California Northern District Court
Judge:James Donato
Case #: 4:23-cv-00581
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Feb 08, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Aug 12, 2023 2:48 AM PDT
Defendant
Meyer Corporation, U.S.
Represented By
Michael Kenneth Johnson
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
Eleonora Antonyan
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
Jon Peter Kardassakis
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Howard Clark
Represented By
Ryan Thomas Gott
Pearson Warshaw, LLP
contact info
Erin Johnson Ruben
Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman, PLLC
contact info
Matthew D. Schultz
Levin, Papantonio, Rafferty, Proctor, Buchanan, O'Brien
contact info
Alex R. Straus
Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman, PLLC
contact info
Rachel Lynn Soffin
Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman, PLLC
contact info
Rebecca K. Timmons
Levin Papantonio Rafferty LLP
contact info
Scott Warrick
Levin Papantonio Rafferty
contact info
Michael Harrison Pearson
Pearson Warshaw, LLP
contact info
Melissa S. Weiner
Pearson Warshaw, LLP
contact info
Harper T. Segui
Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman, PLLC
contact info
Daniel L. Warshaw
Pearson Warshaw, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, February 14, 2023
10 10 oth_evt Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only Tue 02/14 1:56 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (wft, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 02/14 10:57 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Meyer Corporation, U.S... (Antonyan, Eleonora)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 13, 2023
8 8 misc Jury Demand Mon 02/13 2:05 PM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Meyer Corporation, U.S.. (Johnson, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 10, 2023
7 7 service Certificate/Proof of Service Fri 02/10 12:56 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Meyer Corporation, U.S. (Johnson, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 09, 2023
6 6 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Thu 02/09 9:04 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/2/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/9/2023 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (cjl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/23/2023. (jrs, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
respoth Answer to Removal Complaint Thu 02/09 9:04 AM
1 Answer to Removal Complaint by Meyer Corporation, U.S. (cjl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 08, 2023
4 4 Amended Civil Cover Sheet by Meyer Corporation, U.S. (Johnson, Michael) Modified on 2/9/2023 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
3 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Meyer Corporation, U.S. identifying Corporate Parent Meyer International Holdings Limited for Meyer Corporation, U.S.. re1 Notice of Removal, (Johnson, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 ***SEE DOCKET ENTRY4 FOR AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET*** Civil Cover Sheet by Meyer Corporation, U.S. (Johnson, Michael) Modified on 2/9/2023 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
1 1 76 pgs CLASS ACTION NOTICE OF REMOVAL (with jury demand by plaintiff) from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-22-603458. (Filing fee $402 receipt number ACANDC-17972546). Filed by Meyer Corporation, U.S.(Johnson, Michael) Modified on 2/9/2023 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Michael K. Johnson,
Att: 2 Declaration Declaration of Serena Williams