Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Sean F Cox
Referred: David R Grand
Case #: 2:23-cv-10383
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Feb 13, 2023
Terminated:Oct 30, 2023
Case in other court:Wayne County Circuit Court, 23-000018-CK
Last checked: Saturday Aug 12, 2023 6:42 AM EDT
Defendant
Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By
Stephen P. Brown
Plunkett & Cooney (bloomfield Hills)
contact info
Stephanie M. Brochert
Plunkett Cooney
contact info
Defendant
Liberty Mutual Insurance Co.
The Corporation Company 30600 Telegraph Road Suite 2345
Bingham Farms, MI 48025
Represented By
Stephen P. Brown
Plunkett & Cooney (bloomfield Hills)
contact info
Stephanie M. Brochert
Plunkett Cooney
contact info
Plaintiff
TAA Fairlane Property, LLC
Represented By
Stanley R. Mikiciuk
S.R. Mikiciuk, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, October 30, 2023
31 31 order Dismissing Case - Stipulated Order Mon 10/30 11:12 AM
STIPULATED ORDER DISMISSING CASE Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
30 30 notice Notice - Other Tue 10/10 12:15 PM
NOTICE by Liberty Mutual Insurance Co., Ohio Casualty Insurance Company (Notice of Settlement in Principle) (Brown, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 15, 2023
notice Error Fri 09/15 8:01 AM
NOTICE of Error directed to: Stanley R. Mikiciuk re29 Certificate of Service. Document is prohibited discovery, disclosure or a certificate of service thereof. Document was stricken. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (SSch)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 13, 2023
29 29 service Certificate of Service Wed 09/13 5:03 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by TAA Fairlane Property, LLC re PLTF'S 9 13 23 RFAdmissions (Mikiciuk, Stanley)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 31, 2023
28 28 respoth Amended Answer to Complaint Thu 08/31 11:38 AM
AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Liberty Mutual Insurance Co., Ohio Casualty Insurance Company. (Brown, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certified Copy of Policy
Friday, August 18, 2023
27 27 service Certificate of Service Fri 08/18 9:30 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by TAA Fairlane Property, LLC re PLTF'S 8/18/23 WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST (Mikiciuk, Stanley)
Related: [-]
26 26 trial Witness List Fri 08/18 9:26 AM
PLAINTIFF'S AUGUST 18, 2023 WITNESS LIST by TAA Fairlane Property, LLC (Mikiciuk, Stanley)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2023
25 25 service Certificate of Service Mon 08/14 12:06 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by TAA Fairlane Property, LLC re SUPPLEMENT TO PLTFS INITIAL DISCLOSURES (Mikiciuk, Stanley)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 02, 2023
24 24 order Scheduling Order Wed 08/02 4:51 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 11/24/2023, Status Conference re Facilitation set for 11/28/2023 at 03:30 PM before District Judge Sean F. Cox, Dispositive Motion Cut-off set for 1/2/2024, Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/21/2024 at 02:00 PM before District Judge Sean F. Cox, Trailing Trial Docket set for July/August 2024 Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. Related [+] (JMcC)
Related: [-] fer to image for additional dates
Tuesday, August 01, 2023
minutes Status Conference Tue 08/01 1:00 PM
Minute Entry for in-person proceedings before District Judge Sean F. Cox: Status Conference held on 8/1/2023. Disposition: New scheduling order dates issued. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (JMcC)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 31, 2023
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 07/31 11:03 AM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 8/1/2023 at 11:00 AM (TIME CHANGE) before District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 19, 2023
23 23 notice Appear* Wed 07/19 9:53 AM
NOTICE TO APPEAR IN PERSON: Status Conference set for 8/1/2023 at 03:30 PM before District Judge Sean F. Cox (JMcC)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 17, 2023
order Text-Only Reassignment Mon 07/17 1:45 PM
Text-Only Order of reassignment from District Judge Victoria A. Roberts to District Judge Sean F. Cox pursuant to Administrative Order 23-AO-033. (SSch)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 09, 2023
notice Error Fri 06/09 8:23 AM
NOTICE of error directed to Stanley R. Mikiciuk re22 Certificate of Service. Document is prohibited discovery, disclosure or a certificate of service thereof. Document was stricken. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (DPer)
Related: [-]
notice Error Fri 06/09 8:33 AM
NOTICE of Error directed to: Stanley R. Mikiciuk re21 Certificate of Service,20 Certificate of Service. Document is prohibited discovery, disclosure or a certificate of service thereof. Document was stricken. [No Image Associated with this docket entry] (KBro)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 08, 2023
22 22 service Certificate of Service Thu 06/08 2:10 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by TAA Fairlane Property, LLC REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION 6 8 23 (Mikiciuk, Stanley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
21 21 service Certificate of Service Tue 05/30 4:02 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by TAA Fairlane Property, LLC REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION 5 30 23 (Mikiciuk, Stanley)
Related: [-]
20 20 service Certificate of Service Tue 05/30 4:01 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by TAA Fairlane Property, LLC REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS DATED 5 30 23 (Mikiciuk, Stanley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 16, 2023
19 19 service Certificate of Service Tue 05/16 2:56 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by TAA Fairlane Property, LLC (Mikiciuk, Stanley)
Related: [-]
18 18 trial Witness List Tue 05/16 2:54 PM
PLAINTIFF'S PRELIMINARY WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST WITNESS LIST by TAA Fairlane Property, LLC (Mikiciuk, Stanley)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 28, 2023
17 17 order Scheduling Order Fri 04/28 1:31 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER PHASE I: Discovery due by 9/25/2023 , Status Conference set for 10/12/2023 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Victoria A. Roberts . Signed by District Judge Victoria A. Roberts. Related [+] (LVer)
Related: [-] fer to image for additional dates
16 16 service Certificate of Service Fri 04/28 11:03 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by TAA Fairlane Property, LLC (Mikiciuk, Stanley)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Certificate of Service Fri 04/28 11:01 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by TAA Fairlane Property, LLC (Mikiciuk, Stanley)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Certificate of Service Fri 04/28 10:56 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by TAA Fairlane Property, LLC (Mikiciuk, Stanley)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 27, 2023
13 13 service Certificate of Service Thu 04/27 5:23 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by TAA Fairlane Property, LLC (Mikiciuk, Stanley)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 24, 2023
minutes Scheduling Conference Mon 04/24 11:18 AM
Minute Entry for virtual proceedings before District Judge Victoria A. Roberts: Scheduling Conference held on 4/24/2023. (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (LVer)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 10, 2023
12 12 misc Discovery Plan - Rule 26f Mon 04/10 12:27 PM
DISCOVERY plan jointly filed pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26(f) (Mikiciuk, Stanley)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 27, 2023
11 11 service Certificate of Service Mon 03/27 12:25 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by TAA Fairlane Property, LLC (Mikiciuk, Stanley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
10 10 notice Appear* Tue 03/14 2:08 PM
NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 4/24/2023 at 10:30 AM before District Judge Victoria A. Roberts . See image for details and dates. Attorneys will receive Zoom connection information prior to the conference. (LVer)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 28, 2023
9 9 misc Jury Demand Tue 02/28 11:52 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by TAA Fairlane Property, LLC (Mikiciuk, Stanley)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 27, 2023
8 8 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Mon 02/27 4:17 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Ohio Casualty Insurance Company (Brown, Stephen)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Statement of Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Mon 02/27 4:16 PM
STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Liberty Mutual Insurance Co. (Brown, Stephen)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 02/27 4:12 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and/or Avoidance Defenses by Liberty Mutual Insurance Co., Ohio Casualty Insurance Company. (Brown, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certified Policy
Wednesday, February 22, 2023
5 5 order Reassignment/Disqualification Wed 02/22 8:09 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Sean F. Cox and Magistrate Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey to District Judge Victoria A. Roberts and Magistrate Judge David R. Grand. (SSch)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 21, 2023
4 4 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 02/21 2:29 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint. ( Responsive Pleading due by 2/27/2023 ) Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 17, 2023
3 3 service Certificate of Service Fri 02/17 8:43 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by TAA Fairlane Property, LLC (Mikiciuk, Stanley)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 13, 2023
2 2 notice Appearance Mon 02/13 5:03 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie M. Brochert on behalf of LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE CO., Ohio Casualty Insurance Company. (Brochert, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Civil Case - Notice of Removal Mon 02/13 4:15 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE CO. from Wayne County Circuit Court, case number 23-000018-CK. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9235797 - Fee: $ 402 [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Brown, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 46 pgs Exhibit A - Complaint Against Liberty Mutual,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Complaint Against Ohio Casualty,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal