Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Sean P Flynn
Referred: Sean P Flynn
Case #: 8:23-cv-00318
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Feb 14, 2023
Re-opened:Jul 14, 2023
Terminated:Apr 26, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Aug 13, 2023 6:08 AM EDT
Counter Claimant
Nestle USA, Inc.
Represented By
Chad J. Shifrin
Laurie & Brennan LLP
contact info
Peter A Luccarelli, III
Sisco-Law
contact info
Dale R. Sisco
Sisco-Law
contact info
Marissa L. Downs
Laurie & Brennan, LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Polypack, Inc.
Represented By
Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Carlos F. Gonzalez, P.A.
contact info
Guy A. Lewis
The Law Office Of Guy A. Lewis, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Nestle USA, Inc.
PO Box 5805
Troy, MI 48007
Represented By
Chad J. Shifrin
Laurie & Brennan LLP
contact info
Peter A Luccarelli, III
Sisco-Law
contact info
Dale R. Sisco
Sisco-Law
contact info
Marissa L. Downs
Laurie & Brennan, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Polypack, Inc.
3301 Gateway Centre Blvd
Pinellas Park, Florida, FL 33782
Represented By
Carlos Fernando Gonzalez
Carlos F. Gonzalez, P.A.
contact info
Guy A. Lewis
The Law Office Of Guy A. Lewis, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
173 173 order Order directing response to motion Thu 05/08 5:05 PM
ENDORSED ORDER directing Polypack, Inc. to respond to 169 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on or before 5/21/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 5/8/2025. (CED)
Related: [-]
172 172 trial Jury Instructions Thu 05/08 5:02 PM
Jury Instructions. (CED)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
179 179 trial Jury Verdict Thu 05/08 8:48 PM
JURY VERDICT Polypack Inc. v. Nestle USA, Inc.(EJC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Restricted Unredacted
178 178 minutes Jury Trial - Completed Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 05/08 8:45 PM
Minute Entry. In Person Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn: ORAL ORDER granting 174 Oral Motion to admit into evidence by Defendant Exhibits DX4, DX81, DX102, DX105, DX106, DX130, DX131, DX156, JX29, DX91, DX115, DX138, DX9, DX12, DX18, DX19, DX23, DX28, DX33, DX40, DX41, DX48, DX49, DX51, DX54, DX57, DX59, DX66, DX68; JURY TRIAL Day Eight completed on 5/7/2025. Court Reporter: Rebecca Sabo (EJC)
Related: [-]
177 177 trial Jury Notes Thu 05/08 8:37 PM
JURY NOTES Polypack, Inc. v. Nestle USA, Inc..(EJC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Restricted Unredacted
176 176 trial Jury Notes Thu 05/08 8:05 PM
JURY NOTES as to Polypack, Inc. v. Nestle, USA.(EJC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Restricted Unredacted
175 175 motion Directed Verdict Thu 05/08 7:26 PM
ORAL MOTION for Directed Verdict by Polypack, Inc.. (EJC)
Related: [-]
174 174 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 05/08 7:24 PM
ORAL MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to admit into evidence by Defendant Exhibits DX4, DX81, DX102, DX105, DX106, DX130, DX131, DX156, JX29, DX91, DX115, DX138, DX9, DX12, DX18, DX19, DX23, DX28, DX33, DX40, DX41, DX48, DX49, DX51, DX54, DX57, DX59, DX66, DX68 by Nestle USA, Inc.. (EJC)
Related: [-]
171 171 trial Jury Instructions Wed 05/07 4:24 PM
Interim Jury Instructions. (CED)
Related: [-]
170 170 trial Jury Instructions Wed 05/07 12:51 PM
Interim Jury Instructions. (CED)
Related: [-]
169 169 motion Judgment as a Matter of Law Wed 05/07 11:54 AM
MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Nestle USA, Inc.. (Luccarelli, Peter)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
168 168 minutes Jury Trial - Held Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 05/07 9:55 AM
Minute Entry. In Person Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn: ORAL ORDER granting 167 Oral Motion to admit into evidence by Defendant Exhibits JX93, JX94, JX115, JX116, JX117, JX143, JX144, JX149, DX146, DX148, DX50, DX53, DX56, DX60, JX51, JX52, JX53, PX17; JURY TRIAL Day Seven held on 5/6/2025. Court Reporter: Rebecca Sabo (EJC)
Related: [-]
167 167 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 05/07 9:22 AM
ORAL MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to admit into evidence Exhibits JX93, JX94, JX115, JX116, JX117, JX143, JX144, JX149, DX146, DX148, DX50, DX53, DX56, DX60, JX51, JX52, JX53, PX17 by Nestle USA, Inc.. (EJC)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
166 166 trial Jury Notes Mon 05/05 5:49 PM
SEALED JURY NOTES jury trial day six. (EJC)
Related: [-]
165 165 trial Jury Notes Mon 05/05 5:38 PM
JURY NOTES jury trial day six. (EJC)
Related: [-]
164 164 minutes Jury Trial - Held Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Mon 05/05 5:35 PM
Minute Entry. In Person Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn: ORAL ORDER granting 162 Oral Motion to admit into evidence by Defendant Exhibits JX87, DX27, DX99, JX26, JX121, X122, JX123, JX124, JX129, DX118, DX98, DX93, DX100, DX119, DX101, DX01, DX63, DX77, DX107, JX13, DX83, DX46, DX87, JX60, DX136, DX95, DX137, JX138, JX92, DX96, JX67, JX68, DX141, DX97, DX146, JX86 DX65, DX22, JX55, JX91, JX110, DX71, DX72, DX73, DX74, DX75, DX76, DX79, DX80, DX139granting 163 Oral Motion to admit into evidence by Plaintiff Exhibits JX 25, JX50, JX59, JX60, JX61, JX62; JURY TRIAL Day Six held on 5/5/2025. Court Reporter: Rebecca Sabo (EJC)
Related: [-]
163 163 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 05/05 5:29 PM
ORAL MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to admit into evidence by Plaintiff Exhibits JX 25, JX50, JX59, JX60, JX61, JX62 by Polypack, Inc.. (EJC)
Related: [-]
162 162 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 05/05 5:28 PM
ORAL MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to admit into evidence by Defendant Exhibits JX87, DX27, DX99, JX26, JX121, X122, JX123, JX124, JX129, DX118, DX98, DX93, DX100, DX119, DX101, DX01, DX63, DX77, DX107, JX13, DX83, DX46, DX87, JX60, DX136, DX95, DX137, JX138, JX92, DX96, JX67, JX68, DX141, DX97, DX146, JX86 DX65, DX22, JX55, JX91, JX110, DX71, DX72, DX73, DX74, DX75, DX76, DX79, DX80, DX139 by Nestle USA, Inc.. (EJC)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
161 161 minutes Jury Trial - Held Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Fri 05/02 5:32 PM
Minute Entry. In Person Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn: granting 159 Motion to admit into evidence by Defendant Exhibits DX58, DX89, DX111, DX112, DX114, DX116, DX117, DX163, JX20, JX28, JX14, JX75, JX76, JX77, JX78, JX79, JX99, JX104, JX131, JX134, JX135, JX139, DX84, DX90, DX125, DX126, DX127, DX128, DX129, DX132, DX133, DX135, DX147; granting 160 Motion to admit into evidence by Plaintiff Exhibits PX16, JX46, JX47; JURY TRIAL held on 5/2/2025. Court Reporter: Rebecca Sabo (EJC)
Related: [-]
160 160 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 05/02 5:26 PM
ORAL MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, to admit into evidence by Plaintiff Exhibits PX16, JX46, JX47 by Polypack, Inc.. (EJC)
Related: [-]
159 159 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 05/02 5:21 PM
ORAL MOTION by for Miscellaneous Relief, to admit into evidence by Defendant Exhibits DX58, DX89, DX111, DX112, DX114, DX116, DX117, DX163, JX20, JX28, JX14, JX75, JX76, JX77, JX78, JX79, JX99, JX104, JX131, JX134, JX135, JX139, DX84, DX90, DX125, DX126, DX127, DX128, DX129, DX132, DX133, DX135, DX147 by Nestle USA, Inc.. (EJC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
158 158 trial Exhibit List Thu 05/01 10:45 PM
Exhibit List Amended by Nestle USA, Inc.. (Downs, Marissa)
Related: [-]
157 157 minutes Jury Trial - Held Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 05/01 5:53 PM
Minute Entry. In Person Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn: ORAL ORDER granting 153 Oral Motion to admit into evidence by Plaintiff exhibits PX1, PX3, PX5, JX63, JX68, JX69, JX70, JX71, JX72, JX74, JX75, JX76, JX77, JX78, JX79, JX84, JX85, JX88, JX89, JX90, JX95, JX96, JX98, JX99, JX100, JX103, JX107, JX108, JX109, JX113, JX114, JX125, JX126, JX127, JX130, JX142, JX146, JX147; granting 154 Oral Motion to admit into evidence by Defendant Exhibits PX1, JX22, JX35, JX81, DX5, DX6, DX7, DX10, DX15, DX16, DX35, DX38, DX39, DX64, DX70, DX78, DX159, DX160, DX161,JX21, JX22, JX30, JX31, JX32, JX33, JX35, DX3, DX8, DX14, DX15, DX21, DX55, DX62, DX162; JURY TRIAL Day Four held on 5/1/2025. Court Reporter: Rebecca Sabo (EJC)
Related: [-]
156 156 order Order on Motion for Directed Verdict Thu 05/01 5:42 PM
ORAL ORDER denying 155 Motion for Directed Verdict for the reasons stated by Plaintiff on the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 5/1/2025. (EJC)
Related: [-]
155 155 motion Directed Verdict Thu 05/01 5:41 PM
ORAL MOTION for Directed Verdict by Nestle USA, Inc.. (EJC)
Related: [-]
154 154 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 05/01 5:38 PM
ORAL MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to admit into evidence by Defendant Exhibits PX1, JX22, JX35, JX81, DX5, DX6, DX7, DX10, DX15, DX16, DX35, DX38, DX39, DX64, DX70, DX78, DX159, DX160, DX161,JX21, JX22, JX30, JX31, JX32, JX33, JX35, DX3, DX8, DX14, DX15, DX21, DX55, DX62, DX162 by Nestle USA, Inc.. (EJC)
Related: [-]
153 153 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 05/01 5:33 PM
ORAL MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to admit into evidence by Plaintiff exhibits PX1, PX3, PX5, JX63, JX68, JX69, JX70, JX71, JX72, JX74, JX75, JX76, JX77, JX78, JX79, JX84, JX85, JX88, JX89, JX90, JX95, JX96, JX98, JX99, JX100, JX103, JX107, JX108, JX109, JX113, JX114, JX125, JX126, JX127, JX130, JX142, JX146, JX147 by Polypack, Inc.. (EJC)
Related: [-]