Alaska District Court
Judge:Joshua M Kindred
Case #: 3:23-cv-00031
Nature of Suit240 Real Property - Torts to Land
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Feb 13, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Aug 12, 2023 4:43 AM AKDT
Defendant
Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.
Represented By
Harold Snow
Buchalter, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Defendant
U.S. Bank, N.A.
Represented By
Harold Snow
Buchalter, A Professional Corporation
contact info
Plaintiff
Donovan J. Colbry
5128 Hiland Rd.
Eagle River, AK 99577
Plaintiff
Lucy A. Colbry
5128 Hiland Road
Eagle River, AK 99577

GPO Apr 05 2023
ORDER re 13 MOTION to Dismiss. Plaintiff has until on or before 21 days to file opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Defendant has until 14 days to file a reply. Plaintiff's Motions at Dockets 3-4 are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Joshua M. Kindred on 4/5/23. (JLH, COURT STAFF)

Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM AKDT
Tuesday, June 27, 2023
20 20 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Tue 06/27 9:12 AM
JMK TEXT ORDER: Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal at Docket19 is effective without an order from the Court. Fed. R. Civ P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). All pending motions are dismissed as moot. The Clerk will please close this case. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 22, 2023
19 19 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 06/22 4:26 PM
MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Donovan J. Colbry.(PXS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 17, 2023
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 05/17 12:29 PM
ORDER granting in part16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to the Motion to Dismiss or Leave to Amend the Complaint. Plaintiffs' Responses due within 25 days . See order for additional deadlines. Signed by Judge Joshua M. Kindred on 5/17/2023. (ANM, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 26, 2023
16 16 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 04/26 3:57 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to13 MOTION to Dismiss by Donovan J. Colbry.(PXS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
15 15 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 04/05 4:40 PM
ORDER re13 MOTION to Dismiss. Plaintiff has until on or before 21 days to file opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Defendant has until 14 days to file a reply. Plaintiff's Motions at Dockets 3-4 are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Joshua M. Kindred on 4/5/23. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 29, 2023
14 14 misc Declaration Wed 03/29 1:35 PM
DECLARATION of Harold E. Snow re13 MOTION to Dismiss by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A..(Snow, Harold)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I
13 13 motion Dismiss Wed 03/29 1:32 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A..(Snow, Harold)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 21, 2023
12 12 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 03/21 3:01 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by U.S. Bank, N.A.. (Snow, Harold)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 03/21 2:58 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (Snow, Harold)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/21 2:51 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Harold Snow on behalf of Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A. (Snow, Harold)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 03/21 12:29 PM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Responses are due by 3/29/2023 . Signed by Judge Joshua M. Kindred on 3/21/2023. (ANM, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 03/14 8:14 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank, N.A..(Snow, Harold)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, February 17, 2023
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 02/21 11:49 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donovan J. Colbry. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. served on 2/15/2023, answer due 3/8/2023. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 02/21 11:47 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Donovan J. Colbry. U.S. Bank, N.A. served on 2/15/2023, answer due 3/8/2023. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 14, 2023
5 5 service Unissued Summons Tue 02/14 1:17 PM
Unissued summons re Defendant U.S. Bank,(BJK, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Select Portfolio Servicing Inc
service 1 - Summons Issued Tue 02/14 1:18 PM
Summons Issued as to Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. and U.S. Bank, N.A.. (BJK, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 13, 2023
4 4 motion Expedite Tue 02/14 9:48 AM
MOTION for Expedited Consideration for Plaintiffs Ex-Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by Donovan J. Colbry. (SXH, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 02/14 9:17 AM
Civil Cover Sheet (SXH, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/14 9:14 AM
COMPLAINT against U.S. Bank, N.A., Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. (Filing fee $ 402.), filed by Donovan J. Colbry, Lucy A. Colbry.. (SXH, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5