Virginia Eastern District Court
Case #: 2:22-cr-00140
Case Filed:Nov 16, 2022
Terminated:Mar 01, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 14, 2023 2:18 AM EST
Defendant
Hannah Catherine Schuster (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Darryl James Mitchell
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/05/2024 11:31 PM EDT
Wednesday, November 16, 2022
1 1 MOTION to Seal Indictment by USA as to Hannah Catherine Schuster. (afar)
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER granting1 Motion to Seal Indictment as to Hannah Catherine Schuster (1). The Indictment and arrest warrant are unsealed at the time of the arrest of the defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 11/16/22. (afar)
Related: [-]
3 3 3 pgs INDICTMENT RETURNED AND FILED IN OPEN COURT as to Hannah Catherine Schuster (1) count(s) 1. On motion of the Government, the Court directed warrant to be issued. (afar)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Deft Info Sheet