Florida Southern District Court
Case #: 0:23-cr-60007
Case Filed:Jan 12, 2023
Terminated:Jun 06, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Feb 11, 2023 2:45 AM EST
Defendant
Vilaire Duroseau (13)
Defendant
Cassandre Jean (9)
Represented By
Ignacio Miguel Alvarez
Algo Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Roderick Darrell Vereen
Law Office Of Roderick D. Vereen, Esq. P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Francois Legagneur (7)
Represented By
Jaime Torre Halscott
contact info
Jason L. Russo
Law Offices Of Gaitman & Russo, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Damian Lopez (6)
Represented By
Alexander Fernandez Fox
Alexander F. Fox, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Krystal Lopez (3)
Represented By
Alexander Fernandez Fox
Alexander F. Fox, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Norberto Lopez (5)
Represented By
Alexander Fernandez Fox
Alexander F. Fox, P.A.
contact info
Noticing FPD-MIA
contact info
Defendant
Rony Michel (12)
Represented By
David Kalman Tucker
David K. Tucker, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Evangeline Naissant (11)
Represented By
Mark Stuart Roher
Law Office Of Mark S. Roher, P.A.
contact info
Russ Kofman
Lebedin Kofman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Yelva Saint Preux (10)
Represented By
Todd A. Spodek
Spodek Law Group, P.C.
contact info
Robert A. Rosenblatt
Law Offices Of Robert A. Rosenblatt, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Ricky Riley (4)
Represented By
Noticing FPD-MIA
contact info
Defendant
Gail Russ (1)
Represented By
J. Samantha Vacciana
Trial Lawyers Of The Palm Beaches
contact info
Grey Tesh
contact info
Defendant
Reynoso Seide (8)
Represented By
Kenneth David Padowitz
Kenneth Padowitz P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Cheryl Stanley (2)
Represented By
Howard J. Schumacher
contact info
Defendant
Yvrose Thermitus (14)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Nicole Grosnoff
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
Christopher Clark
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 1:36 AM EDT
Thursday, January 12, 2023
1 1 33 pgs INDICTMENT as to Gail Russ (1) count(s) 1, 3-6, 12-22, 24-25, Cheryl Stanley (2) count(s) 1, 4-6, Krystal Lopez (3) count(s) 1, 8, Ricky Riley (4) count(s) 1, 10-12, 19, Norberto Lopez (5) count(s) 1, 7, Damian Lopez (6) count(s) 1, 2, Francois Legagneur (7) count(s) 1, 4-5, 15-17, Reynoso Seide (8) count(s) 1, 8, Cassandre Jean (9) count(s) 1, 12, 17, 20, 25, Yelva Saint Preux (10) count(s) 1, 3, Evangeline Naissant (11) count(s) 1, 3, Rony Michel (12) count(s) 1, 9, 18, 22, Vilaire Duroseau (13) count(s) 1, 10, 14, 23, Yvrose Thermitus (14) count(s) 1, 21, 24. FORFEITURE ATTACHED (dd) (at).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (1/13/2023) Restricted Unredacted Indictment
2 2 MOTION To Seal by USA as to Gail Russ, Cheryl Stanley, Krystal Lopez, Ricky Riley, Norberto Lopez, Damian Lopez, Francois Legagneur, Reynoso Seide, Cassandre Jean, Yelva Saint Preux, Evangeline Naissant, Rony Michel, Vilaire Duroseau, Yvrose Thermitus. (dd)
Related: [-]
3 3 SEALED ORDER granting2 Motion as to Gail Russ (1), Cheryl Stanley (2), Krystal Lopez (3), Ricky Riley (4), Norberto Lopez (5), Damian Lopez (6), Francois Legagneur (7), Reynoso Seide (8), Cassandre Jean (9), Yelva Saint Preux (10), Evangeline Naissant (11), Rony Michel (12), Vilaire Duroseau (13), Yvrose Thermitus (14). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian on 1/12/2023). (See attached document for full details). (at)
Related: [-]