New York Southern District Court
Judge:Vincent L Briccetti
Case #: 7:23-cv-01098
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Feb 09, 2023
Terminated:Nov 20, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Aug 12, 2023 5:08 AM EDT
Defendant
Wong Fleming, P.C.
Represented By
Dafney Dubuisson Stokes
Wong Fleming
contact info
Plaintiff
Yaakov Loeffler
Represented By
Robert Thomas Yusko
Stein Saks, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
misc Notice Regarding Deleted Document Tue 02/04 11:17 AM
***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 19 Notice. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (tg)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 03, 2023
16 16 service Certificate of Service Other Mon 04/03 2:45 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss served on Yaakov Loeffler on April 3, 2023. Service was made by first class mail. Document filed by Wong Fleming, P.C...(Dubuisson Stokes, Dafney)
Related: [-]
15 15 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Mon 04/03 2:42 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:8 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) . . Document filed by Wong Fleming, P.C...(Dubuisson Stokes, Dafney)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 27, 2023
14 14 22 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Mon 03/27 4:58 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:8 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) . . Document filed by Yaakov Loeffler..(Yusko, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
13 13 1 pgs order Order Tue 03/14 1:39 PM
ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that, by no later than March 23, 2023, plaintiff must notify the Court by letter whether he (i) intends to file an amended complaint in response to the motion to dismiss, or (ii) will rely on the complaint that is the subject of the motion to dismiss. If plaintiff elects not to file an amended complaint, the motion will proceed in the regular course, and the Court is unlikely to grant plaintiff a further opportunity to amend to address the purported deficiencies made apparent by the fully briefed arguments in defendant's motion. See Loreley Fin. (Jersey) No. 3 Ltd. v. Wells Fargo Sec., LLC, 797 F.3d 160, 190 (2d Cir. 2015) (leaving "unaltered the grounds on which denial of leave to amend has long been held proper, such as undue delay, bad faith, dilatory motive, and futility"); accord F5 Cap. v. Pappas, 856 F.3d 61, 89-90 (2d Cir. 2017). The time to file opposing and reply papers shall be governed by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Civil Rules, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. If plaintiff elects to file an amended complaint, he must do so by no later than 14 days after notifying the Court of his intent to do so. Within 21 days of such amendment, defendant may either: (i) file an answer to the amended complaint; (ii) file a motion to dismiss the amended complaint; or (iii) notify the Court by letter that it is relying on the initially filed motion to dismiss. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 3/13/2023) (ks)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 13, 2023
12 12 service Certificate of Service Other Mon 03/13 2:49 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motion to Dismiss with Supporting Documents served on Robert Thomas Yusko, Esq., Counsel for Plaintiff on March 13, 2023. Document filed by Wong Fleming, P.C...(Dubuisson Stokes, Dafney)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Proposed Order Mon 03/13 2:46 PM
PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Wong Fleming, P.C.. Related Document Number:8 ..(Dubuisson Stokes, Dafney)
Related: [-]
10 10 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Mon 03/13 2:44 PM
DECLARATION of Dafney Dubuisson Stokes in Support re:8 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) .. Document filed by Wong Fleming, P.C...(Dubuisson Stokes, Dafney)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Validation Notice,
Att: 2 Exhibit B Model Form B-1
9 9 14 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Mon 03/13 2:40 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:8 MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) . . Document filed by Wong Fleming, P.C...(Dubuisson Stokes, Dafney)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Dismiss Mon 03/13 2:39 PM
MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) . Document filed by Wong Fleming, P.C...(Dubuisson Stokes, Dafney)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Court Regarding Proposed Order Mon 03/13 3:08 PM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. 11 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 24, 2023
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/24 3:10 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Thomas Yusko on behalf of Yaakov Loeffler..(Yusko, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 16, 2023
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 02/16 2:11 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Dafney Dubuisson Stokes dated 02/16/2023. Document filed by Wong Fleming, P.C...(Dubuisson Stokes, Dafney)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 02/16 2:17 PM
ORDER granting5 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: By 3/13/2023, defendant shall answer, move, or otherwise respond to the complaint. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti)(Text Only Order) (lef)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 10, 2023
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 02/10 9:46 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 02/10 9:47 AM
Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 02/10 9:47 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 09, 2023
4 4 service Certificate of Service Other Thu 02/09 9:55 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal with Exhibit A served on Christofer Merritt, Esq. of Stein Saks, PLLC, Counsel for Plaintiff on February 9, 2023. Service was made by electronic mail and first class mail, certified. Document filed by Wong Fleming, P.C...(Dubuisson Stokes, Dafney)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 02/09 9:27 AM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Wong Fleming, P.C...(Dubuisson Stokes, Dafney)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 02/09 9:26 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Dubuisson Stokes, Dafney)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 02/09 9:24 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of New York, County of Rockland. Case Number: 030072/2023. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27317577).Document filed by Wong Fleming, P.C...(Dubuisson Stokes, Dafney)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A Relevant Pleadings filed in the State Court Action