Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:Mark L Hornsby
Referred: Mark L Hornsby
Case #: 5:23-cv-00181
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Feb 10, 2023
Terminated:Mar 06, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Aug 12, 2023 7:59 AM CDT
Defendant
Lawrence Deculit, III
Represented By
Cary A Hilburn
Hilburn & Hilburn
contact info
John David Shepherd, Jr
Law Office Of J David Shepherd
contact info
Defendant
Lencho Oilfield Services Inc
Represented By
Cary A Hilburn
Hilburn & Hilburn
contact info
John David Shepherd, Jr
Law Office Of J David Shepherd
contact info
Plaintiff
Andrew Chavez
Represented By
Philip Bohrer
Bohrer Brady L L C
contact info
Scott Earl Brady
Bohrer Brady L L C
contact info
Trang Q Tran
Tran Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Edgard Moneyhun
Represented By
Philip Bohrer
Bohrer Brady L L C
contact info
Scott Earl Brady
Bohrer Brady L L C
contact info
Trang Q Tran
Tran Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, June 03, 2024
26 26 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss/Joint or Voluntary Tue 06/04 8:10 AM
ORDER granting25 Joint Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 6/3/2024. (crt,Crick, S)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
25 25 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 05/31 4:20 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Andrew Chavez .(aty,Tran, Trang)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed order
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 06/03 8:25 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to25 Joint Motion to Dismiss. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 5/31/2024. (crt,Crick, S)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
24 24 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case (30, 60, 90 day) Wed 03/06 1:27 PM
90 DAY ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 3/6/2024. (crt,Keller, J)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
23 23 notice Notice of Settlement Tue 03/05 3:22 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Andrew Chavez, Edgard Moneyhun, Lencho Oilfield Serives Inc, Lawrence Deculit, III (aty,Brady, Scott) Modified on 3/5/2024 to add filers. (Crick, S)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
22 22 order Scheduling Order - Hornsby Mon 02/26 2:17 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 12/9/2024 09:30 AM in Shreveport, Courtroom 3 before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Pretrial Conference set for 11/7/2024 10:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Pretrial Order due by 10/31/2024. Witness List due by 4/7/2024. Defendants witness list is due seven(7) days after receipt of plaintiffs list. Discovery deadline 7/7/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 8/7/2024. Proposed Pretrial Order inserts and exhibits exchanged by 9/26/2024. Conference/Meeting of counsel to prepare pretrial order to be held by 10/10/2024. Motions in Limine due by 10/24/2024. Trial Depositions due by 11/18/2024. Trial Brief/Pretrial Submissions due by 12/2/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 2/26/2024. (crt,Keller, J)
Related: [-]
21 21 minutes Status Conference Mon 02/26 2:11 PM
MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 2/26/2024. Plaintiffs have decided not to pursue the collective action. (crt,Keller, J)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
20 20 order Minute Entry ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 01/31 3:21 PM
ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY: A telephone Status Conference is set for 2/26/2024 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Dial-in instructions will be emailed to all counsel of record. Trial counsel for each party must participate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 1/31/2024. (crt,Rider, M)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension (Other) Fri 12/15 3:32 PM
ORDER granting18 Motion for Extension. Plaintiffs shall file their motion to seek certification as a collective action on or before January 19, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 12/15/2023. (crt,Crick, S)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
18 18 motion Extension (Other) Mon 12/11 11:55 AM
Second MOTION for Extension of to Extend Deadline for Filing Motion for Conditional Certification Unopposed by All Plaintiffs. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 12/11/2023.(aty,Brady, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, November 16, 2023
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension (Other) Thu 11/16 1:43 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion for Extension. Plaintiffs shall file their motion to seek certification as a collective on or before 12/13/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 11/16/2023. (crt,Keifer, K)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
16 16 motion Extension (Other) Tue 11/14 10:59 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of an Extension of Time to File a Motion for Certification with consent by All Plaintiffs. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 11/14/2023.(aty,Brady, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, July 24, 2023
15 15 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge (consent case) Mon 07/24 1:40 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby for trial. Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr no longer assigned to case as presiding judge. Signed by Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 7/24/2023. (crt,Crick, S)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2023
14 14 motion Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF) Mon 07/17 4:41 PM
PROPOSED ORDER OF REFERENCE Referred to Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/17/2023.(crt,Crick, S)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form received on 7/13/23
Wednesday, July 12, 2023
13 13 minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 07/12 11:45 AM
MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 7/12/2023. The parties are exchanging written discovery relative to the collective action. The deadline for Plaintiff to file a motion to seek certification as a collective action is November 13, 2023 . (crt,Keller, J)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
12 12 misc Rule 26(f) Report Wed 06/28 12:57 PM
RULE 26(f) Report by Andrew Chavez, Edgard Moneyhun, Lencho Oilfield Services Inc, Lawrence Deculit, III . (aty,Tran, Trang) Modified on 6/28/2023 to add filers. (Crick, S)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 31, 2023
11 11 1 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference Wed 05/31 2:19 PM
ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 7/12/2023 10:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Rule 26 Conference between parties to take place before 6/23/2023. Initial Disclosures exchanged by 6/30/2023. Rule 26 Report due by 6/30/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 5/31/2023. (crt,Keller, J)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 29, 2023
10 10 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 05/29 6:46 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lawrence Deculit, III, Lencho Oilfield Services Inc. (aty,Shepherd, John)
Related: [-]
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 05/29 6:41 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Lawrence Deculit, III, Lencho Oilfield Services Inc.(Attorney John David Shepherd, Jr added to party Lawrence Deculit, III(pty:dft), Attorney John David Shepherd, Jr added to party Lencho Oilfield Services Inc(pty:dft))(aty,Shepherd, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 21, 2023
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 04/21 4:06 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andrew Chavez. Lawrence Deculit, III served 3/30/23, answer due 5/30/23; Lencho Oilfield Services served 3/30/23, answer due 5/30/23. (aty,Tran, Trang) Modified to add service date and answer due date on 4/21/2023 (Bunting, M)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 27, 2023
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 03/27 4:12 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Trang Q Tran for Andrew Chavez, Edgard Moneyhun. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 3/27/2023. (crt,Crick, S)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 24, 2023
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/24 12:59 PM
MOTION for Trang Q. Tran to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-5503378) by Andrew Chavez, Edgard Moneyhun. Motions referred to Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/24/2023.(aty,Bohrer, Philip)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Ex A - Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, March 13, 2023
5 5 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Mon 03/13 2:10 PM
SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by Andrew Chavez, Edgard Moneyhun as to Lencho Oilfield Services Inc. (aty,Brady, Scott)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Mon 03/13 2:09 PM
SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by Andrew Chavez, Edgard Moneyhun as to Lawrence Deculit, III. (aty,Brady, Scott)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 14, 2023
3 3 order Jurisdictional Review Finding Tue 02/14 10:55 AM
ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 2/14/2023. (crt,Rider, M)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 13, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued - All (Form Included) Mon 02/13 10:41 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lawrence Deculit, III, Lencho Oilfield Services Inc. (crt,Crick, S)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 10, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 02/10 10:27 AM
COMPLAINT - Collective Action against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-5456491) filed by Andrew Chavez.(Attorney Scott Earl Brady added to party Andrew Chavez(pty:pla))(aty,Brady, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits A and B - Consent Forms,
Att: 2 Civil cover sheet
service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 02/10 10:29 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to All Defendants, requested by Andrew Chavez. (aty,Brady, Scott)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 02/13 10:40 AM
CASE Assigned to Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Crick, S)
Related: [-]