Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:James M Carr
Case #: 1:14-bk-09237
Case Filed:Oct 03, 2014
Creditor Meeting:Jun 16, 2015
Claims Deadline:Sep 18, 2015
Converted:Apr 27, 2015
Discharge Objection Deadline:Aug 17, 2015

Debtor
Harold D. Garrison
10822 Club Point Dr
Fishers, IN 46037-2786
Represented By
William J. Tucker
Tucker Hester Baker & Krebs
contact info
Bradley J. Buchheit
Tucker, Hester, Baker & Krebs, LLC
contact info
Jeffrey M. Hester
Tucker Hester Baker & Krebs, LLC
contact info
Courtney Elaine Chilcote
Tucker, Hester, Baker & Krebs, LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Jenice Golson-Dunlap
Office of Jenice Golson-Dunlap 1 N Pennsylvania St Ste 1050
Indianapolis, IN 46204
Represented By
James T Young
Rubin & Levin P.C.
contact info
Elizabeth Marie Lally
Rubin & Levin, P.C.
contact info
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204
Represented By
Jeannette Eisan Hinshaw
Office Of U.S. Trustee
contact info


1. Reeling developer dumps ?worthless information' on court (ibj.com)
Submitted Mon 03/02/2015
Docket last updated: 08/14/2015 4:26 PM EDT
Friday, October 03, 2014
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Fri 10/03 4:19 PM
Receipt of Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition 14-09237 11) [misc,volp11] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 23571790. Fee amount 1717.00 Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 1
court Judge - Terminate/Add Fri 10/03 4:26 PM
Judge Jeffrey J. Graham assigned. (kpd)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Fri 10/03 4:16 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition with List of Equity Security Holders filed by Jeffrey M. Hester on behalf of Harold D. Garrison. List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors due by 10/10/2014. List of Secured Creditors due by 10/10/2014. Attorney Disclosure of Compensation due by 10/17/2014. Statement of Financial Affairs with Declaration due by 10/17/2014. Summary of Schedules with Declaration due by 10/17/2014. Statistical Summary of Certain Liabilities with Declaration due by 10/17/2014. Schedules A-J with Declaration due by 10/17/2014. Verification of Creditor List due by 10/17/2014 (Hester, Jeffrey) CORRECTION: List of equity security holders not included in PDF. Modified on 10/6/2014 (lad)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Statement of Social Security Number(s) Fri 10/03 4:16 PM
Statement of Social Security Number(s) filed by Jeffrey M. Hester on behalf of Debtor Harold D. Garrison. (Hester, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Exhibit D - Statement of Compliance with Credit Counseling Requirement Fri 10/03 4:16 PM
Exhibit D to Petition: Individual Debtor's Statement of Compliance with Credit Counseling Requirement with Certificate of Credit Counseling filed by Jeffrey M. Hester on behalf of Debtor Harold D. Garrison. (Hester, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]