appoint Guardian ad Litem,11 Order, Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings. (Helm, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 10, 2023
12 12 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 05/10 11:46 AM
ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/10/23 ORDERING defendants to SHOW CAUSE in writing within 10 days of this order why they have not filed their consent/decline forms. Submission of the forms will automatically discharge this order. Failure to file the forms or show good cause may result in sanctions. (Kastilahn, A)
Related: [-]
11 11 2 pgs order Order ~Util - 1 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings Wed 05/10 10:19 AM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 05/09/23 ORDERING plaintiffs' counsel submit a supplemental declaration in compliance with Local Rule 202(c) within 7 days of this order. (Licea Chavez, V)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 08, 2023
10 10 misc Declaration Mon 05/08 5:21 PM
DECLARATION of Roy McCollum re1 Complaint. (Helm, Thomas)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Appoint Guardian ad Litem Mon 05/08 5:12 PM
MOTION to APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM For Minor Plaintiff M.P. by Roy McCollum, M. P..(Helm, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CONSENT OF NOMINEE ROY MCCOLLUM FOR APPOINTMENT AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MINOR PLAINTIFF M.P., SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BRITTANY CAITLIN MCCULLUM. (Fed. R. Civ. P. 17(c)),
Att: 2 [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION OF ROY MCCOLLUM FOR APPOINTMENT AS GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR MINOR PLAINTIFF M.P., SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO BRITTANY CAITLIN MCCULLUM
Friday, May 05, 2023
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 05/05 9:17 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Patrick Withrow served on 5/1/2023, answer due 5/22/2023. (Helm, Thomas)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 05/05 9:16 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Paula Aleyda Aragon De Gonzalez served on 5/1/2023, answer due 5/22/2023. (Helm, Thomas)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 05/05 9:15 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: County of San Joaquin served on 5/1/2023, answer due 5/22/2023. (Helm, Thomas)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 05/05 9:14 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Mary M. Cendana served on 5/1/2023, answer due 5/22/2023. (Helm, Thomas)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Consent/Decline of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Fri 05/05 8:59 AM
CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Helm, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 09, 2023
3 3 misc Civil New Case Documents for Magistrate as Presider Thu 02/09 10:22 AM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Benson, A.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form,
Att: 2 VDRP
2 2 service Summons Thu 02/09 10:21 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Paula Aleyda Aragon De Gonzalez, Mary M. Cendana, County of San Joaquin, Patrick Withrow* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Sanjay Stephen Schmidt* *Law Office of Sanjay S. Schmidt* *1388 Sutter St., Suite 810* *San Francisco, CA 94109*. (Benson, A.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 08, 2023
1 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by M.P., Roy McCollum. Attorney Schmidt, Sanjay Stephen added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-10688900)(Schmidt, Sanjay)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet