Georgia Middle District Court
Judge:Tilman E Self, III
Case #: 3:23-cv-00016
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Feb 13, 2023
Terminated:Jun 14, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Aug 12, 2023 10:40 AM EDT
Defendant
LAVENDER PEST CONTROL INC
Represented By
KELLI SPEARMAN
contact info
JOYCE M MOCEK
Freeman Mathis & Gary LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
SANDICE THRASHER
Represented By
KIMBERLY A WORTH
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, June 14, 2023
10 10 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 06/14 11:25 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by SANDICE THRASHER as to All Defendants (WORTH, KIMBERLY)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 06/14 11:02 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by SANDICE THRASHER as to All Defendants (REVIS, STEPHEN)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency Wed 06/14 11:13 AM
Notice of Deficiency Related [+]; The PACER login ID and password used to electronically file a document constitutes the Participants electronic signature for all purposes under the Federal Rules. Document must be re-filed using the user credentials of the name of the attorney in the signature block. See CM/ECF Administrative Procedures.(ggs)
Related: [-] 9 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by SANDICE THRASHER
utility REMARK Wed 06/14 12:33 PM
REMARK : Pursuant to the filing of10 Stipulation of Dismissal, this case is closed. (ggs)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 15, 2023
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 05/15 3:23 PM
CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by LAVENDER PEST CONTROL INC filed by JOYCE M MOCEK.(MOCEK, JOYCE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Second Extension of Time
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 05/15 3:47 PM
This is a text only entry; no document issued. ORDER granting7 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer1 Complaint. The parties have notified the Court they have reached a settlement and need additional time to finalize the settlement. The Court grants Defendant until and including June 15, 2023 to file any answer or responsive pleading. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 5/15/2023 (TES)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 12, 2023
6 6 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 04/12 1:47 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by KELLI SPEARMAN on behalf of LAVENDER PEST CONTROL INC Attorney KELLI SPEARMAN added to party LAVENDER PEST CONTROL INC(pty:dft)(SPEARMAN, KELLI)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 16, 2023
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 03/16 11:17 AM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint. Defendant shall have through and including May 15, 2023 toanswer, plead, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 3/16/2023. (ggs)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 03/16 9:50 AM
CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by LAVENDER PEST CONTROL INC filed by JOYCE M MOCEK.(MOCEK, JOYCE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 03/16 10:33 AM
Case REASSIGNED to US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III. US DISTRICT JUDGE C ASHLEY ROYAL no longer assigned to the case. (ggs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 14, 2023
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 02/14 11:22 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SANDICE THRASHER as to LAVENDER PEST CONTROL INC. (WORTH, KIMBERLY)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 02/14 8:42 AM
Summons Issued as to LAVENDER PEST CONTROL INC. (ggs)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency Tue 02/14 8:33 AM
Notice of Deficiency Related [+]; Notice to Counsel KIMBERLY A. WORTH . The e-mail address on the document does not match your e-mail address in CM/ECF. If necessary, please update your e mail address via PACER. ADDITIONALLY , A generic identifier such as Exhibit A or Exhibit 1 is not acceptable. An example of a properly identified attachment would be Exhibit A Letter from A. Hamilton to A. Burr. See CM/ECF Administrative Procedures, page 13. Please do not refile, exhibit descriptions added by case manager. (ggs)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint, filed by SANDICE THRASHER
notice Notice of Deficiency Tue 02/14 12:22 PM
Notice of Deficiency Related [+]; REMINDER documents must be converted into text-searchable PDF format prior to filing. See CM/ECF Administrative Procedures, page 9. No need to refile, for future reference only. (ggs)
Related: [-] 3 Waiver of Service Executed filed by SANDICE THRASHER
Monday, February 13, 2023
1 1 misc Complaint Mon 02/13 5:17 PM
COMPLAINT against LAVENDER PEST CONTROL, INC. Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-4298735, $402 filed by SANDICE THRASHER(WORTH, KIMBERLY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B