Member Case
Lead case is: 1:23-bk-10197

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David S Jones
Case #: 1:23-bk-10198
Case Filed:Feb 09, 2023
Dismissed:May 17, 2024

Debtor
Rockwood Music Corporation
196 Allen St
New York, NY 10002-1418
Represented By
J. Ted Donovan
Goldberg Weprin Finkel Goldstein LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee - NY Alexander Hamilton Custom House One Bowling Green, Room 534
New York, NY 10004


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Sunday, May 19, 2024
23 23 misc Certificate of Mailing - Order to Dismiss Mon 05/20 12:08 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Order to Dismiss Related [+] . Notice Date 05/19/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #22 )
Friday, May 17, 2024
22 22 order Order, Dismiss Fri 05/17 10:52 AM
Order Signed on 5/17/2024 Dismissing Subchapter V Chapter 11 Cases. (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 29, 2023
21 21 order Motion, Relief from Stay (fee) Wed 03/29 11:52 AM
Order Signed on 3/29/2023 Vacating the Automatic Stay with Respect to Non-Residential Real Property. Related [+] (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-] 9
Monday, March 27, 2023
misc Case Association - Joint Administration Mon 03/27 3:22 PM
Case Joint Administration. All further Pleadings and Docket Entries shall be made in The Lead Case No. 23-10197 (Cantrell, Deirdra)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 23, 2023
20 20 order Motion, Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim Thu 03/23 5:11 PM
Order Signed on 3/23/2023 Establishing Deadline for Filing Proofs of Claim and Approving the Form and Manner of Notice Thereof. Proofs of Claim are Due by 5/5/2023. Related [+] (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-] 15
19 19 order Motion, Joint Administration Thu 03/23 4:54 PM
Order Signed on 3/23/2023 Directing the Joint Administration of Affiliated Cases. All Further Pleadings and Other Papers Shall Be Filed In, and All Further Docket Entries Shall Be Made In, Lead Case No. 23-10197 Related [+] (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-] 16
Friday, March 17, 2023
18 18 misc Affidavit of Service Fri 03/17 12:48 PM
Affidavit of Service /Declaration Related [+] Filed by J. Ted Donovan on behalf of Rockwood Music Corporation. (Donovan, J.)
Related: [-] 12
17 17 notice Notice, Adjournment of Hearing Fri 03/17 9:43 AM
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /Initial Case Conference scheduled for March 21, 2023 filed by J. Ted Donovan on behalf of Rockwood Music Corporation. with hearing to be held on 3/28/2023 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 701 (DSJ) (Donovan, J.)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Motion, Joint Administration Fri 03/17 9:42 AM
Motion for Joint Administration filed by J. Ted Donovan on behalf of Rockwood Music Corporation. (Donovan, J.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
15 15 motion Motion, Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim Fri 03/17 9:41 AM
Motion to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim filed by J. Ted Donovan on behalf of Rockwood Music Corporation. (Donovan, J.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Proposed Notice
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
13 13 misc Statement of Financial Affairs Wed 03/15 10:21 AM
Statement of Financial Affairs - Non-Individual Filed by J. Ted Donovan on behalf of Rockwood Music Corporation. (Donovan, J.)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Amended Schedules Wed 03/15 10:21 AM
Amended Schedules filed:, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual , Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Official Form 202) Filed by J. Ted Donovan on behalf of Rockwood Music Corporation. (Donovan, J.)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Wed 03/15 10:26 AM
Receipt of Amended Schedules([LINK 23-10198 dsj] ) [misc,schaja] ( 32.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16126338. Fee amount 32.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #12
Friday, March 10, 2023
misc Terminate Pending Deadlines Fri 03/10 5:08 PM
Pending Deadlines Terminated. Schedules Filed. (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
11 11 misc Affidavit of Service Tue 03/07 4:49 PM
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Motion and Application of Allen/Orchard LLC for Entry of an Order Vacating the Automatic Stay With Respect of Non-Residential Real Property and Declaration of Support Filed by Douglas J. Pick on behalf of Allen/Orchard LLC. (Pick, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 03, 2023
10 10 misc Schedules Fri 03/03 9:32 AM
Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual Filed by J. Ted Donovan on behalf of Rockwood Music Corporation. (Donovan, J.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 02, 2023
14 14 notice Notice, Change of Address of Debtor/Creditor Thu 03/16 3:09 PM
Notice of Change of Address of Creditor filed by Matthew Currie. (Rouzeau, Anatin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
9 9 motion Motion, Relief from Stay (fee) Wed 03/01 7:38 PM
Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Douglas J. Pick on behalf of Allen/Orchard LLC with hearing to be held on 3/28/2023 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (DSJ) Responses due by 3/21/2023,. (Pick, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration In Support of Stay Relief
Att: 2 Declaration
Att: 3 Exhibit
Att: 4 Exhibit
Att: 5 Exhibit
Att: 6 Exhibit
Att: 7 Exhibit
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Wed 03/01 7:41 PM
Receipt of Motion for Relief from Stay (fee)([LINK 23-10198 dsj] ) [motion,185] ( 188.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16110168. Fee amount 188.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #9
Friday, February 17, 2023
8 8 misc Certificate of Mailing PDF notice Sat 02/18 12:11 AM
Certificate of Mailing Related [+] . Notice Date 02/17/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #5 )
7 7 misc Certificate of Mailing - 341(a) Meeting Sat 02/18 12:11 AM
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors Related [+] . Notice Date 02/17/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #6 )
Wednesday, February 15, 2023
6 6 misc 341(a) Notice (Chapter 11,12) (BNC) Wed 02/15 2:21 PM
Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 3/15/2023 at 02:00 PM at Office of UST (TELECONFERENCE ONLY) - CHAPTER 11s. (Cantrell, Deirdra)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Scheduling Order For Status Conference in Chapter 11 Small Business Subchapter V Wed 02/15 11:18 AM
Order Signed on 2/15/2023 Scheduling Status Conference in Chapter 11 Small Business Subchapter V for 3/21/2023 at 10:00 a.m. via Videoconference (ZoomGov). Pre-Status Report Due By 3/7/2023. Related [+] (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-] 1
4 4 trustee Notice, Appointment of Trustee in a Chapter 11 Subchapter V Case Wed 02/15 9:49 AM
Notice of Appointment of Trustee in a Chapter 11 Subchapter V Case Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee Related [+] Filed by Andrea Beth Schwartz on behalf of United States Trustee.(Schwartz, Andrea)
Related: [-] 1
Att: 1 2 pgs Pleading Verified Statement of Subchapter V Trustee
Tuesday, February 14, 2023
3 3 notice Notice, Appearance Tue 02/14 4:10 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request For All Documents with Certificate of Service filed by Enid Nagler Stuart on behalf of New York State Dep't of Taxation and Finance. (Stuart, Enid)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Affidavit Tue 02/14 2:47 PM
Affidavit /Creditor List Filed by J. Ted Donovan on behalf of Rockwood Music Corporation. (Donovan, J.)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 10, 2023
misc Add Judge Fri 02/10 8:00 AM
Judge David S Jones added to the case. (Cappiello, Karen)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 09, 2023
1 1 5 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Thu 02/09 7:57 PM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Schedule A/B due 02/23/2023. Schedule D due 02/23/2023. Schedule E/F due 02/23/2023. Schedule G due 02/23/2023. Schedule H due 02/23/2023. Summary of Assets and Liabilities due 02/23/2023. Statement of Financial Affairs due 02/23/2023. Incomplete Filings due by 02/23/2023, Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V Due by 05/10/2023. Chapter 11 Small Business Subchapter V Status Conference To Be Held Before 04/10/2023. Filed by J. Ted Donovan of Goldberg Weprin Finkel Goldstein LLP on behalf of Rockwood Music Corporation. (Donovan, J.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Local Rule 1007-2 Affidavit and Corporate Resolution
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Thu 02/09 7:58 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 23-10198 ) [misc,824] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16086603. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1