Arizona District Court
Case #: 2:23-cr-50036
Case Filed:Feb 09, 2023
Terminated:Feb 09, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Feb 11, 2023 12:32 AM MST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Tracy Lyn Van Buskirk
Us Attorneys Office - Phoenix, Az
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Jesus Manuel Ramirez-Luna (1)
Terminated: 02/09/2023


Docket last updated: 02/11/2023 2:04 AM MST
Thursday, February 09, 2023
1 1 1 pgs TRANSFER OF JURISDICTION (Supervised Release) from the Western District of Michigan as to Jesus Manuel Ramirez-Luna. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 2/9/23.(MAP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 20 pgs Superseding Indictment,
Att: 2 Judgment,
Att: 3 9 pgs Docket Sheet