Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:John M Gallagher
Case #: 5:23-cv-00571
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Feb 13, 2023
Terminated:Sep 19, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Aug 12, 2023 5:39 AM EDT
Defendant
FASHION CENTS CONSIGNMENT, INC
225 N. Decatur St.
Strasburg, PA 17579
Represented By
BRANDON S. HARTER
Lancaster Tech Law PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
EMILY MCCOMSEY
650 N. Mary St.
Lancaster, PA 17603
Represented By
ERIC J. STARK
Stark Law Group, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, September 19, 2023
12 12 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case - 41(b) Tue 09/19 11:09 AM
ORDER THAT THE ABOVE ACTION IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, PURSUANT TO THE AGREEMENT OF COUNSEL WITHOUT COSTS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 9/19/23. 9/19/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
11 11 minutes Status Conference 1 - Terminate Hearings Thu 08/17 1:38 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER: Status Conference held on 8/17/23. Court Reporter: None. (er)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 12, 2023
10 10 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines Tue 06/13 10:20 AM
ORDER THAT FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/31/2024 01:30 PM IN Cahn 4B BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER; STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 8/17/2023 10:00 AM IN Telephone Conference BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER; DISCOVERY DUE BY 10/9/2023; JURY SELECTION SET FOR 2/9/2024 09:00 AM IN Courtroom TBD BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER; MOTIONS DUE BY 6/14/2023; MOTION IN LIMINE DUE BY 1/10/2024; MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT DUE BY 10/23/2023; PLAINTIFF PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 1/3/2024; DEFENDANT PRETRIAL MEMO DUE BY 1/3/2024; TRIAL DATE SET FOR 2/12/2024 09:00 AM IN Cahn 4B BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER; ETC. AS HEREIN. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER ON 6/12/23. 6/13/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 08, 2023
9 9 minutes Pretrial Conference - Interim 1 - Terminate Deadlines Thu 06/08 12:21 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE JOHN M. GALLAGHER. Pretrial Conference held on 6/8/23. (mas)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 06/08 9:46 AM
NOTICE of Rule 16 Hearing: TELEPHONE RULE 16 CONFERENCE SET FOR 6/8/2023 at 11:00 AM VIA Telephone BEFORE JUDGE JOHN M. GALLAGHER.(BRD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 30, 2023
7 7 discov Discovery Plan Tue 05/30 3:45 PM
Discovery Plan by FASHION CENTS CONSIGNMENT, INC.(HARTER, BRANDON)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 03, 2023
6 6 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 05/03 11:48 AM
NOTICE of Hearing that a Rule 16 Conference, in the above case has been set as follows: Lead counsel shall appear for a Rule 16 conference in the above-captioned matter on Thursday, June 8, 2023 at 11:00 AM, at the United States District Court located at 504 West Hamilton Street, Suite 4701, Allentown, Pennsylvania. Counsel are required to meet and confer pursuant to Rule 26(f) and to complete and submit to the Court the Joint Rule 26(f) Report no later than Tuesday, May 30, 2023. The Parties are advised that the United States Magistrate Judge assigned to this Court is the Honorable Pamela A. Carlos. (mas)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 01, 2023
5 5 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Mon 05/01 4:24 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by FASHION CENTS CONSIGNMENT, INC.(HARTER, BRANDON)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 05/01 4:21 PM
ANSWER to Complaint together with No by FASHION CENTS CONSIGNMENT, INC.(HARTER, BRANDON)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 06, 2023
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 04/06 1:44 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by EMILY MCCOMSEY. FASHION CENTS CONSIGNMENT, INC waiver sent on 3/2/2023, answer due 5/1/2023. (STARK, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 14, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 02/14 2:46 PM
Summons Issued as to FASHION CENTS CONSIGNMENT, INC. Forwarded To: Counsel on 2/14/23 (mas)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 13, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Mon 02/13 5:34 PM
COMPLAINT against FASHION CENTS CONSIGNMENT, INC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-16497887.), filed by EMILY MCCOMSEY.(STARK, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form