New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jennifer L Rochon
Case #: 1:23-cv-01126
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e-2e Job Discrimination (Unlawful Employment Practices)
Case Filed:Feb 09, 2023
Terminated:Jun 30, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Aug 12, 2023 12:55 PM EDT
Defendant
Paramount Global
Represented By
Michele Ann Coyne
Kauff Mcguire & Margolis LLP
contact info
Defendant
Showtime Networks Inc
Represented By
Michele Ann Coyne
Kauff Mcguire & Margolis LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Victor Lopez
Represented By
Marshall Benjamin Bellovin
Ballon, Stoll, Bader And Nadler
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
25 25 9 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Tue 11/12 12:19 PM
OPINION AND ORDER re:18 MOTION to Reopen Case . filed by Victor Lopez. For the aforementioned reasons, Plaintiff's Motion for Relief from the Court's June 30, 2023 Order of Dismissal is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion at Dkt. 18. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 11/12/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
24 24 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Wed 07/31 10:53 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:18 MOTION to Reopen Case . . Document filed by Victor Lopez..(Bellovin, Marshall)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
23 23 respm Declaration in Opposition to Motion Wed 07/24 4:16 PM
DECLARATION of Michele A. Coyne in Opposition re:18 MOTION to Reopen Case .. Document filed by Paramount Global, Showtime Networks Inc..(Coyne, Michele)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Mediator Emails April to June 2023,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Parties Emails 10.19 to 11.17.23,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Parties Email 12.4.23,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Parties Email 12.20 to 12.21.23,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Parties Email 1.19 to 2.2.24,
Att: 6 Exhibit F- Parties Emails 5.30 to 6.4.24,
Att: 7 Exhibit G- Parties Emails 6.18 to 6.19.24
22 22 14 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Wed 07/24 4:09 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:18 MOTION to Reopen Case . . Document filed by Paramount Global, Showtime Networks Inc..(Coyne, Michele)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
21 21 misc Proposed Stipulation and Order Wed 07/10 1:45 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Paramount Global, Showtime Networks Inc..(Coyne, Michele)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 30, 2024
20 20 4 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Sun 06/30 2:54 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:18 MOTION to Reopen Case . . Document filed by Victor Lopez..(Bellovin, Marshall)
Related: [-]
19 19 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Sun 06/30 2:53 PM
DECLARATION of Marshall B. Bellovin in Support re:18 MOTION to Reopen Case .. Document filed by Victor Lopez..(Bellovin, Marshall)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
18 18 motion Reopen Case Sun 06/30 2:49 PM
MOTION to Reopen Case . Document filed by Victor Lopez..(Bellovin, Marshall)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 30, 2023
17 17 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Fri 06/30 3:47 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL The Court having been advised at ECF No. 16 that all claims asserted herein have been settled in principle, it is ORDERED that the above-entitled action be and is hereby DISMISSED and discontinued without costs, and without prejudice to the right to reopen the action within thirty days of the date of this Order if the settlement is not consummated. To be clear, any application to reopen must be filed by the aforementioned deadline; any application to reopen filed thereafter may be denied solely on that basis. If the parties wish for the Court to retain jurisdiction for the purposes of enforcing any settlement agreement, they must submit the settlement agreement to the Court by the deadline to reopen to be so ordered by the Court. Per Paragraph 4(C) of the Court's Individual Rules and Practices for Civil Cases, unless the Court orders otherwise, the Court will not retain jurisdiction to enforce a settlement agreement unless it is made part of the public record. Any pending motions are moot. All conferences are cancelled. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 6/30/2023) (jca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 05/30 3:38 PM
ORDER: In light of the mediation scheduled on June 20, 2023, the initial pre-trial conference is adjourned from June 14, 2023 to July 12, 2023 at 11:00AM. ( Initial Conference set for 7/12/2023 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 20B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jennifer L. Rochon). (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon) (Text Only Order) (aba)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 10, 2023
adr Mediation Conference Scheduled Wed 05/10 10:25 AM
FIRST MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 6/20/2023 at 10:00 AM in telephone or video conference.(mnp)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 10, 2023
adr Notice of Mediator Assignment Mon 04/10 9:35 AM
NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 5/10/2023.(ah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 30, 2023
14 14 6 pgs order Order of Automatic Referral to Mediation Thu 03/30 2:29 PM
ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Second Amended Standing Order). Please reference the Pilot Discovery Protocols, attached, and the Mediation Program Procedures (https://nysd.uscourts.gov/programs/mediation-adr). E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone 212-805-0643. Mediator to be Assigned by 4/13/2023. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/01/2015) (rpr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
13 13 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 03/22 5:37 PM
AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Showtime Networks Inc., Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc., Other Affiliate National Amusements, Inc. for Paramount Global. Document filed by Paramount Global, Showtime Networks Inc..(Coyne, Michele)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 03/22 10:55 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Michele Ann Coyne to RE-FILE Document No. 11 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE ENTERED INCORRECTLY;. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes radio button - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time. (lb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 03/21 3:59 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint. Document filed by Paramount Global, Showtime Networks Inc..(Coyne, Michele)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 03/21 3:55 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent PARAMOUNT GLOBAL f/k/a VIACOMCBS INC. f/k/a CBS CORPORATION f/k/a VIACOM, INC. successor-by-merger to CBS CORPORATION f/k/a WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION for Showtime Networks Inc; Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc., Other Affiliate National Amusements, Inc. for Paramount Global. Document filed by Paramount Global, Showtime Networks Inc..(Coyne, Michele)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/21 3:34 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michele Ann Coyne on behalf of Paramount Global, Showtime Networks Inc..(Coyne, Michele)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 03, 2023
9 9 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Fri 03/03 12:16 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Showtime Networks Inc served on 2/28/2023, answer due 3/21/2023. Service was accepted by John Smith Security Guard. Document filed by Victor Lopez..(Bellovin, Marshall)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Affidavit of Service Complaints Fri 03/03 12:14 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Paramount Global served on 2/28/2023, answer due 3/21/2023. Service was accepted by John Smith Security Guard. Document filed by Victor Lopez..(Bellovin, Marshall)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 14, 2023
7 7 service Summons Issued Tue 02/14 3:35 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Paramount Global..(pc)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Tue 02/14 3:35 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Showtime Networks Inc..(pc)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 02/14 12:19 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SHOWTIME NETWORKS INC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Victor Lopez..(Bellovin, Marshall)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 02/14 12:18 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PARAMOUNT GLOBAL f/k/a VIACOMCBS INC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Victor Lopez..(Bellovin, Marshall)
Related: [-]
3 3 3 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Tue 02/14 11:29 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 6/14/2023 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 20B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jennifer L. Rochon. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jennifer L. Rochon on 2/14/2023) (jca)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 10, 2023
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 02/10 9:39 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jennifer L. Rochon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 02/10 9:40 AM
Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 02/10 9:40 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 09, 2023
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 02/09 5:34 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Bellovin, Marshall)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 02/09 5:33 PM
COMPLAINT against Paramount Global, Showtime Networks Inc. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27322298)Document filed by Victor Lopez..(Bellovin, Marshall)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Notice of Right to Sue