Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Judge:William E Duffin
Case #: 2:23-cv-00194
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Feb 10, 2023
Terminated:May 03, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Aug 12, 2023 5:24 AM CDT
Defendant
Ford of Lake Geneva LLC
W2542 Interchange N.
Lake Geneva, WI 53147
Represented By
Jeffrey J Liotta
Dewitt LLP
contact info
Defendant
Cherie Shanahan
1618 Miller Road
Lake Geneva, WI 53147
Represented By
Jeffrey J Liotta
Dewitt LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ford Motor Credit Company LLC
Represented By
Amy L Vandamme
Dykema Gossett PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 12/13 10:17 AM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 12/13/2023 GRANTING20 Ford Motor Credit Company LLC's Motion to Release Replevin Bond. The Replevin Bond in the sum of $2,196,924.66 obtained by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC from U.S. Specialty Insurance Company on February 21, 2023 is HEREBY RELEASED. (cc: all counsel)(lz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
22 22 misc Letter Tue 12/12 11:56 AM
LETTER from Attorney Vandamme RE: Release Replevin Bond Motion . (Vandamme, Amy)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Proposed Document Tue 12/12 11:53 AM
PROPOSED Proposed Order filed by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. (Vandamme, Amy)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 11, 2023
20 20 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 12/11 4:37 PM
MOTION Release of Replevin Bond by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. (Vandamme, Amy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
19 19 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 05/03 11:04 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Ford of Lake Geneva LLC, Cherie Shanahan. (Liotta, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Case - Notice Attorneys Wed 05/03 11:20 AM
Case Terminated pursuant to19 Stipulation for Dismissal, pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), with prejudice and without costs or attorneys' fees awarded to any party. (lz)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 01, 2023
18 18 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 05/01 8:45 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 5/1/2023. The motion for an extension of time (ECF No.17 ) is GRANTED. The defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint no later than May 5, 2023. (cc: all counsel)(lz)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 28, 2023
17 17 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 04/28 1:46 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by All Defendants. (Liotta, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 21, 2023
16 16 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 04/21 8:13 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 4/21/2023. For good cause, the parties' joint motion to extend the time for the defendants to respond to the complaint (ECF No.15 ) is GRANTED. The defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint no later than April 28, 2023. (cc: all counsel)(lz)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 20, 2023
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 04/20 2:09 PM
Expedited MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer through April 28, 2023 by All Defendants. (Liotta, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 07, 2023
14 14 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 04/07 8:31 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 4/7/2023. For good cause, the parties' joint motion to extend the time for the defendants to respond to the complaint (ECF No.13 ) is GRANTED. In the event that the parties' settlement negotiations do not resolve the issues remaining between them, the defendants shall respond to the complaint by no later than April 21, 2023. (cc: all counsel)(lz)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 06, 2023
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 04/06 10:12 AM
JOINT Expedited MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by All Defendants. (Liotta, Jeffrey) Modified on 4/6/2023 (lz)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2023
12 12 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Order on Motion to Vacate Mon 03/20 9:23 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 3/20/2023. Construing the parties' stipulation as a joint motion, the joint motion (ECF No.11 ) and motion for an extension of time (ECF No.10 ) are GRANTED. The Clerk's entry of default is VACATED. The defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint no later than April 7, 2023. (cc: all counsel)(lz)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 17, 2023
11 11 misc Stipulation Fri 03/17 2:16 PM
STIPULATION Vacating Default and Extending the Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead to the Complaint by All Defendants.(Liotta, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Vacating Default and Extending the Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead to the Complaint
Thursday, March 16, 2023
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 03/16 11:47 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by All Defendants. (Liotta, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/15 4:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey J Liotta on behalf of All Defendants. Attorney(s) appearing: Jeffrey J. Liotta (Liotta, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
8 8 misc Certificate Tue 03/14 2:15 PM
CERTIFICATE by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC (Vandamme, Amy)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Declaration Tue 03/14 2:13 PM
DECLARATION of Amy L. Vandamme in Support of Request to Enter Default (Vandamme, Amy)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Entry of Default Tue 03/14 2:11 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default by All Plaintiffs.(Vandamme, Amy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
order Clerks Entry of Default Tue 03/14 3:08 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Ford of Lake Geneva LLC. (lz)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 01, 2023
5 5 service Admission of Service Wed 03/01 2:04 PM
ADMISSION OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint with attachments on February 24, 2023 by Charles Harvey (Vandamme, Amy)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Admission of Service Wed 03/01 2:03 PM
ADMISSION OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint with attachments on February 16, 2023 by Charlie Harvey (Vandamme, Amy)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 20, 2023
3 3 misc Statement Mon 02/20 11:27 AM
STATEMENT by All Plaintiffs Corporate Disclosure . (Vandamme, Amy)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Mon 02/20 11:25 AM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by All Plaintiffs. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Vandamme, Amy)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 13, 2023
service Summons Issued Mon 02/13 10:51 AM
Summonses Issued as to Ford of Lake Geneva LLC and Cherie Shanahan. (lz)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 10, 2023
1 1 15 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 02/10 1:40 PM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against All Plaintiffs by Ford Motor Credit Company LLC. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4323368)(Vandamme, Amy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Summons - Ford of Lake Geneva,
Att: 3 Summons Summons - Cherie Shanahan,
Att: 4 Exhibit A - Ford Credit's conversion filings,
Att: 5 Exhibit B - Ford of Lake Geneva Articles of Amendment,
Att: 6 Exhibit C - Ford Credit Floorplan financing,
Att: 7 Exhibit D - Security Agreement,
Att: 8 Exhibit E - Shanahan's Continuing Guaranty,
Att: 9 Exhibit F - Dealership's Inventory,
Att: 10 Exhibit G - WDFI Search Report,
Att: 11 Exhibit H - Ford Credit's 2006 financing statement,
Att: 12 Exhibit I - Ford Credit Forbearance Agreement,
Att: 13 Exhibit J - Ford Credit Demand Letter,
Att: 14 Exhibit K - Ford Credit Dealership's deadline letter
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Fri 02/10 2:03 PM
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge William E Duffin; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available[LINK:here.] Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (cmb)
Related: [-]